Tyler et al v. Stat Oil USA Onshore Properties, Inc.
Pennsylvania Middle District Court | |
Judge: | A Richard Caputo |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-01048 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 02, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 01, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 29, 2016 4:40 AM EST |
Defendant
Stat Oil USA Onshore Properties, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Toczko
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ellen Toczko
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Tewksbury
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tamara Tewksbury
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lori Tewksbury
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Tewksbury
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Smurkoski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janice Smurkoski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sarah P. Sidorek
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul F. Sidorek
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeanne Sible
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hildegarde Morgan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Morgan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry A. Mikus
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KWP Holdings, LP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mae Grose
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joann L. Wright
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David L. Wright
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott C Tyler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debra J Tyler
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case (60 Day Settlement Order)
Mon 10/01 6:00 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 10/1/18. (dw) |
|
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Fri 08/10 3:30 PM
ORDER granting35 Motion to Extend Case Management Order deadlines 60 days. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 8/10/18. (dw) |
|
35 | 35
motion
Continue
Fri 08/10 12:14 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue /Joint Motion for Continuance by Stat Oil USA Onshore Properties, Inc..(Shores, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Fri 07/20 11:37 AM
ORDER denying32 Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 7/20/18. (dw) |
|
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
respm
Brief in Opposition (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions)
Thu 07/19 4:35 PM
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re32 MOTION for Extension of Time to Motion for Extension of Time for Production of Plaintiff's Expert Report / Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc.'s Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration filed by Stat Oil USA Onshore Properties, Inc..(Shores, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix of Unpublished Cases, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 07/05 3:50 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Motion for Extension of Time for Production of Plaintiff's Expert Report by Mae Grose, KWP Holdings, LP, Jerry A. Mikus, Gary Morgan, Hildegarde Morgan, Jeanne Sible, Paul F. Sidorek, Sarah P. Sidorek, Janice Smurkoski, John Smurkoski, David Tewksbury, Lori Tewksbury, Tamara Tewksbury, Timothy Tewksbury, Ellen Toczko, Gary Toczko, Debra J Tyler, Scott C Tyler, David L. Wright, Joann L. Wright.(Abrahamsen, Edwin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - Expert Report of Minturn Smith, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Tue 06/26 3:50 PM
ORDER denying Pltf's29 Motion to Extend Time for Production of Pltf's Expert Report and Deft's Opposition (Doc. 30).Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 6/26/18 (ao) |
|
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment
Thu 05/17 9:22 PM
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re29 First MOTION for Extension of Time to to Produce Plaintiffs' expert reports filed by Stat Oil USA Onshore Properties, Inc..(Shores, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) 6, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 05/11 1:05 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to to Produce Plaintiffs' expert reports by Scott C Tyler.(Abrahamsen, Edwin) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Protective Order
Fri 12/01 2:38 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER - The Court adopts the attached stipulation as a protective order of the Court. Compliance therewith is directed. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 12/1/17. (dw) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation
Wed 11/29 4:30 PM
STIPULATION / Stipulated Protective Order by Stat Oil USA Onshore Properties, Inc..(Shores, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Stipulated Order | ||
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
5
pgs
order
Order Approving Stipulation
Tue 11/21 1:33 PM
Order approving re25 Stipulation and REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Case placed on January, 2019 trial list. Dispositive Motions due: 8/15/18. (See Order for full details.) Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 11/21/17. (dw) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Stipulation
Fri 11/17 4:29 PM
STIPULATION /Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Revised Case Management Order by Stat Oil USA Onshore Properties, Inc.. (Shores, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 08/01 2:50 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion to Withdraw Appearance. John E. Beerbower, Esquire is withdrawn as counsel for Statoil USA Onshore Properties, Inc. in this action. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 8/1/2017 (dw) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 07/31 10:36 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney John E. Beerbower by Stat Oil USA Onshore Properties, Inc..(Beerbower, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Thu 06/29 3:00 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by David Higbee (Higbee, David) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Thu 06/29 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Ryan Shores (Shores, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Case Management Order - Standard Track
Tue 05/23 4:24 PM
ORDER - STANDARD CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK - The final date for amending pleadings or joining parties is 6/1/17. Fact Discovery due by 10/1/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 2/15/2018. Pretrial Conf will be held in June, 2018.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 5/23/17. (ao) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Special Admissions Form Approved
Fri 05/12 5:08 PM
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Robert Louis Theriot, Esq.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 5/12/17. (jam) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Case Management Plan
Fri 05/12 9:47 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN Joint Case Management Plan by Mae Grose, KWP Holdings, LP, Jerry A. Mikus, Gary Morgan, Hildegarde Morgan, Jeanne Sible, Paul F. Sidorek, Sarah P. Sidorek, Janice Smurkoski, John Smurkoski, David Tewksbury, Lori Tewksbury, Tamara Tewksbury, Timothy Tewksbury, Ellen Toczko, Gary Toczko, Debra J Tyler, Scott C Tyler, David L. Wright, Joann L. Wright. (Abrahamsen, Edwin) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
Thu 05/11 4:28 PM
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Robert L Theriot on behalf of Stat Oil USA Onshore Properties, Inc. Attorney Robert Theriot is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4086203.. (Theriot, Robert) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Thu 04/13 3:43 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2017 09:45 AM.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 4/13/17 (jam) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Continue
Mon 04/10 4:47 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by Stat Oil USA Onshore Properties, Inc..(Shores, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 04/06 3:42 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference VIA TELEPHONE set for 4/20/2017 10:00 AM in Wilkes-Barre before Honorable A. Richard Caputo. Plaintiffs' counsel shall initiate the call.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 4/6/17. (jam) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Mon 02/06 10:13 AM
ANSWER to11 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Mae Grose, KWP Holdings, LP, Jerry A. Mikus, Gary Morgan, Hildegarde Morgan, Jeanne Sible, Paul F. Sidorek, Sarah P. Sidorek, Janice Smurkoski, John Smurkoski, David Tewksbury, Lori Tewksbury, Tamara Tewksbury, Timothy Tewksbury, Ellen Toczko, Gary Toczko, Debra J Tyler, Scott C Tyler, David L. Wright, Joann L. Wright.(Abrahamsen, Edwin) |
|
Friday, December 09, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim
Fri 12/09 5:12 PM
ANSWER to8 Amended Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Stat Oil USA Onshore Properties, Inc..(Shores, Ryan) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Mon 11/21 3:16 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint on or before 12/9/16. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 11/21/16 (jam) |
|
Friday, November 18, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 11/18 3:32 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to to File Responsive Pleading by Stat Oil USA Onshore Properties, Inc..(Shores, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, November 11, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 11/11 3:48 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Stat Oil USA Onshore Properties, Inc., filed by David L. Wright, Scott C Tyler, Debra J Tyler, Joann L. Wright.(Abrahamsen, Edwin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A-1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A-2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A-3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A-4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A-5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A-6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A-7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) EXhibit A-8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A-9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A-10, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A-11, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A-12, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A-13, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A-14, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A-15, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A-16, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A-17 | ||
Tuesday, June 28, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Special Admissions Form Approved
Tue 06/28 2:05 PM
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to John E. Beerbower, Esq.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 6/28/16. (jam) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 06/28 12:56 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney John E. Beerbower is active with the VA state bar. (lh) |
||
Monday, June 27, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
Mon 06/27 10:55 AM
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by John E Beerbower on behalf of Stat Oil USA Onshore Properties, Inc. Attorney John Beerbower is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-3796762.. (Beerbower, John) |
|
Wednesday, June 22, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Attorney Withdrawal of Appearance
Wed 06/22 1:38 PM
WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Attorney William J Haun terminated on behalf of Statoil USA Onshore Properties Inc.. (Haun, William) |
|
Monday, June 20, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Mon 06/20 3:08 PM
ORDER CONSOLIDATING 3:16-cv-1049 INTO this action; Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 06/20/16. (ep) |
|
Friday, June 03, 2016 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 06/03 9:11 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorneys Higbee, Haun and Shores were specially admitted under 15cv1878 (ch1) |
||
Thursday, June 02, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Thu 06/02 2:47 PM
ORDER Granting Motion to Sever (ORIGINALLY FILED IN Case 3:15cv1878 as Doc No. 31). Claims against Stat Oil in this case will be SEVERED from those against Defendant Chesapeake Appalachia, LLC. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 6/1/16 (THIS ORDER WAS ORIGINALLY FILED IN CASE 3:15CV1878 AS DOC NO. 32 ON 6/1/2016) (jw) |
|
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 06/02 2:37 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Stat Oil USA Onshore Properties, Inc & c/s. (ORIGINALLY FILED ON 1/19/2016 AS DOC #18 IN CIVIL ACTION NO. 3:15CV1878.)(jw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/02 2:34 PM
COMPLAINT against Stat Oil USA Onshore Properties, Inc., filed by Scott C Tyler, Debra J Tyler.(jw)(THIS WAS ORIGINALLY FILED ON 9/29/2015 AS DOC #1 IN CIVIL ACTION NO. 3:15CV1878. THIS ACTION SEVERED BY JUDGE CAPUTO ON 6/1/2016, SEE DOC #3 IN THIS CASE) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) B |