Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 4:16-cr-00132
Case Filed:May 18, 2016
Terminated:Oct 20, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 06, 2017 6:22 AM CST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Frank L Gatto-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Shawn Smith-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Chris Wolfe-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Chad Shulka (14)
Terminated: 01/06/2017
Represented By
Katherine L Reed
Sorrels Udashen & Anton
contact info
James Joseph Mongaras, Jr.
Sorrels Udashen & Anton
contact info
Defendant
Michael Barrett (20)
Terminated: 01/20/2017
Represented By
Leigh W Davis
contact info
Catherine R Dunnavant
Dunnavant & Associates PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Michael John Mize (10)
Terminated: 12/02/2016
Represented By
Henry James Clark, Jr
Law Offices Of Henry J Clark Jr
contact info
Cody L Cofer
Cofer Law PC
contact info
Defendant
Jose Pablo Morales (33)
Terminated: 09/08/2016
Represented By
Vincent Eugene Wisely
The Law Office Of Vincent Wisely
contact info
Defendant
Joe Darrell Pierce (28)
Terminated: 12/23/2016
Represented By
Kara L. Carreras
Goza Carreras PC
contact info
Defendant
Raul Rangel (11)
Terminated: 11/23/2016
Represented By
Andrew Ottaway
Ottaway Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Martha Jane Rodgers (12)
Terminated: 12/16/2016
Represented By
Neil L Durrance
Law Office Of Neil L Durrance
contact info
Defendant
Melissa Mae Sherman (13)
Terminated: 12/02/2016
Represented By
Loren Green
Green Law Texas
contact info
Defendant
Trae Short (29)
Terminated: 02/10/2017
Represented By
Frank Dounell Able
Law Office Of Frank D Able
contact info
Defendant
Joshua James Milson (27)
Terminated: 02/24/2017
Represented By
Ronald G Couch
Law Office Of Ronald G Couch
contact info
Defendant
Ashley Simpson (32)
Terminated: 09/08/2016
Represented By
Cody L Cofer
Cofer Law PC
contact info
Defendant
Billy Ray Skaggs (15)
Terminated: 02/10/2017
Represented By
Doyle Raymond Bunch, III
Burleson Pate & Gibson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Donald Lance Taylor (16)
Terminated: 01/27/2017
Represented By
Cody Lee Skipper
Law Office Of Cody L Skipper
contact info
Defendant
Melissa Veatch (17)
Terminated: 11/23/2016
Represented By
Taly Haffar
Haffar Law
contact info
Defendant
Shauna Lynn Vickers (30)
Terminated: 02/24/2017
FCI P.O. Box 4000
Aliceville, AL 35442
Represented By
Randy W Bowers
Randy Bowers Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Adrian Blair Wallace (31)
Terminated: 01/06/2017
Represented By
Thomas G Pappas
Burleson Pate & Gibson LLP
contact info
John Hunter Smith
Wynne & Smith
contact info
Robert E Luttrell, III
Law Office Of Robert E Luttrell
contact info
Defendant
Drew Justice Windsor (18)
Terminated: 01/13/2017
Represented By
Brett D Boone
Law Office Of Brett D Boone
contact info
Defendant
David Ryan Haagensen (19)
Terminated: 12/16/2016
#35887-177 BOP Fairton FCI PO Box 420
Fairton, NJ 08320
Represented By
Brian Wayne Salvant
The Salvant Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Charles Ben Bounds (1)
Terminated: 02/09/2017
Represented By
Christopher A Curtis-FPD
Federal Public Defender - Fort Worth
contact info
Kevin Joel Page-FPD
Federal Public Defender - Dallas
contact info
Mark R Danielson
Law Office Of Mark R Danielson
contact info
Defendant
Brian Matthew Brown (2)
Terminated: 12/02/2016
Represented By
James P Whalen
Whalen Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Amanda Rose Chamberlain (3)
Terminated: 12/23/2016
Represented By
Tracie L Tippen
Law Office Of Tracie L Tippen
contact info
Defendant
Jerry Duarte (21)
Terminated: 10/20/2017
Represented By
Blake Ryan Burns
Danny & Blake Burns Attorneys At Law
contact info
Defendant
Lee Fogle (4)
Terminated: 12/16/2016
Represented By
Kevin B Ross
Law Office Of Kevin B Ross PC
contact info
Defendant
Holly Leanne Frantzen (22)
Terminated: 12/23/2016
Represented By
Melinda Joan Lehmann
The Law Office Of Melinda Lehmann
contact info
Defendant
Billy Fred Gentry, Jr. (5)
Terminated: 02/09/2017
Represented By
Michael Ray Harris
Law Office Of Michael Ray Harris
contact info
Defendant
James Marcus Laxson (9)
Terminated: 09/02/2016
Represented By
Curt Crum
The Law Office Of Curt Crum
contact info
Defendant
Jake Lindsey Hardin (23)
Terminated: 05/05/2017
Represented By
Anthony H Green
Law Office Of Anthony Green
contact info
Defendant
Michael Clay Heaslet (24)
Terminated: 02/10/2017
Represented By
Thomas G Pappas
Burleson Pate & Gibson LLP
contact info
Peter Christian Smythe
Smythe PC
contact info
Curt Crum
The Law Office Of Curt Crum
contact info
Defendant
Nicole Cynthia Herrera (25)
Terminated: 02/10/2017
Represented By
Kirk F Lechtenberger
Law Office Of Kirk F Lechtenberger
contact info
Dimitri Dube
contact info
Defendant
Chayce Daniel Hodges (6)
Terminated: 12/09/2016
Represented By
Preston Lee Jones
Law Office Of Preston Jones
contact info
Defendant
Megan Kemp (26)
Terminated: 02/17/2017
Represented By
Aaron Clay Graham
Law Office Of A. Clay Graham
contact info
Defendant
Kevin Kyle Killough (7)
Terminated: 02/09/2017
Represented By
Derek D Brown
Law Office Of Derek Brown
contact info
Erin Elizabeth Hendricks
Erin Hendricks Law
contact info
Defendant
Roger Wayne Langston (8)
Terminated: 01/06/2017
Represented By
J Steven Bush
Law Office Of J Steven Bush
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/02/2019 6:24 PM CST
Monday, March 28, 2016
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until all defendants have been arrested.) as to Jerry Duarte (1), Billy Fred Gentry, Jr (2), Avelino Gresham (3), Chayce Daniel Hodges (4), Kari Nicole Neal (5), Terry Ryan Nichols (6), Hector Berzosa Pando (7), Martha Jane Rodgers (8), Jonathan Ruckman (9), Chad Shulka (10), Shauna Lynn Vickers (11), Adrian Blair Wallace (12), Michael Lyle Young (13), Brian Lee Zimmerman (14). (jah) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until all defendants have been arrested.) as to Amanda Rose Chamberlain (1), Lee Fogle (2), David Haagensen (3), Roger Wayne Langston (4), Kyle Robert Mieth (5), Joshua James Milson (6), Michael John Mize (7), Michael David Stepich (8), Donald Lance Taylor (9), Melissa Veatch (10). (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until all defendants have been arrested.) as to Lori Jean Cross (1), Nicole Cynthia Herrera (2), Michael Christopher Hoffman (3), Raul Rangel (4), Drew Justice Windsor (5). (jah) [4:16-mj-00164-BJ]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until all defendants have been arrested.) as to Ashleigh Lyn Allen (1), Brian Matthew Brown (2), William Randy Crisp (3), Jeffrey Blake Ellis (4), Holly Leanne Frantzen (5), Nikie Nicole Frye (6), Michael Sean Goss (7), Jake Lindsey Hardin (8), Kevin Kyle Killough (9), James Marcus Laxson (10), Timothy Eric Nimerfroh (11), Sarah Sueanne Ragsdale (12), Lonnie Lee Rotenberry (13), Melissa Mae Sherman (14), Jeri Ann Weiler (15). (jah) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until all defendants have been arrested.) as to Charles Ben Bounds (1), Michael Louis Debusk (2), William Don Leverett (3), Lauren Whitney Moore (4), Richard Lee Pinto (5), Alisha Ann Priest (6). (jah) [4:16-mj-00170-BJ]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until all defendants have been arrested.) as to Sheri Rose Atkins (1), Michael Barrett (2), Charles Boggs (3), Patrick Lee Graydon (4), John Phillip Ishak, Jr (5), Tammy Sue Janicek (6), Megan Kemp (7), Billy James Leverett (8), William Joseph Orozco (9), Joe Darrell Pierce (10), Brittany Sheanna Pierson (11), Veronica Prendez (12), Amber Nicole Risovi (13), Robert Sikes (14), Billy Ray Skaggs (15), James Walter Weatherford (16). (jah) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until all defendants have been arrested.) as to Amanda Rose Chamberlain (1), Lee Fogle (2), David Haagensen (3), Roger Wayne Langston (4), Kyle Robert Mieth (5), Joshua James Milson (6), Michael John Mize (7), Michael David Stepich (8), Donald Lance Taylor (9), Melissa Veatch (10). (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until all defendants have been arrested.) as to Amanda Rose Chamberlain (1), Lee Fogle (2), David Haagensen (3), Roger Wayne Langston (4), Kyle Robert Mieth (5), Joshua James Milson (6), Michael John Mize (7), Michael David Stepich (8), Donald Lance Taylor (9), Melissa Veatch (10). (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until all defendants have been arrested.) as to Sheri Rose Atkins (1), Michael Barrett (2), Charles Boggs (3), Patrick Lee Graydon (4), John Phillip Ishak, Jr (5), Tammy Sue Janicek (6), Megan Kemp (7), Billy James Leverett (8), William Joseph Orozco (9), Joe Darrell Pierce (10), Brittany Sheanna Pierson (11), Veronica Prendez (12), Amber Nicole Risovi (13), Robert Sikes (14), Billy Ray Skaggs (15), James Walter Weatherford (16). (jah) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until all defendants have been arrested.) as to Jerry Duarte (1), Billy Fred Gentry, Jr (2), Avelino Gresham (3), Chayce Daniel Hodges (4), Kari Nicole Neal (5), Terry Ryan Nichols (6), Hector Berzosa Pando (7), Martha Jane Rodgers (8), Jonathan Ruckman (9), Chad Shulka (10), Shauna Lynn Vickers (11), Adrian Blair Wallace (12), Michael Lyle Young (13), Brian Lee Zimmerman (14). (jah) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until all defendants have been arrested.) as to Ashleigh Lyn Allen (1), Brian Matthew Brown (2), William Randy Crisp (3), Jeffrey Blake Ellis (4), Holly Leanne Frantzen (5), Nikie Nicole Frye (6), Michael Sean Goss (7), Jake Lindsey Hardin (8), Kevin Kyle Killough (9), James Marcus Laxson (10), Timothy Eric Nimerfroh (11), Sarah Sueanne Ragsdale (12), Lonnie Lee Rotenberry (13), Melissa Mae Sherman (14), Jeri Ann Weiler (15). (jah) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until all defendants have been arrested.) as to Ashleigh Lyn Allen (1), Brian Matthew Brown (2), William Randy Crisp (3), Jeffrey Blake