Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:16-bk-70198

Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jeffery A Deller
Case #: 7:16-ap-07018
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2016
Terminated:Aug 12, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
American Education Services
PO Box 61047
Harrisburg, PA 17106
Represented By
American Education Services
contact info
Plaintiff
Troy Winslow Benson
439 1/2 W DuBois Ave
DuBois, PA 15801
Represented By
Troy Winslow Benson
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Friday, August 12, 2016
12 12 court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Fri 08/12 9:48 AM
Disposition of Adversary, Adversary Case 7:16-ap-7018 Closed. 20 year disposition (bsil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2016
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 07/29 1:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 07/28/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] :10 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tuesday, July 26, 2016
10 10 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 07/26 3:20 PM
Default Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 7/26/2016. Case Ready For Closing on 8/10/2016. (bsil) THIS DOCUMENT WAS NOT SERVED ON RONDA J. WINNECOUR, ESQ. AS THIS CASE IS A CHAPTER 7. Modified on 7/26/2016 (bsil)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, June 21, 2016
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Tue 06/21 3:38 PM
Certificate of Service regarding ECMC's Motion to Dismiss and Order Setting Date Certain for Response and Hearing Regarding the Hearing on 7/28/2016. Filed by ECMC Related [+]. (Neblett, John)
Related: [-] :7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding,8 Hearing Set
8 8 court Hearing Set Tue 06/21 10:41 AM
Order Setting Hearing on Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 7/28/2016 at 10:00 AM at p51 Courtroom B, Penn Traffic Bldg., Johnstown. Responses due by 7/21/2016. cm: John P. Neblett, Esq. (jfur)
Related: [-] :7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Creditor ECMC
Monday, June 20, 2016
7 7 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 06/20 10:35 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by ECMC (Neblett, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 14, 2016
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 06/14 4:20 PM
Summons Service Executed on American Education Services 6/13/2016 . (bsil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Copy of Adversary Cover Sheet and Complaint
Wednesday, June 08, 2016
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing-ap Thu 06/09 1:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. Notice Date 06/08/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] :2 Summons Issued
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing-ap Thu 06/09 1:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. Notice Date 06/08/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] :2 Summons Issued
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing-ap Thu 06/09 1:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. Notice Date 06/08/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] :2 Summons Issued
Monday, June 06, 2016
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 06/06 4:41 PM
One Summons Issued on American Education Services Date Issued 6/6/2016, Answer Due 7/6/2016. If an answer is not timely filed, Plaintiff Shall file a Motion For Default Judgment on or before 7/18/2016. cm: Troy Winslow Benson (jfur)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/06 4:25 PM
Adversary case 16-07018 Complaint by Troy Winslow Benson against American Education Services . Receipt Number NFR, Fee Amount $ 350 . Nature of Suit: (63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)) (bsil) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2016 (bsil)
Related: [-]