Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 0:16-cr-60152
Case Filed:Jun 02, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 06, 2017 3:36 AM EST
Defendant
Lisette Aisleen Durate (6)
Represented By
Lauren Fleischer Louis
Boies Schiller & Flexner
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Bruce Brown
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
John Carlos Yoany Espinal (3)
Terminated: 05/30/2017
Represented By
Mark Alan Levine
contact info
Defendant
George Evangelista (1)
Terminated: 01/30/2017
35574-054 YOB:1971 English Allenwood-USP United States Penitentiary Inmate Mail/Parcels Post Office Box 3000
White Deer, PA 17887
Represented By
Michael Bruce Cohen
Michael B. Cohen
contact info
John Francis O'Donnell
contact info
Defendant
Aneuri Manzueta (2)
Terminated: 01/18/2017
Represented By
Noticing FPD-FTL
contact info
Robin Joy Farnsworth
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Robert Norman Berube
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Jonathan Joemis Then (4)
Terminated: 01/30/2017
Represented By
Colette Fabiola Drimmer
Musca Law
contact info
Sara Sharon Shulevitz
contact info
Peter Thomas Patanzo
Benjamin & Aaronson
contact info
Defendant
Vanirys Vargas (5)
Terminated: 01/30/2017
Represented By
Brett Michael Schwartz
contact info
Paul Domenic Petruzzi
Alfred I. Dupont Building
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/20/2021 11:34 AM EDT
Saturday, May 21, 2016
Arrest of George Evangelista (dby) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
Arrest of John Carlos Yoany Espinal (dby) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Jonathan Joemis Then (dby) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Aneuri Manzueta (dby) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Vanirys Vargas (dby) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Lisette Aisleen Durate (dby) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 23, 2016
Set Hearings as to George Evangelista: Initial Appearance set for 5/23/2016 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. (at) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
Set Hearings as to John Carlos Yoany Espinal: Initial Appearance set for 5/23/2016 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. (at) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
Set Hearings as to Jonathan Joemis Then: Initial Appearance set for 5/23/2016 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. (at) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
Set Hearings as to Aneuri Manzueta: Initial Appearance set for 5/23/2016 at 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. (at) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
Set Hearings as to Vanirys Vargas: Initial Appearance set for 5/23/2016 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. (at) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
Set Hearings as to Lisette Aisleen Durate: Initial Appearance set for 5/23/2016 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. (at) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs COMPLAINT as to George Evangelista (1), Aneuri Manzueta (2), John Carlos Yoany Espinal (3), Lisette Aisleen Durate (4), Jonathan Joemis Then (5), Vanirys Vargas (6). (dby) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
2 2 Report Commencing Criminal Action as to Aneuri Manzueta - YOB: **/**/1981 Prisoner #: 90445-054 (dby) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
3 3 Report Commencing Criminal Action as to John Carlos Yoany Espinal - YOB: **/**/1991 Prisoner #: 13366-104 (dby) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
4 4 Report Commencing Criminal Action as to Jonathan Joemis Then - YOB: **/**/1994 Prisoner #: 13364-104 (dby) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
5 5 Report Commencing Criminal Action as to Lisette Aisleen Durate - YOB: **/**/1997 Prisoner #: 13370-104 (dby) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
6 6 Report Commencing Criminal Action as to George Evangelista - YOB: **/**/1971 Prisoner #: 35574-054 (dby) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
7 7 Report Commencing Criminal Action as to Vanirys Vargas - YOB: **/**/1996 Prisoner #: 13369-104 (dby) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer: Initial Appearance as to George Evangelista held on 5/23/2016. Arraignment set for 6/6/2016 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Detention Hearing set for 5/26/2016 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Attorney added: John Francis O'Donnell, John Francis O'Donnell for George Evangelista for Criminal Case CJA representation. Date attorney was appointed CJA: 5/23/16. (Digital 11:16:12) (dd) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
9 9 Order on Initial Appearance as to George Evangelista for proceeding held on 5/23/2016 for Criminal Case representation. Date attorney was appointed CJA: 5/23/16. Arraignment set for 6/6/2016 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Detention Hearing set for 5/26/2016 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/23/2016. (dd) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
10 10 Order on Initial Appearance as to Aneuri Manzueta for proceeding held on 5/23/2016 Attorney Noticing FPD-FTL for Aneuri Manzueta added for the defendant. Arraignment set for 6/6/2016 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Detention Hearing set for 5/26/2016 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/23/2016. (dd) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
11 11 Order on Initial Appearance as to Vanirys Vargas for proceeding held on 5/23/2016 Attorney Paul Domenic Petruzzi for Vanirys Vargas added for the defendant. for Criminal Case representation. Date attorney was appointed CJA: 5/23/2016. Arraignment set for 6/6/2016 at 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Detention Hearing set for 5/26/2016 at 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/23/2016. (dby) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
12 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer: Initial Appearance as to Vanirys Vargas held on 5/23/2016. (Digital 11:16:12) (dby) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
13 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer: Initial Appearance as to Aneuri Manzueta held on 5/23/2016. Arraignment set for 6/6/2016 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Detention Hearing set for 5/26/2016 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Spanish Interpreter present. (Digital 11:16:12) (dd) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
14 14 Order on Initial Appearance as to John Carlos Yoany Espinal for proceeding held on 5/23/2016 Attorney Mark Alan Levine for John Carlos Yoany Espinal added for the defendant for Criminal Case representation. Date attorney was appointed CJA: 5/23/16. Arraignment set for 6/6/2016 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Detention Hearing set for 5/26/2016 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/23/2016. (dd) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
15 15 Order on Initial Appearance as to Lisette Aisleen Durate for proceeding held on 5/23/2016. Attorney Lauren Fleischer Louis for Lisette Aisleen Durate added for the defendant. for Criminal Case representation. Date attorney was appointed CJA: 5/23/2016. Arraignment set for 6/6/2016 at 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Detention Hearing set for 5/26/2016 at 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/23/2016. (dby) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
16 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer: Initial Appearance as to Lisette Aisleen Durate held on 5/23/2016. (Digital 11:16:12) (dby) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
17 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer: Initial Appearance as to John Carlos Yoany Espinal held on 5/23/2016. Atty. Mark Levine appointed for Criminal Case CJA representation. Date attorney was appointed CJA: 5/23/16. (Digital 11:12:16) (dd) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
18 18 Order on Partial Indigency for Appointment of Counsel and Distribution of Available Funds as to George Evangelista Directing Funds in the amount of $1000.00 be deposited with the Clerk of Court by 6/23/2016. Status Conference Re: Partial Indigency/CJA Payment set for 7/5/2016 at 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. (dby) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
19 19 Order on Initial Appearance as to Jonathan Joemis Then for proceeding held on 5/23/2016. Attorney Omar F. Guerra Johansson for Jonathan Joemis Then added for the defendant. for Criminal Case representation. Date attorney was appointed CJA: 5/23/2016. Arraignment set for 6/6/2016 at 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Detention Hearing set for 5/26/2016 at 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/23/2016. (dby) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
20 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer: Initial Appearance as to Jonathan Joemis Then held on 5/23/2016. (Digital 11:16:12) (dby) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2016
21 21 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brett Michael Schwartz appearing for Vanirys Vargas for the purpose of hearing on May 26, 2016 (Schwartz, Brett) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
22 22 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brett Michael Schwartz appearing for Vanirys Vargas for the purpose of hearing on May 26, 2016 Amended (Schwartz, Brett) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
23 23 Notice of Assignment of Assistant Federal Public Defender as to Aneuri Manzueta. Attorney Robert Norman Berube added. Attorney Noticing FPD-FTL terminated.. Attorney Robert Norman Berube added to party Aneuri Manzueta(pty:dft). (Berube, Robert) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
24 24 Invocation of Right to Silence and Counsel by Aneuri Manzueta (Berube, Robert) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2016
25 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer: Bond Hearing as to Vanirys Vargas held on 5/26/2016. Bond set: Vanirys Vargas (6) $25,000 CSB. (Digital 10:09:16) (dby) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
26 26 $25,000 CSB Bond Entered as to Vanirys Vargas Approved by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer. Please see bond image for conditions of release. (dby) (dby). [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (5/26/2016) Restricted Bond with 5th Page
27 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer: Bond Hearing as to Lisette Aisleen Durate held on 5/26/2016. Bond set: Lisette Aisleen Durate (4) $25,000 CSB. (Digital 10:09:16) (dby) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
28 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer: Bond Hearing as to John Carlos Yoany Espinal held on 5/26/2016. Bond set: John Carlos Yoany Espinal (3) $50,000 CSB. (Digital 10:09:16) (dby) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
29 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer: Detention Hearing as to George Evangelista held on 5/26/2016 Witness John Bottone testified. PTD ordered. (Digital 10:09:16 & 12:30:46) (dd) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
30 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer: Detention Hearing as to Aneuri Manzueta held on 5/26/2016 Witness John Bottone testified. PTD Ordered. Spanish Interpreter present. (Digital 10:09:16 & 12:30:46) (dd) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
31 31 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer: Detention Hearing as to Jonathan Joemis Then held on 5/26/2016. Witness Agent John Bottone testified. PTD ordered. (Digital 10:09:16 / 12:30:40) (dby) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
32 32 ORDER OF DETENTION as to George Evangelista. Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/26/2016. (ccy) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
33 33 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Jonathan Joemis Then. Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/26/2016. (ccy) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
34 34 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Aneuri Manzueta. Please see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/26/2016. (ccy) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2016
35 35 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael Bruce Cohen appearing for George Evangelista . Attorney Michael Bruce Cohen added to party George Evangelista(pty:dft). (Cohen, Michael) [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
36 36 $50,000 CSB Bond Entered as to John Carlos Yoany Espinal Approved by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer. Please see bond image for conditions of release. (dd) (dd). [0:16-mj-06237-BSS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (6/2/2016) Restricted Bond with 5th Page
37 37 INDICTMENT as to George Evangelista (1) count(s) 1, 2, Aneuri Manzueta (2) count(s) 1, 2, John Carlos Yoany Espinal (3) count(s) 1, 2, Jonathan Joemis Then (4) count(s) 1, 2, Vanirys Vargas (5) count(s) 1, 2, Lisette Aisleen Durate (6) count(s) 1, 2. (dby) (dby).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (6/2/2016) Restricted Unredacted Indictment