Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-30345

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 3:16-ap-03064
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2016
Terminated:Apr 26, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Navient
PO Box 9640
Wilkes-Barre, PA 18773
Defendant
DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
400 MARYLAND AVE SW
WASHINGTON, DC 20202
Plaintiff
Timothy Patrick Forbes
PO Box 255
Elgin, MN 55932
Represented By
Timothy Patrick Forbes
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, April 26, 2017
court MNB Close adversary case Wed 04/26 10:59 AM
Adversary case 3:16-ap-3064 closed (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2017
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Fri 04/21 10:46 AM
Disposition of adversary 3:16-ap-3064. Disposition: DISMISSED. (Jamie MNBS)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 25, 2016
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 12/25 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 12/25/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 23, 2016
21 21 order MNB Order (Generic) Fri 12/23 12:22 PM
Order Approving Stipulation to Consolidate Adversary Proceedings 16-3063 16-3064 and 16-3065 re:20 Stipulation. Status Conference set for January 4, 2017 at 11:00am by Telephone Conference with Judge William J. Fisher. (Jamie MNBS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2016
20 20 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Thu 12/22 4:22 PM
Stipulation filed by Timothy Patrick Forbes and U.S. Dept. of Education. Nature of stipulation: consolidate case with other adversary proceedings(Kidwell, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2016
19 19 misc MNB Withdrawal Thu 12/15 2:44 PM
Withdrawal Related [+] filed by DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. Proof of service.(Champeaux, Roylene)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tuesday, December 13, 2016
18 18 misc MNB Certificate of service Tue 12/13 2:10 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by Timothy Patrick Forbes.(Kidwell, Brian)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,16 Notice of appearance,17 Summons for adversary proceeding
17 17 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Tue 12/13 12:38 PM
Summons issued on DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION Date Issued 12/13/2016, Answer Due 1/12/2017 (Jamie MNBS)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice Tue 12/13 12:13 PM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by Timothy Patrick Forbes and Brian F. Kidwell.. (Kidwell, Brian)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice MNB Notice of continued hearing Tue 12/13 12:02 PM
Notice of continued hearing Related [+] filed by DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. Proof of service.. Hearing to be held on 1/24/2017 at 01:30 PM Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher for12 , (Champeaux, Roylene)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding12 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thursday, December 08, 2016
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 12/08 11:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 12/08/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2016
13 13 order MNB Dismiss party - motion Tue 12/06 2:42 PM
Order Granting Motion to dismiss party "Sally Mae (Navient)" Related [+] (Jamie MNBS)
Related: [-] 9
Thursday, December 01, 2016
12 12 motion MNB Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding Thu 12/01 3:34 PM
EDITED ENTRY: MOTION TO DISMISS PARTY, NOT Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proof of service, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 12/28/2016 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Champeaux, Roylene) Modified on 12/1/2016 (LindaE QC MNBS)
Related: [-]
court MNB Corrected entry Thu 12/01 3:50 PM
EDITED ENTRY: MOTION TO DISMISS PARTY, NOT Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proof of service, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 12/28/2016 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Champeaux, Roylene) Corrected entry Related [+] . (LindaE QC MNBS)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tuesday, November 08, 2016
11 11 misc MNB Certificate of service Tue 11/08 2:35 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by Navient.(Miller, Mark)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to dismiss party
10 10 misc MNB Certificate of service Tue 11/08 9:15 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by Navient.(Miller, Mark)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to dismiss party
9 9 motion MNB Motion to dismiss party Tue 11/08 9:12 AM
EDITED ENTRY: MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY NAVIENT SOLUTIONS, INC. - NOT DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. Motion to dismiss party as to Navient (Defendant) filed by DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proof of service, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 12/6/2016 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Miller, Mark) Modified on 11/8/2016 (Jamie MNBS)
Related: [-]
court MNB Notice re: submission of scanned documents Tue 11/08 10:23 AM
Notice to attorney re: (9 Motion to dismiss party). The document submitted has scanned pages other than signature pages and exhibits. Local Rule 9004-1(e) limits the submission of scanned pages to signature pages and exhibits. Future documents must be submitted in compliance with the scanning requirements of Local Rule 9004-1(e). For instructions on preparing an electronic document for filing to CM/ECF, please see How do I prepare an electronic document for filing to CM/ECF on the court`s website, www.mnb.uscourts.gov under FAQ, then CM/ECF Questions. (Jamie MNBS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2016
8 8 misc MNB Certificate of service Wed 10/19 3:07 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by Timothy Patrick Forbes .(Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
Friday, September 30, 2016
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 10/01 12:02 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 09/30/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2016
6 6 order MNB Default judgment - motion Wed 09/28 10:56 AM
Order Denying Motion for default judgment Related [+] (Trevor MNB)
Related: [-] 5
Friday, September 09, 2016
5 5 motion MNB Motion for default judgment Fri 09/09 2:10 PM
Motion for default judgment filed by Plaintiff Timothy Patrick Forbes . Affidavit of default, Proposed findings of fact, conclusions of law and order for judgment, Certificate of service. Hearing scheduled 9/27/2016 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2016
4 4 misc MNB Certificate of service Tue 07/05 8:19 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by Timothy Patrick Forbes .(Jamie MNBS)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,3 Summons for adversary proceeding
Wednesday, June 22, 2016
3 3 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Wed 06/22 3:12 PM
Summons re-issued on DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION Answer Due 7/22/2016; Navient Date re-issued 6/22/2016, Answer Due 7/22/2016 (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2016
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Fri 06/03 3:17 PM
Summons issued on DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION Answer Due 7/5/2016; Navient Date Issued 6/3/2016, Answer Due 7/5/2016 (Jamie MNBS)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Fri 06/03 2:59 PM
Adversary case 16-03064 (63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by Timothy Patrick Forbes against Navient , DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION . No Fee. (Jamie MNBS)
Related: [-]
court MNB Case reassigned - Judge Fri 06/03 3:21 PM
Judge William J Fisher added to case. Involvement of Judge Gregory F Kishel terminated. (Jamie MNBS)
Related: [-]