Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd. v. Razor USA LLC
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | R Gary Klausner |
Referred: | Andrew J Wistrich |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-03496 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 19, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 15, 2016 1:06 AM PST |
Counter Claimant
Razor USA LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Razor USA LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
4
pgs
stip
Dismiss Case
Fri 04/28 11:53 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd..(Wine, Mark) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
order
Consolidate Cases
Fri 01/20 10:53 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE35 by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Having considered the parties Joint Motion to Consolidate, and all thepapers filed in support thereof, the Court hereby GRANTS the parties motion and orders as follows:1. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a), Case No. 2:16-CV-03496-RGK- AJWx and Case No. 2:16-CV-06359-RGK-AJWx are hereby consolidated for all purposes into one action;2. All subsequent pleadings concerning Case No. 2:16-CV-03496-RGK- AJWx must henceforth be filed in Case No. 2:16-CV-06359-RGK-AJWx and shall identify Case No. 2:16-CV-03496-RGK-AJWx on the caption as a consolidated case; 3. The deadlines imposed in the Case No. 2:16-CV-03496-RGK-AJWxby Dkt. No. 27 are hereby vacated, and schedule for Case No. 2:16-CV-06359- RGK-AJWx shall remain unchanged;4. The Complaints and Answers filed in Case No. 2:16-CV-03496-RGK- AJWx shall remain the operative pleadings for determining any rights and remedies associated with the causes of action and affirmative defenses raised uniquely therein;5. All discovery requests tendered and depositions noticed in the 3496 Action shall count towards the limits in Case No. 2:16-CV-06359-RGK-AJWx. The parties must meet and confer and, within 14 days of this order, submit a joint stipulated amended discovery plan modifying any of the discovery limits agreed to in the parties previous Joint Rule 26(f) report filed in Case No. 2:16-CV-06359-RGK-AJWx. (bp) |
|
38 | 38
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 01/18 4:21 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER TAKING JOINT MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES35 UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Joint Motion to Consolidate Cases35 calendared for hearing on January 23, 2017, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cr) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
order
Protective Order
Tue 01/17 2:58 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (Please see attached order for further details.) (jsan) |
|
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
stip
Protective Order
Tue 01/10 2:58 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd..(Wine, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, December 20, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Consolidate Cases
Tue 12/20 2:02 PM
Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 2:16-CV-06359-RGK-AJWx, filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 1/23/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Wine, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Joint Stipulation Regarding Consolidation of Cases for All Purposes, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of James Maune, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, November 23, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Wed 11/23 1:23 PM
ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), Counterclaim33 filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd..(Wine, Mark) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Counterclaim
Mon 10/31 5:42 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition32 , COUNTERCLAIM against Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd. filed by Defendant/Counterclaimant Razor USA LLC.(McPhie, David) |
|
Friday, October 14, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Fri 10/14 2:14 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd. amending Amended Complaint/Petition,15 , filed by Plaintiff Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd.(Wine, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Thursday, October 13, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order
Thu 10/13 2:44 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge R. Gary Klausner, re Stipulation to Amend/Correct,30 . The Court having read and considered the Parties' Joint Stipulation to File Second Amended Complaint, and good cause appearing therefor, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co. Ltd. is permitted to file its Second Amended Complaint on or before October 17, 2016. (bp) |
|
Thursday, October 06, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
stip
Amend/Correct
Thu 10/06 2:20 PM
Corrected STIPULATION to Amend Amended Complaint/Petition,15 filed by Plaintiff Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd..(Wine, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Second Amended Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief for Patent Infringement (35 U.S.C. 271), | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
29 | 29
misc
Errata
Thu 10/06 2:14 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd.. correcting Stipulation to Amend/Correct28 (Wine, Mark) |
|
28 | 28
stip
Amend/Correct
Thu 10/06 10:02 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Amend Amended Complaint/Petition,15 filed by Plaintiff Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd..(Wine, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Second Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, October 03, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Mon 10/03 11:04 AM
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Amended Pleadings due by 11/6/2016. Discovery cut-off 3/29/2017. Motions due by 4/12/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2017 at 9:00 am. Jury Trial set for 6/27/2017 at 9:00 am. Court Reporter: Sandra MacNeil. (sw) |
|
26 | 26
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Mon 10/03 11:00 AM
ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2017 at 9:00 am; Jury Trial set for 6/27/2017 at 9:00 am. See Order for details. (sw) |
|
25 | 25
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)
Mon 10/03 10:58 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No. 3 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. (sw) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Report
Mon 09/26 4:00 PM
JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Plaintiff Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd.. (Wine, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, August 23, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
order
Striking Electronically Filed Documents (G-106)
Wed 08/24 7:18 AM
ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Amended Complaint/Petition,22 , for the following reasons: Requires leave of Court.; (bp) |
|
Monday, August 22, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Mon 08/22 6:02 PM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Razor USA LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Amended Complaint/Petition,15 , filed by Plaintiff Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd.(Wine, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Friday, August 05, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 08/05 2:50 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Scheduling Conference, scheduled for 10/24/2016 at 9:00 am has been ADVANCED TO 10/3/2016 at 9:00 am. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) |
|
Monday, August 01, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/01 2:10 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,15 Defendant's Answer to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Razor USA LLC.(McPhie, David) |
|
Wednesday, July 27, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/29 7:04 AM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting18 Non-Resident Attorney Yugen Ma APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs, Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd. Hanghou Kedao Investment Management LLP, designating Mark P. Wine as local counsel. (bp) |
|
Tuesday, July 26, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Tue 07/26 10:52 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Yufeng Ma to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18247130) filed by Plaintiff Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd.. (Wine, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing (Ill & NY) | ||
Friday, July 15, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/15 11:43 AM
ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting16 Non-Resident Attorney Xiang Wang APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd., designating Mark P. Wine as local counsel. (pso) |
|
Thursday, July 14, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Thu 07/14 8:34 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Xiang Wang to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18182501) filed by Plaintiff Hangzhou Chic Intelligen t Technology Co., Ltd.. (Wine, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Wednesday, July 13, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Wed 07/13 1:42 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Razor USA LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 JURY DEMAND, filed by plaintiff Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd.(Wine, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Thursday, June 30, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 06/30 2:16 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/17/2016. A Scheduling Conference has been placed on calendar for October 24, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Trial counsel must be present and there are no telephonic appearances. Counsel are ordered to file a joint statement providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims being asserted. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. (sw) |
|
Tuesday, June 28, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 06/28 9:57 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Razor USA LLC, identifying Small Minds Press, Inc.; Robert Chen; Great GT LLC; Pi-Yu Lin; Carlton Calvin. (McPhie, David) |
|
Monday, June 27, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/27 7:37 PM
ANSWERJURY DEMAND. Defendant's Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Razor USA LLC.(McPhie, David) |
|
Friday, June 10, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Fri 06/10 10:21 AM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Razor USA LLC answer now due 6/27/2016, filed by Defendant Razor USA LLC.(Attorney David C McPhie added to party Razor USA LLC(pty:dft))(McPhie, David) |
|
Wednesday, June 01, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Thu 06/02 11:10 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. See Order for Specifics. (bp) |
|
Thursday, May 26, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 05/26 12:10 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd., upon Defendant Razor USA LLC served on 5/23/2016, answer due 6/13/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent, Received by Valerie Villegas, Intake Specialist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Wine, Mark) |
|
Friday, May 20, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 05/20 4:27 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Razor USA LLC. (car) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 05/20 4:21 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 05/20 4:21 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (car) |
|
Thursday, May 19, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
Thu 05/19 4:41 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd.. (Wine, Mark) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Thu 05/19 4:39 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd.. (Wine, Mark) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 05/19 4:36 PM
NOTICE AND CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd., identifying Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd.. (Wine, Mark) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 05/19 4:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd.. (Wine, Mark) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 05/19 4:22 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-17854064 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd.. (Attorney Mark P Wine added to party Hangzhou Chic Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd.(pty:pla))(Wine, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 |