California Central District Court
Judge:Cormac J Carney
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 8:16-cv-00922
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:May 20, 2016
Terminated:Jun 29, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 16, 2016 1:31 AM PST
Defendant
Looped In Inc
Represented By
Elise Charlotte O'Brien
Rynn And Janowsky LLP
contact info
June T Monroe
Rynn And Janowsky LLP
contact info
Defendant
OnPoint OC Inc
Represented By
Elise Charlotte O'Brien
Rynn And Janowsky LLP
contact info
June T Monroe
Rynn And Janowsky LLP
contact info
Defendant
Signals United Inc
Represented By
Elise Charlotte O'Brien
Rynn And Janowsky LLP
contact info
June T Monroe
Rynn And Janowsky LLP
contact info
Defendant
Smart Circle International LLC
Defendant
DOES
Plaintiff
Frank Gavidia
Represented By
Rachhana T Srey
Nichols Kaster Pllp
contact info
Matthew C Helland
Nichols Kaster LLP
contact info
Jason Christopher Marsili
Posner And Rosen LLP
contact info
Brittany B Skemp
Nicholas Kaster LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 69 minutes ago
Wednesday, June 29, 2016
30 30 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Wed 9:59 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Frank Gavidia. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Helland, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2016
29 29 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 8:00 AM
ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting27 Non-Resident Attorney Brittany Bachman Skemp APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Frank Gavidia, designating Jason C. Marsili as local counsel. (lwag)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 17, 2016
28 28 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) Fri 8:39 AM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brittany Bachman Skemp to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Frank Gavidia (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 6/14/2016, Receipt No. 097317998714)25 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 06/17/2016.Counsel shall consult the errors noted in the Notice of Deficiency26 and re-file. (dro)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Fri 7:32 AM
Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brittany Bachman Skemp to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Frank Gavidia (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 6/14/2016, Receipt No. 097317998714) filed by Plaintiff Frank Gavidia. (Marsili, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 16, 2016
26 26 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) Thu 4:40 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brittany Bachman Skemp to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Frank Gavidia (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 6/14/2016, Receipt No. 097317998714)25 . The following error(s) was found: A Certificate of Good Standing is not attached to Pro Hac Vice Application.Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Thu 11:08 AM
Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brittany Bachman Skemp to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Frank Gavidia (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 6/14/2016, Receipt No. 097317998714) filed by Plaintiff Frank Gavidia. (Marsili, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2016
24 24 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 3:34 PM
ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting19 Non-Resident Attorney Rachhana T. Srey APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Frank Gavidia, designating Jason Christopher Marsili as local counsel. (mba)
Related: [-]
23 23 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 2:16 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Looped In Inc, OnPoint OC Inc, Signals United Inc, re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less),,21 served on June 15, 2016. (O'Brien, Elise)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) Wed 10:15 AM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The document18 is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 06/22/2016. Counsel shall consult the errors noted in the Notice of Deficiency20 and re-file. (dro) Modified on 6/15/2016 (dro)
Related: [-]
21 21 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 9:52 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Signals United Inc answer now due 6/30/2016; Looped In Inc answer now due 6/30/2016; OnPoint OC Inc answer now due 6/30/2016; Smart Circle International LLC answer now due 6/30/2016, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants Signals United Inc; Looped In Inc; OnPoint OC Inc.(Attorney Elise Charlotte O'Brien added to party Looped In Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Elise Charlotte O'Brien added to party OnPoint OC Inc (pty:dft), Attorney Elise Charlotte O'Brien added to party Signals United Inc(pty:dft))(O'Brien, Elise)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2016
20 20 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) Tue 5:13 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brittany Bachman Skemp to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Frank Gavidia (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-17998714)18 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Applicant failed to list state courts where they are admitted. Only listed appellate and district courts. See Instructions for Applicants (1)(G-64). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 2:12 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rachhana T. Srey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Frank Gavidia (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-17999032) filed by Plaintiff Frank Gavidia. (Marsili, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 1:27 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brittany Bachman Skemp to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Frank Gavidia (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-17998714) filed by Plaintiff Frank Gavidia. (Marsili, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certifica te of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
17 17 notice Appearance Tue 12:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jason Christopher Marsili on behalf of Plaintiff Frank Gavidia (Attorney Jason Christopher Marsili added to party Frank Gavidia(pty:pla))(Marsili, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2016
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Wed 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Consent Filing filed by plaintiff Frank Gavidia. (Helland, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2016
15 15 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 2:54 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Frank Gavidia, upon Defendant OnPoint OC Inc served on 5/26/2016, answer due 6/16/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon OnPoint, OC, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Helland, Matthew)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 2:51 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Frank Gavidia, upon Defendant Signals United Inc served on 5/26/2016, answer due 6/16/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Signals United, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Helland, Matthew)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 2:43 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Frank Gavidia, upon Defendant Looped In Inc served on 5/26/2016, answer due 6/16/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Looped In, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Helland, Matthew)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 2:27 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Frank Gavidia, upon Defendant Smart Circle International LLC served on 5/26/2016, answer due 6/16/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Smart Circle International, LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Helland, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2016
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Wed 5:40 PM
NOTICE of Consent Filing (2) filed by plaintiff Frank Gavidia. (Helland, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2016
10 10 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 10:35 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Looped In Inc, OnPoint OC Inc, Signals United Inc, Smart Circle International LLC. (jtil)
Related: [-]
9 9 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 10:33 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 10:33 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2016
7 7 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Frank Gavidia, (Helland, Matthew)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Summons Request Fri 3:05 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Frank Gavidia. (Helland, Matthew)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Summons Request Fri 2:59 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Frank Gavidia. (Helland, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Fri 2:57 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Frank Gavidia. (Helland, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Fri 2:53 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Frank Gavidia. (Helland, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 2:38 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Frank Gavidia. (Helland, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 2:29 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-17859715 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Frank Gavidia. (Attorney Matthew C Helland added to party Frank Gavidia(pty:pla))(Helland, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B