Prout et al v. St. Paul's School
New Hampshire District Court | |
Judge: | Paul J Barbadoro |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00225 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 01, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 23, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 28, 2016 3:43 AM EST |
Defendant
St. Paul's School
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexander Prout
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susan Prout
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
Terminated: 08/29/2016
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Doe
Terminated: 08/29/2016
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
4
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 01/23 1:33 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to case and Proposed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice by Alexander Prout, Susan Prout(Douglas, Charles) |
|
order
Endorsed Order - not on motion
Tue 01/23 3:13 PM
ENDORSED ORDER RE 42 Stipulation of Dismissal. Text of Order: The case is dismissed with prejudice. The court will retain jurisdiction over any claim for breach of the settlement agreement. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js) |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 01/23 3:24 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (js) |
||
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 12/19 11:38 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 41 Assented to MOTION for Andrew G. Slutkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Attorney Andrew G. Slutkin complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. ECF Registration Deadline set for 12/29/2017.To access the online registration form, click HERE . Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] .(js) |
||
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 12/19 6:23 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 12/19/2017. (Court Reporter: Susan Bateman) (Pltfs Atty: Andrew, G. Slutkin, Charles G. Douglas, III, Steven J. Kelly) (Defts Atty: Peter Bicks, Michael Delaney, Matt Bush)(Total Hearing Time: 5 minutes) (js) |
||
minutes
Settlement Conference/Mediation
Tue 12/19 6:25 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 12/19/2017. (Pltfs Atty: Andrew, G. Slutkin, Charles G. Douglas, III, Steven J. Kelly) (Defts Atty: Peter Bicks, Michael A. Delaney, Matt Bush)(Total Hearing Time: 4 hours 30 minutes) (js) |
||
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
3
pgs
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 12/18 4:25 PM
Assented to MOTION for Andrew G. Slutkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1599383.) filed by Alexander Prout, Susan Prout.(Douglas, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Andrew Slutkin | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Mon 12/18 4:13 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 12/18/2017. (Pltfs Atty: Charles G. Douglas, III, Steven J. Kelly) (Defts Atty: Peter Bicks, Michael Delaney)(Total Hearing Time: 30 minutes) (js) |
||
notice
Rescheduling Hearing Notice
Mon 12/18 4:15 PM
RESCHEDULING NOTICE of Hearing. TIME CHANGE ONLY TO 1:00 PM. Status Conference set for 12/19/2017 01:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js) |
||
notice
ECF - Filing Error - Info Only
Mon 12/18 5:33 PM
NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re:41 Assented to MOTION for Andrew G. Slutkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1599383.) filed by Alexander Prout, Susan Prout. Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing, affidavits prepared in the context of the litigation shall be filed in electronically converted PDF format and shall contain a /s/ signature for both the signator and the notary/jurat. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1475.(js) |
||
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
notice
Hearing Notice
Fri 12/15 3:16 PM
NOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Conference set for 12/18/2017 03:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The court will provide counsel with conference call instructions.(js) |
||
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
order
Protective Order
Wed 11/15 3:07 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js) |
|
39 | 39
motion
Amend
Wed 11/15 10:25 AM
Assented to MOTION to Amend24 Protective Order filed by St. Paul's School.(Folsom, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Attachment B to Proposed Amended Protective Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Amended Protective Order | ||
order
Order on Motion to Amend
Wed 11/15 3:06 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 39 Assented to Motion to Amend 24 Protective Order. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js) |
||
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Extend Time
Mon 10/30 9:48 AM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to file motions for summary judgment and make expert disclosures to dates TBD at 12/19/2017 status conference filed by St. Paul's School.(Felmly, Bruce) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Civil Form 3 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Mon 10/30 3:19 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 38 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to file motions for summary judgment and make expert disclosures to dates TBD at 12/19/2017 status conference. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js) |
||
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
56
pgs
misc
Transcript
