Heta, Keenan et al v. B&G Foods North America, Inc.
Wisconsin Western District Court | |
Judge: | William M Conley |
Referred: | Stephen L Crocker |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-00395 |
Nature of Suit | 751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act |
Cause | 29:2601 Family and Medical Leave Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 08, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 15, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 05, 2016 2:35 AM CST |
Defendant
B&G Foods, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
B&G Foods North America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arbnor Heta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keenan Heta
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 02/15 12:57 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal. (Kobelt, Kurt) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) - public docket entry
Wed 02/15 1:08 PM
Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (jat) |
||
Wednesday, September 21, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Pretrial Conference Order
Wed 09/21 9:25 AM
Pretrial Conference Order - Amendments to Pleadings due 11/10/2016. Dispositive Motions due 6/16/2017. Settlement Letters due 10/6/2017. Motions in Limine due 10/13/2017. Response to Motion due 10/27/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2017 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 11/13/2017 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/20/16. (jat) |
|
Tuesday, September 20, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Tue 09/20 10:29 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The parties' stipulation regarding the identity of the proper defendant10 is accepted and entered. The case caption will be amended accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/20/16. (jat) |
|
Friday, September 16, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 09/16 1:43 PM
Stipulation to Amend Caption filed by B&G Foods, Inc. (Seneczko, Alan) Modified on 9/16/2016. (lak) |
|
Monday, September 12, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Mon 09/12 2:30 PM
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Seneczko, Alan) |
|
Thursday, August 18, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/18 10:48 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant B&G Foods, Inc. (Seneczko, Alan) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/18 10:47 AM
ANSWER by Defendant B&G Foods, Inc. (Seneczko, Alan) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/18 10:46 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Alan E. Seneczko for Defendant B&G Foods, Inc. (Seneczko, Alan) |
|
utility
Set Pretrial or Status Conference
Thu 08/18 11:44 AM
Set Telephone Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2016 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [[LINK:Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference] attached] (jat) |
||
Friday, June 24, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 06/24 2:44 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant B&G Foods, Inc.. All Defendants. (Kobelt, Kurt) |
|
Thursday, June 09, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/09 9:55 AM
Summons Issued as to B&G Foods, Inc. (jat) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/09 8:12 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Arbnor Heta, Keenan Heta. (lak) |
|
utility
Add Judge for Shell Case Opening
Thu 06/09 9:52 AM
Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat) |
||
utility
Standard Attachments Sent
Thu 06/09 9:52 AM
Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service:[LINK:NORTC] ,[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] . (jat) |
||
Wednesday, June 08, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Exhibit
Wed 06/08 4:41 PM
Exhibit to1 Complaint filed by Keenan Heta, Arbnor Heta (Kobelt, Kurt) |
|
Att: 1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Disclosure of Corp Affiliations & Financial Interest | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/08 4:11 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Service to be completed by Waiver of Service of Summons. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-1824097.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kobelt, Kurt) |