First Wind Panhandle Holdings III, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-10992
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-10992
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Stuart M Bernstein |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-11629 |
Case Filed: | Jun 01, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 13, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $0 to $50,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
First Wind Panhandle Holdings III, LLC
179 Lincoln St Ste 500
Boston, MA 02111-2427 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 20 minutes ago |
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 08/13 11:03 AM
Case Closed. (Ho, Amanda) |
||
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Order of Final Decree Authorizing Closing Of Case Signed On 8/10/2018. (Barrett, Chantel) |
|
Wednesday, July 20, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual /Schedule of Assets and Liabilities for First Wind Panhandle Holdings III, LLC 16-11629 Filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of First Wind Panhandle Holdings III, LLC. (Oswald, Frank) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual /Statement of Financial Affairs for First Wind Panhandle Holdings III, LLC (Case No. 16-11629 Filed by Scott Eric Ratner on behalf of First Wind Panhandle Holdings III, LLC. (Ratner, Scott) |
|
Saturday, June 04, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 06/04/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, June 02, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Notice of Case Reassignment From Judge Sean H. Lane to Judge Stuart M. Bernstein. Judge Stuart M. Bernstein added to the case. (Porter, Minnie) |
|
misc
Add Judge
Thu 06/02 8:08 AM
Judge Sean H. Lane added to the case. (Porter, Minnie) |
||
misc
Case Related Flag
Thu 06/02 9:31 AM
Case Related to Case Number: 16-10992 SunEdison Inc., et al. (Porter, Minnie) |
||
Wednesday, June 01, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Statement Notice of Commencement of Chapter 11 Cases and Joint Administration filed by Jay M. Goffman on behalf of First Wind Panhandle Holdings III, LLC. (Goffman, Jay) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Jay M. Goffman of Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP on behalf of First Wind Panhandle Holdings III, LLC. (Goffman, Jay) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Wed 06/01 8:32 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-11629 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11312351. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |