Arazola-Galea v. USA
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Susan R Bolton |
Referred: | David K Duncan |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-01588 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence |
Case Filed: | May 23, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 09, 2016 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Tuesday, November 22, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
appeal
USCA Order
Tue 11/22 12:20 PM
ORDER of USCA: Request for Certificate of Appealability is denied; appeal terminated, re: 16-16101 as to6 Notice of Appeal filed by Mario Kelbia Arazola-Galea. (copies sent by the Ninth Circuit) (ATD) |
|
Att: 1 NDA | ||
Thursday, June 23, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 06/23 2:33 PM
USCA Case Number re:6 Notice of Appeal. Case number 16-16101 Ninth Circuit. (copies sent by Ninth Circuit) (KGM) |
|
Tuesday, June 21, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 06/21 1:21 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re:5 Clerk's Judgment and4 Order by Mario Kelbia Arazola-Galea. Filing fee DUE. (2 pages) (LSP) |
|
Thursday, June 09, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Clerks Judgment
Thu 06/09 3:33 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT it is ordered and adjudged that in accordance with the Court's Order filed June 9, 2016, movant's motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255 to vacate, set aside or correct a sentence is denied and the civil action opened in connection is hereby dismissed without prejudice. (LSP) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order
Thu 06/09 3:32 PM
ORDER that the Motion Under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody (Doc. 37 in CR 13-00751 PHX-SRB) is denied and the civil action opened in connection with this Motion (CV 16-01588 PHX-SRB (DKD)) is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk must enter judgment.The Clerk must send a copy of this Order and Movant's § 2255 Motion (Doc.1 in CV 16-01588 PHX-SRB (DKD)) to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals and to Plaintiff United States of America. Pursuant to Rule 11(a) of the Rules Governing Section 2255 Cases, in the event Movant files an appeal, the Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability because reasonable jurists would not find the Court's procedural ruling debatable. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/9/16.(LSP) |
|
Att: 1 2255 Motion | ||
Wednesday, May 25, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 05/25 3:35 PM
Amended Notice of Assignment. (BAS) |
|
Monday, May 23, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment
Tue 05/24 9:25 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (BAS) |
|
1 | 1
mot2255
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Tue 05/24 9:24 AM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) re: Criminal Case No CR 13-0751 PHX-SRB-001 filed by Mario Kelbia Arazola-Galea. (2 pages)(BAS) |
|
Att: 1 envelope |