Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Barbara Ellis-Monro
Case #: 1:16-bk-59291
Case Filed:May 31, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Jun 29, 2016
Terminated:Jan 21, 2021

Debtor
Podponics, Inc.
2140 S DuPont Hwy
Camden, DE 19934-1249
Represented By
Gai Lynn McCarthy
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Edwin K. Palmer
P.O. Box 1284
Decatur, GA 30031
Represented By
Robert A. Bartlett
Ragsdale, Beals, Seigler, Et Al
contact info
William Russell Patterson
Ragsdale Beals Seigler Patterson & Gray
contact info
Ragsdale, Beals, Seigler, Patterson & Gray LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
362 Richard Russell Building 75 Ted Turner Drive, SW
Atlanta, GA 30303


Docket last updated: 05/31/2016 12:01 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 31, 2016
1 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) for Non-Individual Fee $ 335, Filed by Gai Lynn McCarthy on behalf of Podponics, Inc.. Government Proof of Claim due by 11/28/2016. (McCarthy, Gai)
Related: [-]
2 2 Receipt of Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 16-59291 [misc,1011aty] ( 335.00) filing fee. Receipt Number 41892502. Fee Amount 335.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1