Penthouse Global Media, Inc., et al v. SKWS Enterprises, Inc., et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Paul L Abrams |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-03498 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 19, 2016 |
Terminated: | Nov 16, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 15, 2016 12:56 AM PST |
Defendant
Factory Nightclub, form of business entity unknown
|
|
Defendant
Nathan Goller
|
|
Defendant
SKWS Enterprises, Inc., a California corporation
|
|
Defendant
Joe Villa
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Factory Nightclub
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SKWS Enterprises, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
General Media Communications, Inc., a New York corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Penthouse Global Media, Inc., a Delaware corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
General Media Communications, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Penthouse Global Media, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 16, 2016 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
Wed 11/16 11:54 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (cr) |
|
41 | 41
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Wed 11/16 11:46 AM
ORDER TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE by Judge George H. Wu: Based upon the stipulation between the parties and their respective counsel, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety with the Court retaining jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement. Each party will bear its own attorneys' fees and expenses. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (cr) |
|
Thursday, November 10, 2016 | ||
40 | 40
2
pgs
stip
Dismiss Case
Thu 11/10 3:24 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiffs General Media Communications, Inc., Penthouse Global Media, Inc..(Mankey, Caroline) |
|
Tuesday, November 08, 2016 | ||
39 | 39
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Tue 11/08 2:19 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Caroline H Mankey counsel for Plaintiffs General Media Communications, Inc., Penthouse Global Media, Inc.. Erica R. Graves is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiffs Penthouse Global Media, Inc. and General Media Communications, Inc.. (Mankey, Caroline) |
|
38 | 38
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Tue 11/08 1:48 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge George H. Wu. Effective November 14, 2016, Judge Wu will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 9D on the 9th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 9D of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Thursday, November 03, 2016 | ||
37 | 37
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 11/04 12:52 PM
MINUTES OF POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE before Judge George H. Wu: Settlement is reached. The Court continues the Status Conference set for 11/17/2016 at 8:30 AM. Parties are advised that the status conference will be vacated and no appearance will be required provided that a Stipulation to Dismiss, with a proposed order, is filed by noon on 11/15/2016. All previously set deadlines and dates are vacated and taken off-calendar. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (jp) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2016 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Status Report
Mon 10/31 3:56 PM
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) filed by Plaintiffs General Media Communications, Inc., Penthouse Global Media, Inc.. (Mankey, Caroline) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order
Mon 10/03 9:51 AM
ORDER GRANTING THIRD STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT NATHAN GOLLERTO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY AN ADDITIONAL THIRTY DAYS by Judge George H. Wu: Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and for good cause shown, it ishereby ordered that Defendant Nathan Goller shall have until Monday, October 31,2016 to respond to the Complaint filed against him in this action. (cr) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Wed 09/28 6:11 PM
Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 31, 2016 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiffs General Media Communications, Inc., Penthouse Global Media, Inc..(Mankey, Caroline) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 27, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 09/28 10:51 AM
ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu: The status conference currently set for Thursday, September 29, 2016, at 8:30 a.m., shall be continued for at least 30 days to November 3, 2016 at 8:30 a.m. A joint status report (or a dismissal) is to be filed by October 31, 2016. (cr) |
|
32 | 32
stip
Continue
Tue 09/27 10:29 AM
STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from September 29, 2016 to October 31, 2016 filed by plaintiffs General Media Communications, Inc., Penthouse Global Media, Inc..(Mankey, Caroline) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 14, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Wed 09/14 3:55 PM
Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Nathan Goller answer now due 9/30/2016, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiffs Penthouse Global Media, Inc.; General Media Communications, Inc..(Mankey, Caroline) |
|
Friday, September 02, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Fri 09/02 12:56 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Nathan Goller answer now due 9/16/2016, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiffs Penthouse Global Media, Inc.; General Media Communications, Inc..(Mankey, Caroline) |
|
Wednesday, August 10, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
order
Set Aside Default
Thu 08/11 8:40 AM
ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT NATHAN GOLLER by Judge George H. Wu re:27 REQUEST to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form25 . Nathan Goller's Answer now due 9/2/2016. (mrgo) |
|
Monday, August 08, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Tue 08/09 10:50 AM
MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Discovery cut-off 1/31/2017. Motions due by 4/3/2017. Post Mediation Status Conference set for 9/29/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Jury Trial set for 5/16/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. If the parties require more time to settle the matter, the parties shall file a Stipulation to Continue and Proposed Order by noon on September 27, 2016. If the matter should settle, the parties are to file a Notice of Dismissal containing language directing the Court to retain jurisdiction. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo) |
|
Friday, August 05, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Set Aside Default
Fri 08/05 2:06 PM
REQUEST to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form25 . filed by plaintiff General Media Communications, Inc., Penthouse Global Media, Inc.. (Mankey, Caroline) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 01, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Mon 08/01 12:37 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 days, filed by Plaintiffs General Media Communications, Inc., Penthouse Global Media, Inc... (Mankey, Caroline) |
|
Thursday, July 28, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
