Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Paul G Byron
Referred: Karla R Spaulding
Case #: 6:16-cv-00964
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2016
Terminated:Oct 26, 2016

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
13 13 misc Judgment - prisoner Wed 10/26 9:23 AM
JUDGMENT DISMISSING this case without prejudice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (RDO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2016
12 12 order Order on motion to dismiss Tue 10/25 3:45 PM
ORDER granting 9 motion to dismiss. This case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/25/2016. (DMA)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2016
11 11 respm Response to motion Mon 10/03 8:47 AM
RESPONSE to9 MOTION to Dismiss INSTANT PETITION WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by Gary R. Richardson. (RDO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2016
10 10 order Order directing response to motion Thu 09/08 1:58 PM
ORDER directing Gary R. Richardson to respond to 9 MOTION to Dismiss INSTANT PETITION WITHOUT PREJUDICE within 21 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 9/8/2016. (RDO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2016
9 9 motion Dismiss Wed 09/07 4:59 PM
MOTION to Dismiss INSTANT PETITION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Attorney General, State of Florida, Secretary, Department of Corrections.(McGuigan, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix bookmarked document
Wednesday, August 17, 2016
8 8 notice Notice of pendency of related cases Wed 08/17 2:10 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Attorney General, State of Florida, Secretary, Department of Corrections. (McGuigan, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of appearance Wed 08/17 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Rock McGuigan on behalf of Attorney General, State of Florida, Secretary, Department of Corrections (McGuigan, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2016
6 6 order Order to respond to habeas petition Mon 08/08 3:12 PM
ORDER directing the Respondents to file a Response to the 5 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus within sixty days from the date of this Order. Clerk is directed to serve the petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 8/8/2016. (RDO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2016
5 5 cmp Amended petition for writ of habeas corpus Wed 07/06 10:05 AM
AMENDED PETITION by a State prisoner for writ of habeas corpus filed by Gary R. Richardson.(RDO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits A-G
Wednesday, June 29, 2016
4 4 notice Notice of pendency of related cases Thu 06/30 12:45 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Gary R. Richardson. Related case(s): yes (RDO)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 20, 2016
misc Fees paid Mon 06/20 3:57 PM
HABEAS FEES paid by Gary R. Richardson (Filing fee $5.00 receipt number Orl-54514). (JEV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 09, 2016
3 3 order Order to file amended petition for writ of habeas corpus Thu 06/09 3:07 PM
ORDER to file amended petition for writ of habeas corpus within 14 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 6/9/2016. (RDO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2016
2 2 order Related case order and track 1 notice Tue 06/07 2:07 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/7/2016. (NBL)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2016
1 1 cmp Petition for writ of habeas corpus Mon 06/06 4:23 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus -State filed by Gary R. Richardson.(RDO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits A-E