Ellis (4), Holly Leanne Frantzen (5), Nikie Nicole Frye (6), Michael Sean Goss (7), Jake Lindsey Hardin (8), Kevin Kyle Killough (9), James Marcus Laxson (10), Timothy Eric Nimerfroh (11), Sarah Sueanne Ragsdale (12), Lonnie Lee Rotenberry (13), Melissa Mae Sherman (14), Jeri Ann Weiler (15). (jah) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until all defendants have been arrested.) as to Rondalyn Joy Addison (1), Shawn Douglas Cropp (2), Kacey Croxton (3), Stephanie Ann Hatley (4), Michael Clay Heaslet (5), Michael Jordan (6), Larry Daniel Maxey (7), James Allen Owens (8), Trae Short (9). (jah) [4:16-mj-00162-BJ]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until all defendants have been arrested.) as to Lori Jean Cross (1), Nicole Cynthia Herrera (2), Michael Christopher Hoffman (3), Raul Rangel (4), Drew Justice Windsor (5). (jah) [4:16-mj-00164-BJ]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until all defendants have been arrested.) as to Sheri Rose Atkins (1), Michael Barrett (2), Charles Boggs (3), Patrick Lee Graydon (4), John Phillip Ishak, Jr (5), Tammy Sue Janicek (6), Megan Kemp (7), Billy James Leverett (8), William Joseph Orozco (9), Joe Darrell Pierce (10), Brittany Sheanna Pierson (11), Veronica Prendez (12), Amber Nicole Risovi (13), Robert Sikes (14), Billy Ray Skaggs (15), James Walter Weatherford (16). (jah) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until all defendants have been arrested.) as to Amanda Rose Chamberlain (1), Lee Fogle (2), David Haagensen (3), Roger Wayne Langston (4), Kyle Robert Mieth (5), Joshua James Milson (6), Michael John Mize (7), Michael David Stepich (8), Donald Lance Taylor (9), Melissa Veatch (10). (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until all defendants have been arrested.) as to Sheri Rose Atkins (1), Michael Barrett (2), Charles Boggs (3), Patrick Lee Graydon (4), John Phillip Ishak, Jr (5), Tammy Sue Janicek (6), Megan Kemp (7), Billy James Leverett (8), William Joseph Orozco (9), Joe Darrell Pierce (10), Brittany Sheanna Pierson (11), Veronica Prendez (12), Amber Nicole Risovi (13), Robert Sikes (14), Billy Ray Skaggs (15), James Walter Weatherford (16). (jah) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until all defendants have been arrested.) as to Rondalyn Joy Addison (1), Shawn Douglas Cropp (2), Kacey Croxton (3), Stephanie Ann Hatley (4), Michael Clay Heaslet (5), Michael Jordan (6), Larry Daniel Maxey (7), James Allen Owens (8), Trae Short (9). (jah) [4:16-mj-00162-BJ]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until all defendants have been arrested.) as to Jerry Duarte (1), Billy Fred Gentry, Jr (2), Avelino Gresham (3), Chayce Daniel Hodges (4), Kari Nicole Neal (5), Terry Ryan Nichols (6), Hector Berzosa Pando (7), Martha Jane Rodgers (8), Jonathan Ruckman (9), Chad Shulka (10), Shauna Lynn Vickers (11), Adrian Blair Wallace (12), Michael Lyle Young (13), Brian Lee Zimmerman (14). (jah) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2016
Arrest of Brian Matthew Brown, Nikie Nicole Frye, Michael Sean Goss, Sarah Sueanne Ragsdale (jah) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Sheri Rose Atkins, Michael Barrett, Amber Nicole Risovi, Robert Sikes, Billy Ray Skaggs, James Walter Weatherford (jah) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Sheri Rose Atkins, Michael Barrett, Amber Nicole Risovi, Robert Sikes, Billy Ray Skaggs, James Walter Weatherford (jah) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
3 3 (Document Restricted) APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, ORDER, AND WRIT ISSUED as to Chayce Daniel Hodges to Appear Instanter before United States Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton, Issued Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/1/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
3 3 (Document Restricted) APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, ORDER, AND WRIT ISSUED as to Amanda Rose Chamberlain to Appear Instanter before United States Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton, Issued Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/1/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
4 4 (Document Restricted) APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, ORDER, AND WRIT ISSUED as to Raul Rangel to Appear Instanter before United States Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton, Issued Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/1/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00164-BJ]
Related: [-]
4 4 (Document Restricted) APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, ORDER, AND WRIT ISSUED as to Lee Fogle to Appear Instanter before United States Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton, Issued Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/1/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
5 5 (Document Restricted) APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, ORDER, AND WRIT ISSUED as to James Marcus Laxson to Appear Instanter before United States Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton, Issued Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/1/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
5 5 (Document Restricted) APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, ORDER, AND WRIT ISSUED as to Drew Justice Windsor to Appear Instanter before United States Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton Issued Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/1/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00164-BJ]
Related: [-]
5 5 (Document Restricted) APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, ORDER, AND WRIT ISSUED as to David Haagensen to Appear Instanter before United States Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton, Issued Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/1/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
6 6 (Document Restricted) APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, ORDER, AND WRIT ISSUED as to Adrian Blair Wallace to Appear Instanter before United States Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton, Issued Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/1/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
7 7 (Document Restricted) APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, ORDER, AND WRIT ISSUED as to Melissa Mae Sherman to Appear Instanter before United States Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton, Issued Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/1/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
7 7 (Document Restricted) APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, ORDER, AND WRIT ISSUED as to Michael John Mize to Appear Instanter before United States Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton, Issued Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/1/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
8 8 (Document Restricted) APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, ORDER, AND WRIT ISSUED as to Melissa Veatch to Appear Instanter before United States Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton, Issued Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/1/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 02, 2016
Arrest of Chad Shulka (jah) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Kevin Kyle Killough (jah) Modified on 4/7/2016 (jah). [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2016
8 8 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Catherine R Dunnavant for Michael Barrett appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the[LINK:Attorney Timekeeping System] immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/4/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney James P Whalen for Brian Matthew Brown appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the[LINK:Attorney Timekeeping System] immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/4/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
10 10 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney James Joseph Mongaras, Jr for Chad Shulka appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the[LINK:Attorney Timekeeping System] immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/4/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
11 11 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Doyle Raymond Bunch, III for Billy Ray Skaggs appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the[LINK:Attorney Timekeeping System] immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/4/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
12 12 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Avelino Gresham, Hector Berzosa Pando, Jonathan Ruckman, Chad Shulka held on 4/4/2016. Date of Arrest: 4/1/2016 for Defts Gresham, Pando & Ruckman; Date of Arrest 4/2/16 for Deft Shulka; Defts executed financial affidavit; O/appointing atty John Key for Deft Gresham; atty Philip Ray for Deft Pando; atty Robin McCarty for Deft Ruckman; Preliminary & detenton hearing set 4/7/16 at 2:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Cureton; O/temp detention entered; Defts remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - n/a. (Court Reporter: Remote Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :04. (jah) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
13 13 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Brian Matthew Brown, Nikie Nicole Frye, Michael Sean Goss, Sarah Sueanne Ragsdale held on 4/4/2016. Date of Arrest: 4/1/2016. Defts executed financial affidavits; o/appointing atty James Whalen for Deft Brown; atty Camille Knight for Deft Frye; atty Mark Danielson for Deft Goss; and atty Paul Lund for Deft Ragsdale entered; Preliminary & detention hearing set 4/8/16 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Cureton; o/temp detention entered; Defts remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - n/a. (Court Reporter: Remote Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :04. (jah) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
13 13 Electronic ORDER: It is ordered that the complaint may be unsealed as to the following defendants only: Sheri Rose Atkins, Michael Barrett, John Phillip Ishak, Jr, Amber Nicole Risovi, Robert Sikes, Billy Ray Skaggs, James Walter Weatherford, who are currently in federal custody. All other defendants to remain sealed until arrested and in federal custody. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/4/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
13 13 Electronic ORDER: It is ordered that the complaint may be unsealed as to the following defendants only: Sheri Rose Atkins, Michael Barrett, John Phillip Ishak, Jr, Amber Nicole Risovi, Robert Sikes, Billy Ray Skaggs, James Walter Weatherford, who are currently in federal custody. All other defendants to remain sealed until arrested and in federal custody. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/4/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
14 14 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Brian Matthew Brown. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
14 14 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Sheri Rose Atkins, Michael Barrett, Amber Nicole Risovi, Robert Sikes, Billy Ray Skaggs, James Walter Weatherford held on 4/4/2016. Date of Arrest: 4/1/2016: Defts execute financial affidavits; O/appointing atty Brian O'Shea for Deft Atkins; atty Catherine Dunnavant for Deft Barrett; atty Steve Jumes for Deft Risovi; atty Patrick Barkman for Deft Sikes; atty Doyle Trey Bunch for Deft Skaggs; atty Dimitri Dube for Deft Weatherford; Preliminary & Detention hearing set 4/7/16 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Cureton; O/temp detention entered; Deft Risovi advises correct name is AMANDA NICOLE RISOVI Court ordered clerk to correct; Defts remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - n/a. (Court Reporter: Remote Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :06. (jah) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
14 14 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Sheri Rose Atkins, Michael Barrett, Amber Nicole Risovi, Robert Sikes, Billy Ray Skaggs, James Walter Weatherford held on 4/4/2016. Date of Arrest: 4/1/2016: Defts execute financial affidavits; O/appointing atty Brian O'Shea for Deft Atkins; atty Catherine Dunnavant for Deft Barrett; atty Steve Jumes for Deft Risovi; atty Patrick Barkman for Deft Sikes; atty Doyle Trey Bunch for Deft Skaggs; atty Dimitri Dube for Deft Weatherford; Preliminary & Detention hearing set 4/7/16 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Cureton; O/temp detention entered; Deft Risovi advises correct name is AMANDA NICOLE RISOVI Court ordered clerk to correct; Defts remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - n/a. (Court Reporter: Remote Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :06. (jah) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
16 16 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Chad Shulka. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
16 16 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Michael Barrett. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
17 17 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Avelino Gresham, Hector Berzosa Pando, Jonathan Ruckman, Chad Shulka. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION AND SCHEDULING DETENTION AND PRELIMINARY HEARING as to Avelino Gresham, Hector Berzosa Pando, Jonathan Ruckman, Chad Shulka: Detention Hearing set for 4/7/2016 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/4/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
18 18 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Brian Matthew Brown, Nikie Nicole Frye, Michael Sean Goss, Sarah Sueanne Ragsdale. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION AND SCHEDULING DETENTION AND PRELIMINARY HEARING as to Brian Matthew Brown, Nikie Nicole Frye, Michael Sean Goss, Sarah Sueanne Ragsdale: Detention Hearing set for 4/8/2016 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/4/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
19 19 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Billy Ray Skaggs. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
21 21 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Sheri Rose Atkins, Michael Barrett, Amanda Nicole Risovi, Robert Sikes, Billy Ray Skaggs, James Walter Weatherford. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
21 21 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Sheri Rose Atkins, Michael Barrett, Amanda Nicole Risovi, Robert Sikes, Billy Ray Skaggs, James Walter Weatherford. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
22 22 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION AND SCHEDULING DETENTION AND PRELIMINARY HEARING as to Sheri Rose Atkins, Michael Barrett, Amanda Nicole Risovi, Robert Sikes, Billy Ray Skaggs, James Walter Weatherford: Detention Hearing set for 4/7/2016 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/4/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
22 22 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION AND SCHEDULING DETENTION AND PRELIMINARY HEARING as to Sheri Rose Atkins, Michael Barrett, Amanda Nicole Risovi, Robert Sikes, Billy Ray Skaggs, James Walter Weatherford: Detention Hearing set for 4/7/2016 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/4/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 05, 2016
13 13 (Document Restricted) APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, ORDER, AND WRIT ISSUED as to Charles Ben Bounds to appear instanter before United States Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton, Issued Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/5/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00170-BJ]
Related: [-]
21 21 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Erin Elizabeth Hendricks for Kevin Kyle Killough appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the[LINK:Attorney Timekeeping System] immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/5/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
22 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Kevin Kyle Killough held on 4/5/2016. Date of Arrest: 4/2/2016. Preliminary and Detention Hearing set for 4/8/2016 at 11:30 a.m. Defendant remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Erin Hendricks. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :03. (mpw) Modified on 4/7/2016 (jah). [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
23 23 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Kevin Kyle Killough. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
24 24 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Erin Elizabeth Hendricks appearing for Kevin Kyle Killough. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
25 25 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Kevin Kyle Killough. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
26 26 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION AND SCHEDULING DETENTION AND PRELIMINARY HEARING as to Kevin Kyle Killough: Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing set for 4/8/2016 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/5/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
27 27 MOTION to Continue Time to Indict filed by USA, Kevin Kyle Killough as to Kevin Kyle Killough. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
28 28 ORDER granting27 Motion to Continue Time to Indict as to Kevin Kyle Killough (9). It is therefore the ORDER of the Court that the time upon which an indictment must be filed in the cause be continued until May 19, 2016. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/5/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2016
18 18 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/1/16 as to Roger Wayne Langston. (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
20 20 (Document Restricted) APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, ORDER, AND WRIT ISSUED as to Billy Fred Gentry, Jr to appear instanter before United States Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton, Issued Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/6/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
22 22 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/2/16 as to Chad Shulka. (jah) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
24 24 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/1/2016 as to Sheri Rose Atkins, Michael Barrett, Amanda Nicole Risovi, Robert Sikes, Billy Ray Skaggs, James Walter Weatherford. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
24 24 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/1/2016 as to Sheri Rose Atkins, Michael Barrett, Amanda Nicole Risovi, Robert Sikes, Billy Ray Skaggs, James Walter Weatherford. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
29 29 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/1/2016 as to Brian Matthew Brown, Nikie Nicole Frye, Michael Sean Goss, Sarah Sueanne Ragsdale. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
31 31 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/2/16 as to Kevin Kyle Killough. (jah) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2016
24 24 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Detention & Preliminary Hearing as to Jonathan Ruckman, Chad Shulka held on 4/7/2016, Court took up Defense Request for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Deft Ruckman - Court grants request but only for the MJ Case if or when the case gets indicted Defense atty will need to file separate request with District Judge; Deft. Ruckman waives PC hearing; Deft Shulka waive Detention hearing; Gov't witnesses Brian Finney & Mike McCurdy sworn & testified; Defense witness Tammy Weems sworn & testified as to Ruckman; Court found PC as to both; O/detention pending trial entered as to both Defts; both Defts continued in custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Summer McKeiver; James Mongaras and Tiffany Talamantez. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :45. (jah) Modified on 4/7/2016 (jah). [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
27 27 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Detention & Preliminary Hearing as to Michael Barrett, Robert Sikes, Billy Ray Skaggs, James Walter Weatherford held on 4/7/2016, Gov't witnesses Travis Dendy, Mike McCurdy, & Cy Crum sworn & testified; Defense witnesses Jimmie Walker & Ben Mendoza sworn & testified as to Deft Barrett; Defense witness Victor Ashbaugh sworn & testified as to Deft Skaggs; Defense witness Courtney Choate sworn & testified as to Deft Weatherford; Defense exhibit 1 admitted as to Deft Barrett; Defense exhibits 1 & 2 admitted as to Deft Weatherford; All exhibits returned to offering party; Court finds PC as to Defts Barrett, Sikes, & Skaggs; o/detention pending trial entered as to Defts Barrett, Sikes, & Skaggs; Court DOES NOT find PC as to Deft Weatherford; Deft Weatherford released from custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Catherine Dunnavant; Patrick Barkman, Doyle "Trey" Bunch; Dimitri Dube. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 2:55. (jah) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
27 27 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Detention & Preliminary Hearing as to Michael Barrett, Robert Sikes, Billy Ray Skaggs, James Walter Weatherford held on 4/7/2016, Gov't witnesses Travis Dendy, Mike McCurdy, & Cy Crum sworn & testified; Defense witnesses Jimmie Walker & Ben Mendoza sworn & testified as to Deft Barrett; Defense witness Victor Ashbaugh sworn & testified as to Deft Skaggs; Defense witness Courtney Choate sworn & testified as to Deft Weatherford; Defense exhibit 1 admitted as to Deft Barrett; Defense exhibits 1 & 2 admitted as to Deft Weatherford; All exhibits returned to offering party; Court finds PC as to Defts Barrett, Sikes, & Skaggs; o/detention pending trial entered as to Defts Barrett, Sikes, & Skaggs; Court DOES NOT find PC as to Deft Weatherford; Deft Weatherford released from custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Catherine Dunnavant; Patrick Barkman, Doyle "Trey" Bunch; Dimitri Dube. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 2:55. (jah) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
28 28 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James Joseph Mongaras, Jr appearing for Chad Shulka (jah) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
32 32 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting17 Motion for Pretrial Detention as to Chad Shulka (10). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/7/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
33 33 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Catherine R Dunnavant appearing for Michael Barrett. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
35 35 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Doyle Raymond Bunch, III appearing for Billy Ray Skaggs. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
37 37 Court's Exhibit List from Detention and Preliminary held 4/7/2016 as to Michael Barrett, James Walter Weatherford. Defendants' exhibits returned to offering attorney. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
38 38 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting21 Motion for Pretrial Detention as to Michael Barrett (2). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/7/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
40 40 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting21 Motion for Pretrial Detention as to Billy Ray Skaggs (15). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/7/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 08, 2016
35 35 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Detention & Preliminary Hearing as to Brian Matthew Brown, Nikie Nicole Frye, Michael Sean Goss, Kevin Kyle Killough held on 4/8/2016, Gov't witness Mike McCurdy sworn & testified; Defense witness Doris Leathers sworn & testified as to Deft Frye; Deft Brown proffered testimony; Deft Goss proffered testimony; Deft Killough waives Detention, Court will allow Deft Killough to reopen detention at later date; Court finds PC as to all Defts; O/detention pending trial as to Deft Brown, Goss & Killough; Deft Frye executed PR bond & advised of conditions of pretrial release; O/setting conditions of pretrial release as to Deft Frye entered; Defts Brown, Goss, & Killough continued in custody; Deft Frye released on conditions. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - James Whalen, Camille Knight, Mark Danielson, Erin Hendricks. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 1:30. (jah) Modified on 4/14/2016 (jah). [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
36 36 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James P Whalen appearing for Brian Matthew Brown. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
39 39 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting18 Motion for Pretrial Detention as to Brian Matthew Brown (2). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/8/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
42 42 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting25 Motion for Pretrial Detention as to Kevin Kyle Killough (9). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/8/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 12, 2016
Billy Fred Gentry, Jr, Chayce Daniel Hodges, Kari Nicole Neal appeared on Writs (jah) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
Raul Rangel appeared on a writ (jah) [4:16-mj-00164-BJ]
Related: [-]
Ashleigh Lyn Allen, Timothy Eric Nimerfroh, Melissa Mae Sherman, Jeri Ann Weiler appeared on writs (jah) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
Lee Fogle, David Haagensen, Melissa Veatch appeared on writs (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
Charles Ben Bounds, Richard Lee Pinto appeared on writs (jah) [4:16-mj-00170-BJ]
Related: [-]
Lee Fogle, David Haagensen, Melissa Veatch appeared on writs (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
16 16 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Raul Rangel held on 4/12/2016. Appeared on writ: 4/12/2016; Deft executed financial affidavit; O/appointing atty Andrew Ottaway entered; Deft waives PC & Detention; Court finds PC; O/detention pending trial entered; Deft allowed to reopen detention at later date; Deft remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Andrew Ottaway. (Court Reporter: Ana Warren) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :02. (jah) [4:16-mj-00164-BJ]
Related: [-]
17 17 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Andrew Ottaway for Raul Rangel appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the[LINK:Attorney Timekeeping System] immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/12/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00164-BJ]
Related: [-]
18 18 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Raul Rangel. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00164-BJ]
Related: [-]
19 19 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew Ottaway appearing for Raul Rangel. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00164-BJ]
Related: [-]
20 20 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Raul Rangel. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00164-BJ]
Related: [-]
20 20 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Lee Fogle, David Haagensen, Melissa Veatch held on 4/12/2016. Defts appeared on writs 4/12/2016; Defts executed financial affidavits; O/appointing atty Kevin Ross for Deft Fogle; Atty Brian Salvant for Deft Haagensen; Atty Taly Haffar for Deft Veatch; All Defts waive PC & Detention; Court finds PC as to all Defts; o/detention pending trial entered as to each deft; All defts allowed to reopen detention at later date; Defts remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Kevin Ross, Brian Salvant, Taly Haffar. (Court Reporter: Ana Warren) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :02. (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
20 20 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Lee Fogle, David Haagensen, Melissa Veatch held on 4/12/2016. Defts appeared on writs 4/12/2016; Defts executed financial affidavits; O/appointing atty Kevin Ross for Deft Fogle; Atty Brian Salvant for Deft Haagensen; Atty Taly Haffar for Deft Veatch; All Defts waive PC & Detention; Court finds PC as to all Defts; o/detention pending trial entered as to each deft; All defts allowed to reopen detention at later date; Defts remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Kevin Ross, Brian Salvant, Taly Haffar. (Court Reporter: Ana Warren) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :02. (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
21 21 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting20 Motion for Pretrial Detention as to Raul Rangel (4). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/12/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00164-BJ]
Related: [-]
21 21 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Kevin B Ross for Lee Fogle appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the[LINK:Attorney Timekeeping System] immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/12/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
22 22 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Brian Wayne Salvant for David Haagensen appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the[LINK:Attorney Timekeeping System] immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/12/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
23 23 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Taly Haffar for Melissa Veatch appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the[LINK:Attorney Timekeeping System] immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/12/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
24 24 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Lee Fogle. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
25 25 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by David Haagensen. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
26 26 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Melissa Veatch. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
27 27 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kevin B Ross appearing for Lee Fogle. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
28 28 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brian Wayne Salvant appearing for David Haagensen. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
29 29 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Taly Haffar appearing for Melissa Veatch. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
29 29 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Charles Ben Bounds, Richard Lee Pinto held on 4/12/2016. Defts appeared on writs: 4/12/2016. Defts executed financial affidavit; O/appointing atty Mark Danielson for Deft Bounds; atty Pia Lederman for Deft Pinto; Deft Bounds set for Preliminary & Detention Hearing on Tuesday, April 19, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Cureton; O/temp detention entered as to Deft Bounds; Deft Pinto waives PC & Detention; Court finds PC as to Deft Pinto; O/detention pending trial entered as to Deft Pinto; Deft Pinto allowed to reopen detention at later date; Both Defts remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Mark Danielson, Pia Lederman. (Court Reporter: Ana Warren) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :02. (jah) [4:16-mj-00170-BJ]
Related: [-]
30 30 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Lee Fogle, David Haagensen, Melissa Veatch. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
30 30 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Mark R Danielson for Charles Ben Bounds appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the[LINK:Attorney Timekeeping System] immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/12/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00170-BJ]
Related: [-]
30 30 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Lee Fogle, David Haagensen, Melissa Veatch. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
31 31 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting30 Motion for Pretrial Detention as to Lee Fogle (2). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/12/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
32 32 ELECTRONIC ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Charles Ben Bounds. Detention & Preliminary Hearing set for 4/19/2016 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/12/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00170-BJ]
Related: [-]
32 32 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting30 Motion for Pretrial Detention as to David Haagensen (3). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/12/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
33 33 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting30 Motion for Pretrial Detention as to Melissa Veatch (10). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/12/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
33 33 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark R Danielson appearing for Charles Ben Bounds. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00170-BJ]
Related: [-]
35 35 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Chad Shulka (Smith-DOJ, Shawn) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
35 35 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Charles Ben Bounds. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00170-BJ]
Related: [-]
37 37 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Billy Fred Gentry, Jr, Chayce Daniel Hodges, Kari Nicole Neal held on 4/12/2016. Defts appeared on writs: 4/12/2016. Defts executed financial affidavit; O/appointing attys Michael Harris for Deft Gentry; Atty Preston Jones for Deft Hodges; Atty Shawn Paschall for Deft Neal; Deft Gentry set for preliminary & detention hearing on Tuesday, April 19, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Cureton; O/temp detention entered as to Deft Gentry; Defts Hodges & Neal waive PC & detention hearing; Court find PC as to Defts Hodges & Neal; o/detention pending trial entered as to Defts Hodges & Neal; Defts Hodges & Neal allowed to reopen detention at later date; All Defts remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Michael Harris; Preston Jones, Shawn Paschall. (Court Reporter: Ana Warren) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :02. (jah) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
37 37 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Charles Ben Bounds, Richard Lee Pinto. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00170-BJ]
Related: [-]
38 38 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Michael Ray Harris for Billy Fred Gentry, Jr appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the[LINK:Attorney Timekeeping System] immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/12/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
39 39 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Preston Lee Jones for Chayce Daniel Hodges appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the[LINK:Attorney Timekeeping System] immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/12/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
41 41 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Billy Fred Gentry, Jr. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
42 42 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Chayce Daniel Hodges. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
43 43 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Brian Matthew Brown (Smith-DOJ, Shawn) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
44 44 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Ray Harris appearing for Billy Fred Gentry, Jr. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
44 44 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA , Michael Barrett as to Michael Barrett (Smith-DOJ, Shawn) Modified on 4/13/2016 (npk). [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
45 45 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Preston Lee Jones appearing for Chayce Daniel Hodges. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
47 47 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Billy Fred Gentry, Jr, Chayce Daniel Hodges, Kari Nicole Neal. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
47 47 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Ashleigh Lyn Allen, Timothy Eric Nimerfroh, Melissa Mae Sherman, Jeri Ann Weiler held on 4/12/2016. Appeared on Writs 4/12/2016; Defts executed financial affidavits; O/appointing atty Dimitri Dube for Deft Allen; Atty Anthony Green for Deft Nimerfroh; atty Loren Green for Deft Sherman; atty Ken Cutrer for Deft Weiler; All defts waive PC & detention; Court finds PC as to all Defts; O/detention pending trial entered as to each Deft; Defts allowed to reopen detention at later date; Defts remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Dimitri Dube, Anthony Green, Loren Green, Ken Cutrer. (Court Reporter: Ana Warren) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :02. (jah) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
47 47 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA , Billy Ray Skaggs as to Billy Ray Skaggs (Smith-DOJ, Shawn) Modified on 4/13/2016 (npk). [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
50 50 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Loren Green for Melissa Mae Sherman appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the[LINK:Attorney Timekeeping System] immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/12/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
50 50 ELECTRONIC ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Billy Fred Gentry, Jr. Detention & Preliminary Hearing set for 4/19/2016 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/12/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
53 53 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting47 Motion for Detention as to Chayce Daniel Hodges (4) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/12/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
54 54 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Melissa Mae Sherman. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
58 58 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Loren Green appearing for Melissa Mae Sherman. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
60 60 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Ashleigh Lyn Allen, Timothy Eric Nimerfroh, Melissa Mae Sherman, Jeri Ann Weiler. (mpw) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
63 63 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting60 Motion for Pretrial Detention as to Melissa Mae Sherman (14). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/12/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2016
Arrest of Donald Lance Taylor (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
52 52 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 33 Joint Motion to Continue as to Hector Berzosa Pando (7); granting 34 Joint Motion to Continue as to Jonathan Ruckman (9); granting35 Joint Motion to Continue as to Chad Shulka (10): CONTINUED TO 5/19/16 (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/13/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
64 64 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 43 Joint Motion to Continue as to Sheri Rose Atkins (1); granting 44 Joint Motion to Continue as to Michael Barrett (2); granting 48 Joint Motion to Continue as to John Phillip Ishak Jr. (5); granting 45 Joint Motion to Continue as to Amanda Nicole Risovi (13); granting 46 Joint Motion to Continue as to Robert Sikes (14); granting47 Joint Motion to Continue as to Billy Ray Skaggs (15): continued until 5/19/16 (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/13/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
64 64 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 43 Joint Motion to Continue as to Sheri Rose Atkins (1); granting44 Joint Motion to Continue as to Michael Barrett (2); granting 48 Joint Motion to Continue as to John Phillip Ishak Jr. (5); granting 45 Joint Motion to Continue as to Amanda Nicole Risovi (13); granting 46 Joint Motion to Continue as to Robert Sikes (14); granting 47 Joint Motion to Continue as to Billy Ray Skaggs (15): continued until 5/19/16 (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/13/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
65 65 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting43 Joint Motion to Continue as to Brian Matthew Brown (2); granting 44 Joint Motion to Continue as to Nikie Nicole Frye (6); granting 45 Joint Motion to Continue as to Michael Sean Goss (7); granting 46 Joint Motion to Continue as to Sarah Sueanne Ragsdale (12): Continued to 5/19/16 (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/13/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2016
34 34 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Cody Lee Skipper for Donald Lance Taylor appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the[LINK:Attorney Timekeeping System] immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/14/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
35 35 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Donald Lance Taylor held on 4/14/2016. Date of Arrest: 4/13/2016. Deft executed financial affidavit; O/appointing atty Cody Skipper entered; Preliminary & Detention hearing set 4/19/16 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Cureton; O/temp detention entered; Deft remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Cody Skipper. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :02. (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
36 36 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Donald Lance Taylor (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
37 37 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Donald Lance Taylor (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
38 38 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Cody Lee Skipper appearing for Donald Lance Taylor (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
39 39 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Donald Lance Taylor. Detention & Preliminary Hearing set for 4/19/2016 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/14/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
66 66 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Erin Hendricks filed by Kevin Kyle Killough (Hendricks, Erin) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
74 74 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/13/16 as to Donald Lance Taylor. (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2016
67 67 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting66 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Erin Elizabeth Hendricks withdrawn from case as to Kevin Kyle Killough (9) attorney from the Criminal Justice Act Panel to be appointed. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/15/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
68 68 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Derek D Brown for Kevin Kyle Killough appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the[LINK:Attorney Timekeeping System] immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/15/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 19, 2016
40 40 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Detention & Preliminary Hearing as to Donald Lance Taylor held on 4/19/2016, Deft waives PC & detention hearing; Court finds PC; Deft allowed to reopen detention at a later date; Deft continued in custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Cody Skipper. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :02. (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
41 41 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting37 Motion for Detention as to Donald Lance Taylor (9) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/19/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
44 44 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Detention & Preliminary Hearing as to Charles Ben Bounds held on 4/19/2016, Deft waives PC & Detention; Court finds PC; Court allows Deft to reopen detention at later date; Deft continued in custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Mark Danielson. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :02. (jah) [4:16-mj-00170-BJ]
Related: [-]
45 45 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting37 Motion for Detention as to Charles Ben Bounds (1) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/19/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00170-BJ]
Related: [-]
54 54 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Detention & Preliminary Hearing as to Billy Fred Gentry, Jr held on 4/19/2016, Gov't witness Brian Finney sworn & testified; Defense proffered testimony; Court finds PC; O/detention pending trial entered; Deft continued in custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Michael Harris. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :20. (jah) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
55 55 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting47 Motion for Detention as to Billy Fred Gentry Jr. (2) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/19/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
69 69 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Leigh W Davis for Michael Barrett appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the[LINK:Attorney Timekeeping System] immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/19/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2016
Arrest of Roger Wayne Langston (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
23 23 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Raul Rangel (Smith-DOJ, Shawn) [4:16-mj-00164-BJ]
Related: [-]
42 42 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Lee Fogle (Smith-DOJ, Shawn) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
43 43 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to David Haagensen (Smith-DOJ, Shawn) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
44 44 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Donald Lance Taylor (Smith-DOJ, Shawn) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
45 45 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Melissa Veatch (Smith-DOJ, Shawn) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
46 46 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Charles Ben Bounds (Smith-DOJ, Shawn) [4:16-mj-00170-BJ]
Related: [-]
56 56 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Billy Fred Gentry, Jr (Smith-DOJ, Shawn) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
57 57 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Chayce Daniel Hodges (Smith-DOJ, Shawn) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
70 70 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Melissa Mae Sherman (Smith-DOJ, Shawn) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 21, 2016
53 53 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney J Steven Bush for Roger Wayne Langston appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the[LINK:Attorney Timekeeping System] immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/21/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
54 54 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Roger Wayne Langston held on 4/21/2016. Date of Arrest: 4/20/2016. Deft executed financial affidavit; O/appointing Atty Steven Bush entered; Preliminary & Detention hearing set 4/26/16 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Cureton; O/temp detention entered; Deft remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Steven Bush. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :03. (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
55 55 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Roger Wayne Langston (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
56 56 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J Steven Bush appearing for Roger Wayne Langston (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
57 57 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Roger Wayne Langston (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
58 58 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Roger Wayne Langston. Detention & Preliminary Hearing set for 4/26/2016 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/21/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2016
Amanda Rose Chamberlain, Michael John Mize appeared on writs (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
Michael Christopher Hofman, Drew Justice Windsor appeared on writs (jah) [4:16-mj-00164-BJ]
Related: [-]
Amanda Rose Chamberlain, Michael John Mize appeared on writs (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
24 24 EELCTRONIC ORDER granting23 Motion to Continue as to Raul Rangel (4): continued until 5/19/2016. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/22/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00164-BJ]
Related: [-]
25 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Michael Christopher Hofman, Drew Justice Windsor held on 4/22/2016. Date of Arrest: 4/22/2016. Both defendants waive PC and Detention hearings. Both defendants were remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Williams Biggs for Michael Christopher Hofman; Brett Boone for Drew Justice Windsor. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :02. (trt) [4:16-mj-00164-BJ]
