Hernandez v. Lombardo et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer A Dorsey |
Referred: | Nancy J Koppe |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-01219 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 01, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 10, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
appeal
Order on Mandate
Thu 06/15 11:23 AM
ORDER on Mandate as to19 USCA Order dismissing14 Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/14/2017. (JM) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 03/21 10:32 AM
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's15 Motion for Permission to File New Complaint and Revoking Permission to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
appeal
Order for Time Schedule
Mon 03/20 10:43 AM
USCA ORDER for Time Schedule as to14 Notice of Appeal filed by Ismael Guillermo Hernandez. USCA Case Number 17-15457 . (JM) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 03/14 4:56 PM
MOTION for Permission to File a New Civil Complaint by Petitioner Ismael Guillermo Hernandez. Responses due by 3/24/2017. (SLD) |
|
14 | 14
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 03/14 4:51 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to12 Clerk's Judgment by Petitioner Ismael Guillermo Hernandez. Filing fee $505 NOT PAID - IFP pending) . E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (SLD) |
|
13 | 13
appeal
Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal
Tue 03/14 4:49 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal filed by Petitioner Ismael Guillermo Hernandez. (E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit.) (SLD) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 02/13 11:03 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Respondents and against Petitioner Ismael Guillermo Hernandez without prejudice. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 2/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Report and Recommendation ~Util - Terminate Case
Mon 02/13 11:00 AM
ORDER that the magistrate judge's8 Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Objection to Report and Recommendation
Fri 02/10 12:00 PM
OBJECTION to8 Report and Recommendation by Petitioner Ismael Guillermo Hernandez. Response to Objections to R&R due by 2/21/2017. (SLD) |
|
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Report and Recommendation
Tue 01/24 10:28 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that this case be dismissed without prejudice to Plaintiff raising his arguments in the proper forum at the proper time. Objections to R&R due by 2/7/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 01/24 10:26 AM
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court will not require an initial partial filing fee to be made at this time. The Court will screen Plaintiff's complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e) by separate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 01/24 3:43 PM
Third AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Attorney General of the State of Nevada, Will Hubbard, Las Vegas Metropolitan Poice Dept DSD, Joe Lombardo, filed by Ismael Guillermo Hernandez. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 4/23/2017.(JM) |
|
Wednesday, October 26, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Receipt of Initiating Documents -- e.g., Complaint with no IFP
Thu 10/27 12:42 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Petitioner Ismael Guillermo Hernandez. (SLD) |
|
Att: 1 Supplemental Pleadings | ||
Thursday, September 15, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Receipt of Initiating Documents -- e.g., Complaint with no IFP
Mon 09/19 1:09 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Petitioner Ismael Guillermo Hernandez. (SLD) |
|
Monday, August 15, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
minord
Minute Order
Mon 08/15 4:51 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe, on 8/15/2016. RE:3 Letter for Status Request. The Court will notify the parties as soon as any action is taken in the case. Due to the large number of civil actions pending before the Court, the Clerk is unable to respond in writing to individual inquiries regarding the status of the case. Neither the Court nor the Clerk's Office can give legal advice. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - courtesy copy of docket sheet mailed - SLD) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Inmate Advisory Letter - NOS 550 & 555
Mon 08/15 4:38 PM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (SLD) |
|
Wednesday, August 10, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Letter for Status Request
Mon 08/15 4:48 PM
LETTER requesting status from Plaintiff Ismael Guillermo Hernandez. (SLD) |
|
Wednesday, June 01, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 06/02 12:47 PM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Ismael Guillermo Hernandez.(SLD) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint |