In Re: Farrin B. Entezari-Ullah
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | J Paul Oetken |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-03747 |
Nature of Suit | 422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158 |
Cause | 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA |
Case Filed: | May 19, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2017 |
Debtor
Farrin B. Entezari-Ullah
, |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 15, 2016 4:19 AM EST |
Appellant
Farrin B. Entezari-Ullah
275 W 96th St Apt 25E
New York, NY 10025 |
|
Appellee
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
In Re
Farrin B. Entezari-Ullah
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order of Dismissal
Mon 03/06 5:36 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE BANKRUPTCY APPEAL: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the appeal in the above-entitled action is hereby DISMISSED. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/6/2017) (cf) |
|
misc
Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk
Mon 03/06 5:37 PM
Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re:2 Order of Dismissal to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (cf) |
||
Friday, May 20, 2016 | ||
utility
Case Accepted as Related
Fri 05/20 11:31 AM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:13-cv-00485-JPO-RLE. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Fri 05/20 11:31 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 05/20 11:32 AM
Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. (wb) |
||
Thursday, May 19, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
appeal
Bankruptcy Appeal
Thu 05/19 7:40 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Shelley C. Chapman dated May 17, 2016. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 16-B-11416 (SCC). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Farrin B. Entezari-Ullah.(bkar) |
|
utility
Bankruptcy Appeal Referred as Possibly Related/Similar - Crt
Thu 05/19 7:41 PM
BANKRUPTCY APPEAL CASE REFERRED BY COURT TO Judge Valerie E. Caproni as possibly related to 16-cv-2953. (bkar) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 05/19 7:42 PM
Case Designated ECF. (bkar) |