Tue 10/03 4:23 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings for Motion to Modify Scheduling Order held on September 20, 2017. Court Reporter: Liza Dubois, Telephone # 603 225-1442. Transcript is available for public inspection, but may not be copied or otherwise reproduced, at the Clerk's Office for a period of 90 days. Additionally, only attorneys of record and pro se parties with an ECF login and password who purchase a transcript from the court reporter will have access to the transcript through PACER during this 90-day period. If you would like to order a copy, please contact the court reporter at the above listed phone number. NOTICE: Any party who requests an original transcript has 21 days from service of this notice to determine whether it is necessary to redact any personal identifiers and, if so, to electronically file a Redaction Request. Redaction Request Follow Up 10/24/2017. Redacted Transcript Follow Up 11/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/29/2017.(js) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
minutes
Motion Hearing Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 09/20 3:56 PM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro re MOTION HEARING held on 9/20/2017 re27 MOTION for Pretrial Conference to Modify Scheduling Order. Motion granted in part and denied in part for reasons stated on the record. By agreement of the parties, the case is removed from the trial calendar and a further status conference will be scheduled in 90 days. (Court Reporter: Liza Dubois) (Pltfs Atty: Stephen G. Grygiel, Steven J. Kelly, Charles G. Douglas, III) (Defts Atty: Bruce W. Felmly, Michael A. Delaney, Jennifer L. Parent, Elyse D. Echtman)(Total Hearing Time: 1 hour 5 minutes) (js) |
||
utility
Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC
Wed 09/20 4:00 PM
Deadlines terminated re: Trial Notice- Jury trial removed from the March 2018 trial calendar, final pretrial conference cancelled. (js) |
||
notice
Hearing Notice
Wed 09/20 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 12/19/2017 02:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js) |
||
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 09/19 12:24 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 35 Assented to Motion for Elyse D. Echtman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Elyse D. Echtman, Esq. complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. ECF Registration Deadline set for 9/29/2017. To access the online registration form, click HERE . Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] .(js) |
||
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 09/19 12:25 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 36 Assented to Motion for Peter Bicks to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Peter Bicks, Esq. complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. ECF Registration Deadline set for 9/29/2017.To access the online registration form, click HERE . Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] .(js) |
||
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
2
pgs
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 09/18 4:43 PM
Assented to MOTION for Peter Bicks to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1562412.) filed by St. Paul's School.(Felmly, Bruce) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Peter Bicks, Esq. | ||
35 | 35
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 09/18 4:38 PM
Assented to MOTION for Elyse D. Echtman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1562407.) filed by St. Paul's School.(Felmly, Bruce) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Elyse D. Echtman, Esq. | ||
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
2
pgs
notice
Attorney Appearance
Wed 09/13 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer L. Parent on behalf of St. Paul's School Attorney Jennifer L. Parent added to party St. Paul's School(pty:dft).(Parent, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
notice
Motion Hearing
Fri 09/01 10:04 AM
NOTICE re:27 MOTION for Pretrial Conference to Modify Scheduling Order Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2017 02:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(vln) |
||
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Thu 08/31 12:00 PM
ORDER granting 32 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to 12/01/2017 for Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js) |
|
notice
Motion Hearing
Thu 08/31 12:02 PM
NOTICE re:27 MOTION for Pretrial Conference to Modify Scheduling Order. Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2017 10:00 AM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js) |
||
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
3
pgs
motion
Extend Time
Wed 08/30 1:06 PM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to 12/01/2017 for Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures filed by Alexander Prout, Susan Prout.(Douglas, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit 1- Civil Form 3, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order 2- Proposed Order | ||
notice
ECF - Filing Error - Info Only
Wed 08/30 2:19 PM
NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re:32 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to 12/01/2017 for Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures filed by Alexander Prout, Susan Prout. Filer used the wrong event. Filer should have used Continue and Extend Deadlines. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1475.(js) |
||
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Reply to Objection to Motion
Wed 08/23 6:28 PM
REPLY to Objection to Motion re27 MOTION for Pretrial Conference to Modify Scheduling Order filed by St. Paul's School. (Felmly, Bruce) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Wed 08/23 4:31 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 30 Motion for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Partial Objection [Doc.No 28] to St. Paul's School's Motion for Pretrial Conference [Doc.No. 27]. Text of Order: Granted. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion for Leave to File using the appropriate event in CMECF. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js) |
||
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Leave to File
Tue 08/22 4:52 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Partial Objection [Doc.No 28] to St. Paul's School's Motion for Pretrial Conference [Doc.No. 27] filed by St. Paul's School. Follow up on Objection on 9/5/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Felmly, Bruce) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Reply | ||
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Intent to Reply
Fri 08/18 9:38 AM
Notice of Intent to Reply to Objection to27 MOTION for Pretrial Conference to Modify Scheduling Order . Follow up on Reply on 9/1/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Folsom, Benjamin) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Objection to Motion
Thu 08/17 12:06 PM
OBJECTION to27 MOTION for Pretrial Conference to Modify Scheduling Order (Partial) filed by Alexander Prout, Susan Prout.(Douglas, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order 1- Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 4 pgs Exhibit A- Defendant's DeBenedetto Disclosure | ||
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
10
pgs
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 08/03 12:27 PM
MOTION for Pretrial Conference to Modify Scheduling Order filed by St. Paul's School. HEARING REQUESTED. Follow up on Objection on 8/17/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Felmly, Bruce) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit 1 - AG News Release, | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit 2 - Concord Monitor Article, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Union Leader Article, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Civil Form 3 | ||
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/09 3:43 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 26 Assented to Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anna S. Kelly, Esquire. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Anna S. Kelly, Esq. complete an online ECF Registration Form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. ECF Registration Deadline set for 2/21/2017.To access the online registration form, click HERE . Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] .(js) |
||
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 02/08 3:32 PM
Assented to MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anna S. Kelly, Esquire (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1476388.) filed by Alexander Prout, Susan Prout.(Douglas, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit (Affidavit) of Anna Kelly | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
misc
Mediation Statement
Wed 02/08 3:18 PM
Joint Mediation Statement: Both parties are agreeable to mediation and are in the process of discussing scheduling. (Douglas, Charles) |
|
24 | 24
12
pgs
order
Protective Order
Wed 02/08 2:47 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Wed 02/08 2:46 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 23 Joint Assented to Motion for Protective Order. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js) |
||
notice
ECF - Filing Error - Info Only
Wed 02/08 3:58 PM
NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re:26 Assented to MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anna S. Kelly, Esquire (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1476388.) filed by Alexander Prout, Susan Prout. Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing, affidavits prepared in the context of the litigation shall be filed in electronically converted PDF format and shall contain a /s/ signature for both the signator and the notary/jurat. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(js) |
||
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
3
pgs
motion
Protective Order
Fri 02/03 5:22 PM
Joint Assented to MOTION for Protective Order filed by St. Paul's School.(Folsom, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 12 pgs Proposed Order Protective Order | ||
Tuesday, December 27, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Tue 12/27 5:08 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 22 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Disclose Claims Against Unnamed Parties from 1/15/17 to 5/15/17. Text of Order: Granted So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js) |
||
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
3
pgs
motion
Extend Time
Thu 12/22 2:12 PM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Disclose Claims Against Unnamed Parties from 1/15/17 to 5/15/17 filed by St. Paul's School.(Folsom, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit Civil Form 3 | ||
Friday, October 28, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Discovery Plan
Fri 10/28 6:01 PM
ENDORSED ORDER approving 19 Discovery Plan, 21 Status Report. Length of Trial 14 days. Case Track: Modified Complex. Text of Order: Approved and adopted as a pretrial scheduling order. Trial Date: March 6, 2018. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Summary Judgment Motions due by 10/31/2017. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 3/10/2017. Discovery deadline 1/15/2018. Mediation Follow Up on 2/9/2017.(js) |
||
notice
Trial Notice
Fri 10/28 6:03 PM
TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 3/6/2018 09:30 AM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2018 03:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Pretrial Statements due 2/5/2018. JERS Statement due 2/5/2018. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 2/19/2018. Summary Judgment Motions due by 10/31/2017.(js) |
||
Wednesday, October 26, 2016 | ||
order
Endorsed Order - not on motion
Thu 10/27 12:27 PM
ENDORSED ORDER PROHIBITING REMOTE ELECTRONIC ACCESS RE 21-1 Attachment to Status Report. Text of Order: Document No. 21-1 contains one or more personal identifiers listed in Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2(a). Making this information available over the Internet may result in personal or financial harm to the person whose information is contained therein. As good cause exists to prohibit a nonparty from obtaining remote electronic access to 21-1, Proposed Joint Discovery Plan for ESI, the clerk shall limit remote access accordingly pursuant to Fed.R.Civ. P. 5.2(e)(2). So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js) |
||
Friday, October 21, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
3
pgs
misc
Status Report
Fri 10/21 4:23 PM
STATUS REPORT by St. Paul's School : Proposed Agreement(Delaney, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Joint Discovery Plan for ESI, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Attachment to Exhibit 1 - Production Format Exhibit | ||
Thursday, October 13, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Attorney Appearance
Thu 10/13 3:54 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin B. Folsom on behalf of St. Paul's School Attorney Benjamin B. Folsom added to party St. Paul's School(pty:dft).(Folsom, Benjamin) |
|
Wednesday, September 21, 2016 | ||
minutes
Pretrial Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 09/21 4:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 9/21/2016. Joint Status Report due in 30 days. (Pltfs Atty: Charles G. Douglas, III, Stephen G. Grygiel, Steven J. Kelly, Steven D. Silverman) (Defts Atty: Michael A. Delaney, Bruce W. Felmly)(Total Hearing Time: 1 hour) (js) |
||
Thursday, September 15, 2016 | ||
notice
Pretrial Conference
Thu 09/15 11:40 AM
RESCHEDULING NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. TIME CHANGE ONLY Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2016 02:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js) |
||
Wednesday, September 14, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
10
pgs
motion
Discovery Plan
Wed 09/14 5:30 PM
Proposed Discovery Plan (Parties' Jointly Filed) filed by Alexander Prout, Susan Prout. (Douglas, Charles) |
|
Friday, September 09, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
30+
pgs
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 09/09 4:42 PM
ANSWER to17 Amended Complaint with jury demand and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES filed by St. Paul's School.(Delaney, Michael) |
|
Monday, August 29, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
34
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 08/29 4:33 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against St. Paul's School with jury demand (First) filed by John Doe, Jane Doe.(Douglas, Charles) |
|
order
Endorsed Order - not on motion
Mon 08/29 7:21 PM
ENDORSED ORDER. Text of Order: Plaintiffs filed their original complaint in this case on June 1, 2016. The same day, they filed a Motion for Leave to Proceed under Pseudonyms. I granted that motion provisionally on June 23, 2016. Defendant filed a partial objection to the motion on August 11, 2016. Thereafter, on August 29, 2016, Plaintiffs filed an amended complaint naming the plaintiffs and thereby mooting the defendant's partial objection. No further action is required on the matter. Any issues concerning discovery and trial that may have been referred to by the parties in their filings addressing this issue may be raised with the court at the preliminary pretrial conference. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(PP) |
||
Thursday, August 25, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
20
pgs
respm
Response - not to Motion
Thu 08/25 3:59 PM
RESPONSE re14 Response (to terminated motion),,, Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's Partial Objection and Conditional Assent to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms filed by Jane Doe, John Doe.(Douglas, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 10 pgs Exhibit A- Vanity Fair article Mar2016, | ||
Att: 3 7 pgs Exhibit B- Boston Globe article Aug8,2014, | ||
Att: 4 3 pgs Exhibit (Affidavit) C- Affidavit of John Doe, | ||
Att: 5 13 pgs Exhibit D- SPS press releases, | ||
Att: 6 27 pgs Exhibit E- Examples of public discussion, | ||
Att: 7 4 pgs Exhibit F- Facebook postings, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G- Editorial Sep8,2015, | ||
Att: 9 2 pgs Exhibit H- Labrie's letter Feb19,2014, | ||
Att: 10 2 pgs Exhibit I- Joshua Abram e-mail Feb23,2015, | ||
Att: 11 1 pgs Exhibit (Affidavit) J- Affidavit of Desirena Farmer, | ||
Att: 12 3 pgs Attachment to Exhibit 1- WestLaw Search History | ||
Wednesday, August 17, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
notice
Intent to Reply
Wed 08/17 4:07 PM
Notice of Intent to Reply to Objection to Motion for Pseudonyms . Follow up on Reply on 9/6/2016.(Douglas, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, August 16, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/16 3:08 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 10 Assented to Motion for Steven Kelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Attorney Steven J. Kelly submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. ECF Registration Deadline set for 8/29/2016.To access the online registration form, click HERE . Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] .(js) |
||
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/16 3:10 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 11 Motion for Stephen Grygiel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Attorney Stephen G. Grygiel submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. ECF Registration Deadline set for 8/29/2016.To access the online registration form, click HERE . Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] .(js) |
||
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/16 3:11 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 12 Motion for Steven Silverman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Attorney Steven D. Silverman submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. ECF Registration Deadline set for 8/29/2016.To access the online registration form, click HERE . Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] .(js) |
||
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/16 3:12 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 13 Motion for Edward P. Parent to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted on the condition that Attorney Edward P. Parent submits an ECF registration form within 10 days. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. ECF Registration Deadline set for 8/29/2016.To access the online registration form, click HERE . Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] .(js) |
||
notice
Pretrial Conference
Tue 08/16 3:21 PM
NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2016 10:00 AM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Follow up on Discovery Plan 9/14/2016.(js) |
||
Thursday, August 11, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
4
pgs
respm
Response - to terminated motion
Thu 08/11 11:56 AM
RESPONSE re2 MOTION for Leave to File To Proceed Under Pseudonyms Partial Objection filed by St. Paul's School.(Delaney, Michael) Modified on 8/11/2016 to add: (lm) |
|
Att: 1 15 pgs Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit 1 to MOL Cabrera Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to MOL Doe v Rose, | ||
Att: 4 8 pgs Exhibit (Affidavit) Michael A. Delaney, Esq., | ||
Att: 5 1 pgs Exhibit A to Aff - Blackman voicemail, | ||
Att: 6 2 pgs Exhibit B to Aff - Blackman email, | ||
Att: 7 2 pgs Exhibit C to Aff - Damberg NBC email, | ||
Att: 8 2 pgs Exhibit D to Aff - Kelly Interviews, | ||
Att: 9 5 pgs Exhibit E to Aff - Kelly Quotes & Web Media, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit F to Aff - Lawsuit Could Expose Culture article, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit G to Aff - Parents sue school article, | ||
Att: 12 5 pgs Exhibit H to Aff - STSW Files Fed Lawsuit article, | ||
Att: 13 4 pgs Exhibit I - Kelly WRKO Radio Interview, | ||
Att: 14 5 pgs Exhibit J to Aff - Former Orioles Pitcher Accused article | ||
Tuesday, August 09, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/09 11:47 AM
Assented to MOTION for Edward Parent to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1404895.) filed by Jane Doe, John Doe.(Douglas, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Edward Parent | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/09 11:44 AM
Assented to MOTION for Steven Silverman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1404889.) filed by Jane Doe, John Doe.(Douglas, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Steven Silverman | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/09 11:41 AM
Assented to MOTION for Stephen Grygiel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1404885.) filed by Jane Doe, John Doe.(Douglas, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Stephen Grygiel | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/09 11:37 AM
Assented to MOTION for Steven Kelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # 0102-1404873.) filed by Jane Doe, John Doe.(Douglas, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Steven Kelly | ||
notice
ECF - Filing Error - Info Only
Tue 08/09 12:27 PM
NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re:10 Assented to MOTION for Steven Kelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by John Doe, Jane Doe. Consistent with Supplemental Rules of Electronic Case Filing, affidavits prepared in the context of the litigation shall be filed in electronically converted PDF format and shall contain a /s/ signature for both the signator and the notary/jurat. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1475.(js) |
||
Monday, August 08, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Attorney Appearance
Mon 08/08 4:14 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce W. Felmly on behalf of St. Paul's School Attorney Bruce W. Felmly added to party St. Paul's School(pty:dft).(Felmly, Bruce) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Disclosure Statement
Mon 08/08 4:06 PM
Disclosure Statement by St. Paul's School disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Delaney, Michael) |
|
7 | 7
64
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/08 4:03 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with jury demand filed by St. Paul's School.(Delaney, Michael) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Attorney Appearance
Mon 08/08 3:58 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael A. Delaney on behalf of St. Paul's School Attorney Michael A. Delaney added to party St. Paul's School(pty:dft).(Delaney, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, July 05, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 07/05 10:13 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to St. Paul's School by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 6/9/2016. (Douglas, Charles) |
|
Thursday, June 23, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion for Protective Order
Thu 06/23 4:21 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms; granting 3 Motion for Protective Order. Text of Order: Granted. Documents 2 and 3 are provisionally granted subject to de novo review after the defendant has appeared and any interested person has had an opportunity to object. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js) |
||
Thursday, June 02, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons - Waiver Issued
Thu 06/02 1:50 PM
Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to St. Paul's School. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(de) |
|
Att: 1 Notice ECF | ||
notice
Notice - ECF
Thu 06/02 1:37 PM
NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] .(de) |
||
Wednesday, June 01, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Protective Order
Thu 06/02 1:21 PM
MOTION for Protective Order Sealing Exhibit A filed by Jane Doe, John Doe. Follow up on Objection on 6/20/2016.(de) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
motion
Leave to File
Thu 06/02 1:08 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms filed by Jane Doe, John Doe. Follow up on Objection on 6/20/2016.(de) (de) |
|
Att: 1 10 pgs Memorandum of Law | ||
Att: 2 (6/2/2016) Exhibit A (Affidavit) | ||
1 | 1
34
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/02 9:20 AM
COMPLAINT against St. Paul's School with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 14649013593) filed by John Doe, Jane Doe.(de) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Summons - Waiver | ||
utility
Case Assigned
Thu 06/02 1:33 PM
Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:16-cv-225-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (de) |