Related: [-]
27 27 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Drew Justice Windsor (trt) [4:16-mj-00164-BJ]
Related: [-]
29 29 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Brett D Boone for Drew Justice Windsor appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the[LINK:Attorney Timekeeping System] immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/22/2016) (trt) [4:16-mj-00164-BJ]
Related: [-]
31 31 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brett D Boone appearing for Drew Justice Windsor (trt) [4:16-mj-00164-BJ]
Related: [-]
32 32 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Michael Christopher Hofman, Drew Justice Windsor (trt) [4:16-mj-00164-BJ]
Related: [-]
34 34 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Drew Justice Windsor. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/25/2016) (trt). [4:16-mj-00164-BJ]
Related: [-]
49 49 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting46 Motion to Continue as to Charles Ben Bounds (1); granting 48 Motion to Continue as to Michael Louis Debusk (2); granting 47 Motion to Continue as to Richard Lee Pinto (5): continued until 5/19/2016. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/22/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00170-BJ]
Related: [-]
52 52 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting42 Motion to Continue as to Lee Fogle (2); granting 43 Motion to Continue as to David Haagensen (3); granting 44 Motion to Continue as to Donald Lance Taylor (9); granting 45 Motion to Continue as to Melissa Veatch (10): continued until 5/19/2016. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/22/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
52 52 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 42 Motion to Continue as to Lee Fogle (2); granting43 Motion to Continue as to David Haagensen (3); granting 44 Motion to Continue as to Donald Lance Taylor (9); granting 45 Motion to Continue as to Melissa Veatch (10): continued until 5/19/2016. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/22/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
59 59 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting56 Motion to Continue as to Billy Fred Gentry Jr. (2); granting 57 Motion to Continue as to Chayce Daniel Hodges (4); granting 58 Motion to Continue as to Kari Nicole Neal (5): continued until 5/19/2016. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/22/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
59 59 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Tracie L Tippen for Amanda Rose Chamberlain appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the[LINK:Attorney Timekeeping System] immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/22/2016) (plp) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
60 60 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Cody L Cofer for Michael John Mize appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the[LINK:Attorney Timekeeping System] immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/22/2016) (plp) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
61 61 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Amanda Rose Chamberlain, Michael John Mize held on 4/22/2016. Date of Federal Custody: 4/22/2016. Defts execute financial affidavits; O/appointing atty Tracie Tippen for Deft Chamberlain; O/appointing atty Cody Cofer for Deft Mize. Deft Chamberlain waives PC & Det Hearing. O/detention entered for deft Chamberlain. Preliminary & Detention hearings set for Deft Mize 4/26/2016 at 10:30 am. O/temporary detention entered as to Deft Mize. Defts remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Tracie Tippen for Amanda Chamberlain; Cody Cofer for Michael Mize. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 00:02. (plp) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
61 61 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Amanda Rose Chamberlain, Michael John Mize held on 4/22/2016. Date of Federal Custody: 4/22/2016. Defts execute financial affidavits; O/appointing atty Tracie Tippen for Deft Chamberlain; O/appointing atty Cody Cofer for Deft Mize. Deft Chamberlain waives PC & Det Hearing. O/detention entered for deft Chamberlain. Preliminary & Detention hearings set for Deft Mize 4/26/2016 at 10:30 am. O/temporary detention entered as to Deft Mize. Defts remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Tracie Tippen for Amanda Chamberlain; Cody Cofer for Michael Mize. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 00:02. (plp) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
62 62 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Amanda Rose Chamberlain (plp) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
63 63 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Michael John Mize (plp) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
64 64 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Tracie L Tippen appearing for Amanda Rose Chamberlain (plp) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
65 65 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Cody L Cofer appearing for Michael John Mize (plp) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
66 66 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Amanda Rose Chamberlain, Michael John Mize (plp) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
66 66 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Amanda Rose Chamberlain, Michael John Mize (plp) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
67 67 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Amanda Rose Chamberlain. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/22/2016) (plp) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
68 68 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Michael John Mize. Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing set for 4/26/2016 10:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 508, 501 W. 10th St., Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/22/2016) (plp) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
73 73 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 72 Motion to Continue as to Ashleigh Lyn Allen (1); granting 69 Motion to Continue as to Timothy Eric Nimerfroh (11); granting70 Motion to Continue as to Melissa Mae Sherman (14); granting 71 Motion to Continue as to Jeri Ann Weiler (15): continued until 5/19/2016. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/22/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2016
70 70 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Detention & Preliminary Hearing as to Roger Wayne Langston, Michael John Mize held on 4/26/2016, Gov't witness Mike McCurdy sworn & testified; Deft Langston proffered testimony; Court finds PC as to both Defts; O/detention pending trial entered as to both Defts; Both defts continued in custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Steven Bush & Cody Cofer. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :35. (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
71 71 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting57 Motion for Detention as to Roger Wayne Langston (4) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/26/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
72 72 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting66 Motion for Detention as to Michael John Mize (7) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/26/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2016
81 81 (Document Restricted) CJA 20 Order authorizing payment to attorney. Payment of $1,531.20 per voucher number 160422000038 made to Erin Hendricks in case as to Kevin Kyle Killough. For information regarding this document, please write to: US District Court, Attention: Finance Department, 1100 Commerce St., Rm. 1452, Dallas, TX 75242. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/19/2016) (mpw) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 28, 2016
Michael Clay Heaslet appeared on ASR (jah) [4:16-mj-00162-BJ]
Related: [-]
56 56 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Curt Crum for Michael Clay Heaslet appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the[LINK:Attorney Timekeeping System] immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/28/2016) (tln) [4:16-mj-00162-BJ]
Related: [-]
57 57 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Michael Clay Heaslet held on 4/28/2016. Date of Arrest (Appeared on ASR): 4/28/2016. Deft waives PC & Detention. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Curt Crum. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :01. (Interpreter n/a.) (tln) [4:16-mj-00162-BJ]
Related: [-]
58 58 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Curt Crum appearing for Michael Clay Heaslet. (tln) [4:16-mj-00162-BJ]
Related: [-]
59 59 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Michael Clay Heaslet. (tln) [4:16-mj-00162-BJ]
Related: [-]
60 60 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Michael Clay Heaslet. (tln) [4:16-mj-00162-BJ]
Related: [-]
61 61 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Michael Clay Heaslet (5). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/28/2016) (tln) [4:16-mj-00162-BJ]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2016
Adrian Blair Wallace appeared on a writ (jah) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
79 79 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney Robert E Luttrell, III for Adrian Blair Wallace appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown. Appointed counsel should use the[LINK:Attorney Timekeeping System] immediately and throughout representation in district court. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the appointing judges courtroom deputy. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/29/2016) (tln) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
