Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Leigh Martin May
Case #: 1:13-cv-00312
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2013
Re-opened:Feb 16, 2016
Terminated:Sep 13, 2016
Last checked: Sunday Jan 11, 2015 10:05 AM EST
Amicus
Freedom To Work
1828 L Street Suite 660
Washington, DC 20036
Represented By
Gregory R. Nevins
Lambda Legal Defense And Education Fund, Inc.
contact info
Teresa S. Renaker
Lewis, Feinberg, Lee, Renaker & Jackson, P.C.
contact info
Jacob Richards
Lewis, Feinberg, Lee, Renaker & Jackson, P.C.
contact info
Amicus
Gay & Lesbian Advocates & Defenders
30 Winter Street Suite 800
Boston, MA 02108
Represented By
Gregory R. Nevins
Lambda Legal Defense And Education Fund, Inc.
contact info
Teresa S. Renaker
Lewis, Feinberg, Lee, Renaker & Jackson, P.C.
contact info
Jacob Richards
Lewis, Feinberg, Lee, Renaker & Jackson, P.C.
contact info
Amicus
Lambda Legal
730 Peachtree Street NE Suite 1070
Atlanta, GA 30308
Represented By
Gregory R. Nevins
Lambda Legal Defense And Education Fund, Inc.
contact info
Teresa S. Renaker
Lewis, Feinberg, Lee, Renaker & Jackson, P.C.
contact info
Jacob Richards
Lewis, Feinberg, Lee, Renaker & Jackson, P.C.
contact info
Amicus
National Center for Transgender Equality
1325 Massachusetts Avenue NW Suite 700
Washington, DC 20005
Represented By
Gregory R. Nevins
Lambda Legal Defense And Education Fund, Inc.
contact info
Teresa S. Renaker
Lewis, Feinberg, Lee, Renaker & Jackson, P.C.
contact info
Jacob Richards
Lewis, Feinberg, Lee, Renaker & Jackson, P.C.
contact info
Amicus
PFLAG National
1828 L Street NW Suite 600
Washington, DC 20036
Represented By
Gregory R. Nevins
Lambda Legal Defense And Education Fund, Inc.
contact info
Teresa S. Renaker
Lewis, Feinberg, Lee, Renaker & Jackson, P.C.
contact info
Jacob Richards
Lewis, Feinberg, Lee, Renaker & Jackson, P.C.
contact info
Amicus
Transgender Law Center
1629 Telegraph Avenue Suite 400
Oakland, CA 94612
Represented By
Gregory R. Nevins
Lambda Legal Defense And Education Fund, Inc.
contact info
Teresa S. Renaker
Lewis, Feinberg, Lee, Renaker & Jackson, P.C.
contact info
Jacob Richards
Lewis, Feinberg, Lee, Renaker & Jackson, P.C.
contact info
Amicus
Transgender Legal Defense & Education Fund, Inc.
151 West 19th Street Suite 1103
New York, NY 10011
Represented By
Gregory R. Nevins
Lambda Legal Defense And Education Fund, Inc.
contact info
Teresa S. Renaker
Lewis, Feinberg, Lee, Renaker & Jackson, P.C.
contact info
Jacob Richards
Lewis, Feinberg, Lee, Renaker & Jackson, P.C.
contact info
Amicus
U.S.EEOC
Atlanta District Office 100 Alabama St, Ste. 4R30
Atlanta, GA 30303
Represented By
Robert K. Dawkins
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission-Atl
contact info
Defendant
Credit Nation Auto Sales, LLC
Represented By
Marc A. Celello
Celello Law Group, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Credit Nation Lending Services, LLC
Plaintiff
Jennifer Chavez
Represented By
Jillian T. Weiss
Law Office Of Jillian T. Weiss
contact info
Jerry L. Worthy, Jr.
Worthy & Associates
contact info

GPO Apr 29 2013
ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION DENYING 11 MOTION to Strike declarations submitted by Plaintiff in support of her response to Defendant's motion to dismiss (Doc 14); and Plaintiff's motion to strike Defendant's reply as untimely, or in the alternative, file a surreply (Doc 15). IT IS RECOMMENDED that Defendant's 6 MOTION to Dismiss be DENIED IN PART as moot with respect to Plaintiff's 42 U.S.C. § 1981(a) claim, and DENIED IN PART without prejudice with respect to Plaintiff's Title VII sex discrimination claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge James Clay Fuller on 4/29/2013. (kt)
GPO Aug 19 2013
ORDER ADOPTING the 20 Report and Recommendations and DENYING the 6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 8/19/2013. (anc)
GPO Jul 18 2014
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on the 9 Amended Complaint filed by Jennifer Chavez. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 7/18/2014. (anc) Modified on 7/18/2014 in order to update document link (anc).
GPO Sep 12 2014
OPINION AND ORDER that Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller's Final Report and Recommendation 76 is ADOPTED, and the Plaintiff's Objections 78 are OVERRULED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 48 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 9/12/2014. (anc)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.