Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-10510

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 9
Judge:Alan Jaroslovsky
Case #: 1:16-ap-01067
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jun 04, 2016
Terminated:Feb 07, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Blood Centers of the Pacific, Defendant
270 Masonic Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94118
Represented By
Blood Centers of the Pacific
contact info
Plaintiff
Palm Drive Health Care District, Plaintiff
501 Petaluma Ave.
Sebastopol, CA 95472
Represented By
Dale L. Bratton
Law Offices Of Dale L. Bratton
contact info
Michael A. Sweet
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, February 07, 2017
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/07 2:24 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Palm Drive Health Care District (Sweet, Michael)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
court Close Adversary Case Tue 02/07 3:18 PM
Adversary Case Closed 1:16-ap-1067. (ka)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2017
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 02/06 1:40 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Entire Action Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7041 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) Filed by Plaintiff Palm Drive Health Care District. (Sweet, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2017
12 12 notice Notice of Entry of Order Mon 01/30 2:52 PM
Notice of Entry of Order Regarding: Granting Motion for Approval of Compromise with Blood Centers of the Pacific Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9019 Filed by Plaintiff Palm Drive Health Care District. (Sweet, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, January 27, 2017
11 11 notice Notice of Status Conference Fri 01/27 5:15 PM
Notice of Status Conference scheduled for 3/20/2017 at 02:00 PM at Santa Rosa Courtroom - Jaroslovsky. Filed by Plaintiff Palm Drive Health Care District. (Sweet, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2016
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order Fri 11/04 9:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order Related [+]. Notice Date 11/04/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order to Dismiss Case
Wednesday, November 02, 2016
9 9 order Dismiss Case Wed 11/02 4:03 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. (If a Notice of Scheduling Conference is filed within 90 days of this order, then this order shall be vacated and the matter shall be restored to the calendar for trial.) (ds)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Palm Drive Health Care District
Monday, October 31, 2016
court Hearing Held (Adv) Tue 11/01 6:24 PM
Hearing Held Related [+] (After hearing, settled. Court to issue 90 day dismissal order. Appearance: Michael Sweet) (ds )
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Palm Drive Health Care District
Thursday, September 29, 2016
8 8 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Thu 09/29 1:39 PM
Stipulation to Further Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Plead Filed by Plaintiff Palm Drive Health Care District Related [+]. (Sweet, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Palm Drive Health Care District
Wednesday, September 14, 2016
7 7 stip Refer to Existing Document(s) Wed 09/14 12:47 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Plead Filed by Plaintiff Palm Drive Health Care District Related [+]. (Sweet, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Palm Drive Health Care District
Friday, July 15, 2016
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Fri 07/15 9:49 AM
Certificate of Service of Complaint and Alias Summons Related [+]. Filed by Plaintiff Palm Drive Health Care District (Sweet, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,5 Alias Summons Issued
Friday, June 17, 2016
5 5 court Alias Summons Issued Fri 06/17 4:32 PM
Alias Summons Issued on Blood Centers of the Pacific Date Issued 6/17/2016, Answer Due 7/18/2016 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 10/31/2016 at 02:00 PM at Santa Rosa Courtroom - Jaroslovsky. (ka)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Palm Drive Health Care District
Thursday, June 16, 2016
4 4 cmp Summons Service Unexecuted Thu 06/16 10:32 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted Re: Blood Centers of the Pacific (Bratton, Dale)
Related: [-]
cmp Request for Alias Summons to be Issued Thu 06/16 10:33 PM
Request for Alias Summons to be Issued on Blood Centers of the Pacific. Reason: Per FRBP original Summons Not Timely Served. Related [+]. (Bratton, Dale)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Palm Drive Health Care District,4 Summons Service Unexecuted
Monday, June 06, 2016
3 3 court Summons Issued Mon 06/06 12:17 PM
Summons Issued on Blood Centers of the Pacific Answer Due 7/6/2016 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 8/15/2016 at 02:00 PM at Santa Rosa Courtroom - Jaroslovsky. (lj)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Palm Drive Health Care District
Sunday, June 05, 2016
2 2 cmp Adversary Cover Sheet Sun 06/05 1:31 AM
Adversary Cover Sheet Related [+]. (Sweet, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Palm Drive Health Care District
Saturday, June 04, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 06/04 10:27 PM
Adversary case[LINK 16-01067 . 12 Related [+] Complaint by Palm Drive Health Care District against Blood Centers of the Pacific. Fee Amount $350. (Sweet, Michael)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference