California Eastern District Court
Judge:Troy L Nunley
Referred: Edmund F Brennan
Case #: 2:16-cv-01177
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 31, 2016
Terminated:Jun 03, 2016
Last checked: Sunday Nov 27, 2016 1:08 AM PST
Defendant
Cindy D. Lather
2909 Marconi Avenue, Apt. 15
Sacramento, CA 95821
Plaintiff
Vertus Properties, Inc.
Represented By
Esther Anna Ralich
Ralich Law
contact info

GPO Jun 03 2016
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/2/16 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP and REMANDING case to the Superior Court of California, County of Sacramento. Copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED. (Jackson, T)

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, June 03, 2016
3 3 order Order ~Util - Case Remanded Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 06/03 7:38 AM
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/2/16 GRANTING2 Motion to Proceed IFP and REMANDING case to the Superior Court of California, County of Sacramento. Copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED. (Jackson, T)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Fri 06/03 7:39 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:3 Order served on Cindy D. Lather. (Jackson, T)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2016
2 2 motion In Forma Pauperis Tue 05/31 3:58 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Cindy D. Lather. (Zignago, K.)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 05/31 3:58 PM
NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, Case number 16UD02299 filed by Cindy D. Lather. (Zignago, K.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Certificate of Interested Entities or Parties