New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Allan L Gropper
Case #: 1:12-bk-12261
Case Filed:May 24, 2012
Creditor Meeting:Aug 22, 2012
Terminated:Dec 19, 2012
Plan Confirmed:Aug 07, 2012

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
10-16 Manhattan Avenue LLC
825 3rd Ave
New York, NY 10022-7519
Represented By
Jeffrey S. Davis
Rosen & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Nancy Lynne Kourland
Rosen & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
33 Whitehall Street 21st Floor
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 06/12/2013 4:19 PM EDT
Thursday, May 24, 2012
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 12-12261 [misc,824] (1046.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 8585258. Fee amount 1046.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 12-12261 [misc,824] (1046.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 8585258. Fee amount 1046.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered. Schedule A due 6/7/2012. Schedule B due 6/7/2012. Schedule D due 6/7/2012. Schedule E due 6/7/2012. Schedule F due 6/7/2012. Schedule G due 6/7/2012. Schedule H due 6/7/2012. Summary of schedules - Page 1 due 6/7/2012. Statement of Financial Affairs due 6/7/2012. Atty Disclosure State. due 6/7/2012. Employee Income Record Due: 6/7/2012. Incomplete Filings due by 6/7/2012, Chapter 11 Plan due by 9/21/2012, Disclosure Statement due by 9/21/2012, Initial Case Conference due by 6/25/2012, Filed by Nancy Lynne Kourland of Rosen & Associates, P.C. on behalf of 10-16 Manhattan Avenue LLC. (Kourland, Nancy)
Related: [-]
2 2 Affidavit Declaration of Mason Sleeper Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 1007-2 Related [+] filed by Nancy Lynne Kourland on behalf of 10-16 Manhattan Avenue LLC.(Kourland, Nancy)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D