LHF Productions, Inc v. Doe 1 et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Ricardo S Martinez |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-00731 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 20, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 02, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 16, 2016 1:23 AM PST |
Defendant
Royd Malama
|
|
Defendant
Farnaz Carza
|
|
Defendant
Monika Cummings
|
|
Defendant
Pao Hang
|
|
Defendant
Son Huynh
13920 71ST AVE E
PUYALLUP, WA 98373 |
|
Defendant
Valera Kotelevskiy
|
|
Defendant
Max Mamotyuk
|
|
Defendant
Maria Pedro
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Pham
|
|
Defendant
Reyner Rosas
|
|
Plaintiff
LHF Productions, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LHF Productions Inc
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Doe 9
Terminated: 08/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
Wilson Ip
Terminated: 10/14/2016
|
|
Defendant
Kari Leidholm
Terminated: 11/02/2016
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Doe 10
Terminated: 08/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
Brad Showalter
Terminated: 11/04/2016
|
|
Defendant
Dennis J. Sinclair
Terminated: 10/14/2016
|
|
Defendant
Christian Sontani
Terminated: 10/14/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 2
Terminated: 08/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 1
Terminated: 08/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 11
Terminated: 08/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 12
Terminated: 08/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 13
Terminated: 08/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 14
Terminated: 08/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 15
Terminated: 08/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 16
Terminated: 08/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 17
Terminated: 08/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 18
Terminated: 10/14/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 8
Terminated: 08/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 3
Terminated: 08/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 4
Terminated: 10/14/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 5
Terminated: 08/15/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 6
Terminated: 08/11/2016
|
|
Defendant
Doe 7
Terminated: 08/15/2016
|