Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Case #: 2:16-cv-00577
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:May 30, 2016
Terminated:Jun 14, 2017
Last checked: Saturday Nov 26, 2016 2:54 AM CST
Counter Claimant
Tencent America, LLC
Represented By
Roger Brian Craft
Findlay Craft PC
contact info
Eric Hugh Findlay
Findlay Craft PC
contact info
Gerald F Ivey
Finnegan, Llp- Washington, Dc
contact info
Guang-Yu Zhu
Finnegan, Llp- Washington, Dc
contact info
Qingyu Yin
Finnegan, Llp- Washington, Dc
contact info
John M Williamson
Finnegan, Llp- Washington, Dc
contact info
Counter Claimant
Tencent Holdings Limited
Represented By
Roger Brian Craft
Findlay Craft PC
contact info
Gerald F Ivey
Finnegan, Llp- Washington, Dc
contact info
Guang-Yu Zhu
Finnegan, Llp- Washington, Dc
contact info
Qingyu Yin
Finnegan, Llp- Washington, Dc
contact info
John M Williamson
Finnegan, Llp- Washington, Dc
contact info
Counter Defendant
Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.
Represented By
Travis Lee Richins
Etheridge Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Ryan Scott Loveless
Etheridge Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Brett Aaron Mangrum
Etheridge Law Group, PLLC
contact info
James L Etheridge
Etheridge Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Uniloc USA, Inc.
Represented By
Travis Lee Richins
Etheridge Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Ryan Scott Loveless
Etheridge Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Brett Aaron Mangrum
Etheridge Law Group, PLLC
contact info
James L Etheridge
Etheridge Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Tencent America, LLC
Represented By
Roger Brian Craft
Findlay Craft PC
contact info
Eric Hugh Findlay
Findlay Craft PC
contact info
Gerald F Ivey
Finnegan, Llp- Washington, Dc
contact info
Guang-Yu Zhu
Finnegan, Llp- Washington, Dc
contact info
Qingyu Yin
Finnegan, Llp- Washington, Dc
contact info
John M Williamson
Finnegan, Llp- Washington, Dc
contact info
Defendant
Tencent Holdings Limited
Represented By
Roger Brian Craft
Findlay Craft PC
contact info
Eric Hugh Findlay
Findlay Craft PC
contact info
Gerald F Ivey
Finnegan, Llp- Washington, Dc
contact info
Guang-Yu Zhu
Finnegan, Llp- Washington, Dc
contact info
Qingyu Yin
Finnegan, Llp- Washington, Dc
contact info
John M Williamson
Finnegan, Llp- Washington, Dc
contact info
Plaintiff
Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.
Represented By
Travis Lee Richins
Etheridge Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Ryan Scott Loveless
Etheridge Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Brett Aaron Mangrum
Etheridge Law Group, PLLC
contact info
James L Etheridge
Etheridge Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Uniloc USA, Inc.
Represented By
Travis Lee Richins
Etheridge Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Ryan Scott Loveless
Etheridge Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Brett Aaron Mangrum
Etheridge Law Group, PLLC
contact info
James L Etheridge
Etheridge Law Group, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, June 15, 2017
37 37 notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Thu 06/15 8:21 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nkl, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2017
36 36 order Order Dismissing Case Thu 06/15 8:19 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/14/2017. (nkl, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2017
35 35 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 06/13 3:25 PM
***FILED IN ERROR*** STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice of Tencent Holdings America, LLC and Tencent Holdings Limited by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc..(Huang, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/13/2017 (ch, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
notice Notice of Docket Correction Tue 06/13 3:45 PM
***FILED IN ERROR. CASE IS CONSOLIDATED PLEASE FILE IN THE LEAD CASE Document # 35, Stipulation of Dismissal. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2017
34 34 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 04/05 4:45 PM
ORDER finding as moot30 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/05/2017. (nkl, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2017
33 33 order Order Referring Case to Mediator Mon 02/06 2:12 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Hon. Edward A. Infante is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced member cases, only. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/6/2017. (nkl, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2016
32 32 order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Create Case Association Wed 12/21 11:47 AM
CONSOIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:16-cv-00566. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE., Cases associated.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/20/2016. (nkl, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2016
31 31 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/09 4:39 PM
Amended ANSWER to Complaint (Dkt. No. 23) by Tencent America, LLC, Tencent Holdings Limited.(Findlay, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2016
30 30 motion Dismiss Mon 10/24 5:15 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Tencent's Counterclaims by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc..(Loveless, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, October 03, 2016
29 29 notice Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference Mon 10/03 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Loveless, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2016
28 28 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/30 2:49 PM
NOTICE by Tencent America, LLC, Tencent Holdings Limited DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER IN RELATED CASE (Craft, Roger)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 09/30 2:20 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tencent America, LLC, Tencent Holdings Limited identifying Corporate Parent Tencent Holdings Limited for Tencent America, LLC; Corporate Parent None for Tencent Holdings Limited. (Craft, Roger)
Related: [-]
26 26 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim Fri 09/30 2:16 PM
TENCENT'S ANSWER to23 Amended Complaint DEFENSES, AND , COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. by Tencent Holdings Limited, Tencent America, LLC.(Craft, Roger)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Fri 09/30 2:45 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (ch, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2016
25 25 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 09/16 7:36 AM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/15/16. (ch, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2016
notice Notice of Docket Correction Tue 09/13 9:57 AM
***FILED IN ERROR. FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY Document # 22, Amended Complaint. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (RE-FILED AT # 23)(ch, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2016
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 09/08 5:29 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re23 Amended Complaint Joint Motion to Extend Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond by Tencent America, LLC, Tencent Holdings Limited.(Craft, Roger)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 06, 2016
23 23 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 09/06 2:46 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tencent America, LLC, Tencent Holdings Limited, filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A..(Etheridge, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - US8571194,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - US7853000
22 22 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 09/06 2:16 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tencent America, LLC, Tencent Holdings Limited, filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A..(Etheridge, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-US8724622,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-US8995433,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-US7535890,
Att: 4 Exhibit D-US8199747
Friday, August 19, 2016
21 21 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 08/19 11:59 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.. Tencent Holdings Limited served on 8/15/2016, answer due 9/5/2016. (ch, )
Related: [-]
20 20 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Fri 08/19 10:29 AM
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Tencent America, LLC. (Craft, Roger)
Related: [-]
text Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Fri 08/19 10:47 AM
Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Tencent America, LLC to 9/6/2016. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2016
19 19 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Fri 08/12 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Qingyu Yin on behalf of Tencent America, LLC, Tencent Holdings Limited. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5883113. (Yin, Qingyu)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2016
18 18 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Tue 08/09 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Guang-Yu Zhu on behalf of Tencent America, LLC, Tencent Holdings Limited. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5876447. (Zhu, Guang-Yu)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2016
17 17 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Mon 08/08 4:58 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Gerald F Ivey on behalf of Tencent America, LLC, Tencent Holdings Limited. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5875734. (Ivey, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2016
16 16 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Wed 08/03 9:01 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John M Williamson on behalf of Tencent America, LLC, Tencent Holdings Limited. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5867786. (Williamson, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2016
15 15 service Summons Issued Wed 07/20 11:25 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to Tencent Holdings Limited. (ch, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2016
14 14 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 07/19 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hugh Findlay on behalf of Tencent America, LLC (Findlay, Eric)
Related: [-]
13 13 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Tue 07/19 11:24 AM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Tencent America, LLC.(Craft, Roger)
Related: [-]
text Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Tue 07/19 11:28 AM
Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Tencent America, LLC to 8/22/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2016
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/18 11:41 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.. Tencent America, LLC served on 7/1/2016, answer due 7/22/2016. (ch, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2016
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Fri 07/15 1:19 PM
FILED IN ERROR NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Proof of Service as to Tencent America,LLC (Loveless, Ryan) Modified on 7/15/2016 (nkl, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Docket Correction Fri 07/15 2:07 PM
***FILED IN ERROR - Please mail executed summons to Clerk's office for processing. Document # 11, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2016
10 10 service Summons Issued Tue 06/21 11:50 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to Tencent America, LLC. (ch, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2016
9 9 order Order Reassigning Case Tue 06/07 8:45 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap for all further proceedings. Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/6/2016. (sm, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2016
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Wed 06/01 5:31 PM
NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Related Cases (Richins, Travis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2016
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 05/31 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Travis Lee Richins on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Richins, Travis)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 05/31 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Aaron Mangrum on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mangrum, Brett)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Tue 05/31 2:22 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Loveless, Ryan)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 05/31 2:21 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Scott Loveless on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Loveless, Ryan)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/31 1:44 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Etheridge, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Designation of Attorney in Charge Tue 05/31 1:43 PM
NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to James L Etheridge on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Etheridge, James)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 05/31 2:06 PM
Case assigned to Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (ch, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Tue 05/31 2:07 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (ch, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 30, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/30 11:02 PM
COMPLAINT of Patent Infringement against Tencent America, LLC, Tencent Holdings Limited ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5765088.), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A..(Etheridge, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - '194 Patent,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - '000 Patent