Member Case
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-10992

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:16-bk-11627
Case Filed:Jun 01, 2016
Terminated:Aug 13, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Blue Sky West Capital, LLC
179 Lincoln St Ste 500
Boston, MA 02111-2427
Represented By
Jay M. Goffman
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 16 minutes ago
Monday, August 13, 2018
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 08/13 10:22 AM
Case Closed. (Ho, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 10, 2018
7 7 order Order, Final Decree Fri 08/10 12:18 PM
Order of Final Decree Authorizing Closing Of Case Signed On 8/10/2018. (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2016
6 6 misc Schedules Wed 07/20 11:30 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual /Schedule of Assets and Liabilities for Blue Sky West Capital, LLC 16-11627 Filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Blue Sky West Capital, LLC. (Oswald, Frank)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Wed 07/20 10:20 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual /Statement of Financial Affairs for Blue Sky West Capital, LLC (Case No. 16-11627 Filed by Scott Eric Ratner on behalf of Blue Sky West Capital, LLC. (Ratner, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2016
misc Case Association - Joint Administration Thu 07/07 10:36 AM
Case Joint Administration. Lead Case No. 16-10992 (SMB) should beconsulted for all matters affecting the above listed case. (Ho, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 04, 2016
4 4 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Sun 06/05 12:23 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 06/04/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #3 )
Thursday, June 02, 2016
3 3 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Thu 06/02 9:12 AM
Notice of Case Reassignment From Judge Sean H. Lane to Judge Stuart M. Bernstein. Judge Stuart M. Bernstein added to the case. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
misc Add Judge Thu 06/02 8:08 AM
Judge Sean H. Lane added to the case. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
misc Case Association -Related Thu 06/02 9:29 AM
Case Related to Case Number: 16-10992 SunEdison Inc., et al. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2016
2 2 5 pgs ans Statement Wed 06/01 9:16 PM
Statement Notice of Commencement of Chapter 11 Cases and Joint Administration filed by Jay M. Goffman on behalf of Blue Sky West Capital, LLC. (Goffman, Jay)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 06/01 8:15 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Jay M. Goffman of Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP on behalf of Blue Sky West Capital, LLC. (Goffman, Jay)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Wed 06/01 8:32 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-11627 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11312351. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1