80 80 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Initial Appearance as to Adrian Blair Wallace held on 4/29/2016. Date of Arrest (Appeared on writ): 4/29/2016. Deft remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Robert Luttrell. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :02. (Interpreter n/a.) (tln) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
81 81 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Adrian Blair Wallace. (tln) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
82 82 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert E Luttrell, III appearing for Adrian Blair Wallace. (tln) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
83 83 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA as to Adrian Blair Wallace. (tln) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
84 84 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION AND SCHEDULING PRELIMINARY AND DETENTION HEARING as to Adrian Blair Wallace. Upon motion of the Assistant United States Attorney, it is ordered that a detention1 and preliminary hearing is set for Wednesday, May 4, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. before United States Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton, 501 W. lOth Street, Fort Worth, Texas. All attorneys are required to appear in court 15 minutes prior to the hearing. It is further ordered that pending this hearing, the defendant shall be detained in the custody of the United States Marshal and produced for the hearing set forth above. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 4/29/2016) (tln) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 03, 2016
Arrest of James Marcus Laxson in District of Colorado/Denver. (jah) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 04, 2016
85 85 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Detention & Preliminary Hearing as to Adrian Blair Wallace held on 5/4/2016, Deft orally waives preliminary & detention ; court finds PC; Deft allowed to reopen detention; O/detention pending trial entered; Deft continued in custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Robert Luttrell. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :02. (jah) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
86 86 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton: Detention & Preliminary Hearing as to Adrian Blair Wallace held on 5/4/2016, Deft orally waives preliminary & Detention hearing; Court finds PC; deft allowed to reopen detention at later date; O/detention pending trial entered. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Shawn Smith; Defense - Robert Luttrell. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :02. (jah) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
87 87 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL granting83 Motion for Detention as to Adrian Blair Wallace (12) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 5/4/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2016
89 89 Rule 5 Documents Received as to James Marcus Laxson Date Arrested: 5/3/16 (jah) [4:16-mj-00169-BJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2016
72 72 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney, added attorney Thomas G Pappas,Thomas G Pappas for Michael Clay Heaslet,Thomas G Pappas for Michael Clay Heaslet. Motion filed by Michael Clay Heaslet as to Michael Clay Heaslet (Pappas, Thomas) [4:16-mj-00162-BJ]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 12, 2016
73 73 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting72 Unopposed Motion for Substitution of Counsel as to Michael Clay Heaslet (5): Tom Pappas is substituted in place of appointed counsel Curt Crum. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 5/12/2016) (jah)[4:16-mj-00162-BJ]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2016
89 89 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney, added attorney Thomas G Pappas,Thomas G Pappas for Adrian Blair Wallace,Thomas G Pappas for Adrian Blair Wallace. Motion filed by Adrian Blair Wallace as to Adrian Blair Wallace (Pappas, Thomas) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
96 96 Second MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Michael Barrett (Smith-DOJ, Shawn) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
97 97 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting96 Second Joint Motion to Continue Time to Indict as to Michael Barrett (2): Continued to 6/16/16 (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 5/13/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00166-BJ]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2016
76 76 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Michael Clay Heaslet (Smith-DOJ, Shawn) [4:16-mj-00162-BJ]
Related: [-]
77 77 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting76 Joint Motion to Continue Time to Indict as to Michael Clay Heaslet (5): Continued until June 16, 2016 (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 5/17/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00162-BJ]
Related: [-]
91 91 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to File Indictment filed by USA as to Adrian Blair Wallace (Smith-DOJ, Shawn) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
93 93 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting89 Motion to Substitute Attorney as to Adrian Blair Wallace (12) attorney Thomas Pappas substituted for appointed attorney Robert Luttrell (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 5/17/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
94 94 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting91 Joint Motion to Continue Time to Indict as to Adrian Blair Wallace (12): continued until June 16, 2016 (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L Cureton on 5/17/2016) (jah) [4:16-mj-00167-BJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2016
CASE MERGED INTO 4:16cr120-A. Terminated merged defendant case, motions, and deadlines/hearings as to David Ryan Haagensen and Kyle Robert Mieth. (tln) [4:16-mj-00163-BJ]
Related: [-]
215 215 5 pgs SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Charles Ben Bounds (12) count(s) 1, Brian Matthew Brown (13) count(s) 1, Amanda Rose Chamberlain (14) count(s) 1, Lee Fogle (15) count(s) 1, Billy Fred Gentry, Jr (16) count(s) 1, Chayce Daniel Hodges (17) count(s) 1, Kevin Kyle Killough (18) count(s) 1, Roger Wayne Langston (19) count(s) 1, James Marcus Laxson (20) count(s) 1, Michael John Mize (21) count(s) 1, Raul Rangel (22) count(s) 1, Martha Jane Rodgers (23) count(s) 1, Melissa Mae Sherman (24) count(s) 1, Chad Shulka (25) count(s) 1, Billy Ray Skaggs (26) count(s) 1, Donald Lance Taylor (27) count(s) 1, Melissa Veatch (28) count(s) 1, Drew Justice Windsor (29) count(s) 1. (wrb)
Related: [-]
217 217 3 pgs ORDER OF SEVERANCE...The above-captioned criminal case was initiated on December 9, 2015, by the filing of an indictment against eleven defendants. The indictment charged the offense of conspiracy to possess with intent to distribute a controlled substance in violation of 21 U.S.C. § 846, and alleged that the offense charged occurred "(b]eginning in or about 2012, and continuing until on or about November 12, 2015." Indictment at 1. All but one of the defendants named in the indictment have pleaded guilty, three have been sentenced, and all the others who have pleaded guilty are scheduled for sentencing either later this month or next month. The defendant who has not pleaded guilty is, according to the court's understanding, a fugitive.A superseding indictment bearing the criminal case number set forth above was filed on the date of the signing of this order. It recites under the case number shown on its first page that it "Supersedes Indictment returned on December 9, 2015 as to defendants 12-29 only." That recitation is puzzling inasmuch as none of the defendants named in the original indictment is named in the superseding indictment, and "defendants 12-29" are entirely new defendants to this case. The superseding indictment again charges a conspiracy offense in violation of 21 U.S.C.§ 846, but seems to allege a different conspiracy, alleging that the conduct that is subject to the superseding indictment began"in or before January 2014, and continu[ed] until in or around April 2016." Superseding Indictment at 2. Thus, the court can think of no reason why the offense and defendants named in the superseding indictment should be grafted onto Case No. 4:15-CR-271-A. Therefore,The court ORDERS that there be a severance from Case No.4:15-CR-271-A into a newly created Case No. 4:16-CR-132-A the offense charged by the superseding indictment and all defendants named in the superseding indictment, and that the superseding indictment shall be deemed to be the indictment in the newly created Case No. 4:16-CR-132-A and the defendants in the newly created case are to be those named as defendants in the superseding indictment filed in Case No. 4:15-CR-271-A on May 18,2016.The court further ORDERS that the style of the newly created Case No. 4:16-CR-132-A shall be: United States of America v.Charles Ben Bounds, also known as Pretty Boy, Brian Matthew2Brown, also known as Downtown, Amanda Rose Chamberlain, Lee Fogle, Billy Fred Gentry, Jr., also known as Fred Gentry, Chayce Daniel Hodges, also known as Staks, Kevin Kyle Killough, also known as Kilo, Roger Wayne Langston, also known as Big Country,James Marcus Laxson, also known as Monster, Michael John Mize,also known as Miklo, Raul Rangel, also known as J.R., Martha Jane Rodgers, also known as Momma Frost, Melissa Mae Sherman,also known as Littler Bit, Chad Shulka, also known as Russian,Billy Ray Skaggs, Donald Lance Taylor, Melissa Veatch, also known as Missy, and Drew Justice Windsor, also known as Justice Windsor (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 5/18/2016) (wrb) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
Related: [-]