Thu 07/28 9:09 AM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Nathan Goller, an individual. (mrgo) |
|
Wednesday, July 27, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
3
pgs
motion
Clerk to Enter Default
Wed 07/27 1:55 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Nathan Goller filed by plaintiffs Penthouse Global Media, Inc., General Media Communications, Inc.. (Mankey, Caroline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, July 14, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 07/14 2:18 PM
(IN CHAMBERS): ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge George H. Wu. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 7/28/2016. (kss) |
|
Friday, July 01, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Fri 07/01 9:12 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Disclosure20 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Notice: Certificate/notice of interested. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) |
|
Thursday, June 30, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 06/30 3:34 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants Factory Nightclub, Joe Villa.(Attorney Sagar Parikh added to party Factory Nightclub(pty:dft), Attorney Sagar Parikh added to party Joe Villa(pty:dft))(Parikh, Sagar) |
|
Wednesday, June 29, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Disclosure
Wed 06/29 1:41 PM
DISCLOSURE of Certification of Interested Parties re Answer to Complaint14 , Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B),19 filed by Defendants Factory Nightclub, SKWS Enterprises, Inc., Joe Villa (Parikh, Sagar) |
|
19 | 19
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)
Wed 06/29 11:17 AM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Answer to Complaint14 by Judge George H. Wu. The document is accepted as filed. Counsel are to file their Certificate of Interested Parties by July 5, 2016. See Local Rule 7.1-1. (kss) |
|
Tuesday, June 28, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 06/28 11:07 AM
ORDER TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE HEARING by Judge George H. Wu. Based on the foregoing stipulation and good cause appearing therefore, theScheduling Conference is continued to August 8, 2016 at 8:30 a.m. and the Rule26(f) Report now due August 1, 2016. (kss) |
|
Monday, June 27, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Continue
Mon 06/27 10:13 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference Hearing from July 25, 2016 to August 4 or 8, 2016 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only16 filed by Defendant SKWS Enterprises, Inc..(Parikh, Sagar) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 23, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 06/23 11:29 AM
(IN CHAMBERS): COURT ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. On the Courts own motion, a Scheduling Conference is set for July 25, 2016, at 8:30 a.m. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court not later than July 11, 2016. (kss) |
|
Tuesday, June 21, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Tue 06/21 12:13 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint14 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom) |
|
Friday, June 17, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
14
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 06/17 10:24 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant SKWS Enterprises, Inc..(Attorney Sagar Parikh added to party SKWS Enterprises, Inc.(pty:dft))(Parikh, Sagar) |
|
Tuesday, June 14, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 06/14 6:48 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Penthouse Global Media, Inc., General Media Communications, Inc., upon Defendant Nathan Goller served on 6/10/2016, answer due 7/1/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cory Bird, Manager of Factory Nightclub, business address for Nathan Goller in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mankey, Caroline) |
|
12 | 12
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 06/14 6:46 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Penthouse Global Media, Inc., General Media Communications, Inc., upon Defendant Joe Villa served on 6/10/2016, answer due 7/1/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cory Bird, Manager of Factory Nightclub, business address for Joe Villa in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mankey, Caroline) |
|
11 | 11
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 06/14 6:43 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Penthouse Global Media, Inc., General Media Communications, Inc., upon Defendant Factory Nightclub served on 6/10/2016, answer due 7/1/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cory Bird, Manager in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mankey, Caroline) |
|
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 06/14 6:39 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Penthouse Global Media, Inc., General Media Communications, Inc., upon Defendant SKWS Enterprises, Inc. served on 6/6/2016, answer due 6/27/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sagar Parikh, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Mankey, Caroline) |
|
Friday, May 27, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 05/27 10:58 AM
Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu. (kss) |
|
Friday, May 20, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 05/20 1:36 PM
21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint,1 as to defendants Factory Nightclub, Nathan Goller, SKWS Enterprises, Inc., Joe Villa. (esa) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 05/20 1:30 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 05/20 1:29 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (esa) |
|
Thursday, May 19, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Thu 05/19 5:32 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs General Media Communications, Inc., a New York corporation, Penthouse Global Media, Inc., a Delaware corporation. (Mankey, Caroline) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
Thu 05/19 5:30 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by General Media Communications, Inc., a New York corporation, Penthouse Global Media, Inc., a Delaware corporation. (Mankey, Caroline) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 05/19 5:29 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs General Media Communications, Inc., a New York corporation, Penthouse Global Media, Inc., a Delaware corporation, (Mankey, Caroline) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 05/19 5:27 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs General Media Communications, Inc., a New York corporation, Penthouse Global Media, Inc., a Delaware corporation. (Mankey, Caroline) |
|
1 | 1
20
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 05/19 5:25 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-17854729 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Penthouse Global Media, Inc., a Delaware corporation, General Media Communications, Inc., a New York corporation. (Attorney Caroline H Mankey added to party General Media Communications, Inc., a New York corporation (pty:pla), Attorney Caroline H Mankey added to party Penthouse Global Media, Inc., a Delaware corporation (pty:pla))(Mankey, Caroline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Complaint |