California Central District Court
Judge:James V Selna
Referred: Jay C Gandhi
Case #: 8:16-cv-01062
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jun 08, 2016
Terminated:Apr 10, 2017
Last checked: Monday Dec 05, 2016 1:19 AM PST
Defendant
Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By
Andrew M Goldsmith
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Ilene S Farkas
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Michael J Niborski
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kobalt Music Publishing America, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew M Goldsmith
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Michael J Niborski
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Warner Music Group Corporation
Represented By
Andrew M Goldsmith
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Ilene S Farkas
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Michael J Niborski
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Edward Christopher Sheeran
Represented By
Andrew M Goldsmith
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Ilene S Farkas
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Michael J Niborski
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Polar Patrol Music Limited
Represented By
Andrew M Goldsmith
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Ilene S Farkas
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Michael J Niborski
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Defendant
John Johnny McDaid
Represented By
Andrew M Goldsmith
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Ilene S Farkas
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Michael J Niborski
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Atlantic Recording Corporation
Represented By
Andrew M Goldsmith
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Ilene S Farkas
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Michael J Niborski
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Warner Music UK Ltd.
Represented By
Andrew M Goldsmith
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Ilene S Farkas
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Michael J Niborski
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Warner Music Group Corporation d/b/a Asylum Records
Defendant
Atlantic Recording Corporation d/b/a Atlantic
Defendant
Sony/ATV Music Publishing (UK) Limited
Represented By
Andrew M Goldsmith
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Ilene S Farkas
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Michael J Niborski
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Edward Christopher Sheeran p/k/a Ed Sheeran
Defendant
Polar Patrol Music Limited d/b/a Polar Patrol Music Publishing
Defendant
Nathan Cable Touring LLP
Represented By
Andrew M Goldsmith
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Ilene S Farkas
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Michael J Niborski
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Defendant
John "Johnny&qu McDaid
Defendant
Ed Sheeran Limited
Represented By
Andrew M Goldsmith
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Ilene S Farkas
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Michael J Niborski
Pryor Cashman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas Leonard
Represented By
Richard S Busch
King And Ballow
contact info
Mark L Block
Wargo And French LLP
contact info
Paul H Duvall
King And Ballow Law Offices
contact info
Plaintiff
Martin Harrington
Represented By
Richard S Busch
King And Ballow
contact info
Mark L Block
Wargo And French LLP
contact info
Paul H Duvall
King And Ballow Law Offices
contact info
Plaintiff
HaloSongs, Inc.
Represented By
Richard S Busch
King And Ballow
contact info
Mark L Block
Wargo And French LLP
contact info
Paul H Duvall
King And Ballow Law Offices
contact info

Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 10, 2017
82 82 order Dismissing Case Mon 04/10 3:15 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge James V. Selna, The Court rules as follows: The claims asserted by Plaintiffs in the above captioned matter, as against all named defendants (including any that have not appeared in this action) are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), and without costs to any party.81 Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (es)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2017
81 81 2 pgs stip Dismiss Case Fri 04/07 3:12 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Defendants Atlantic Recording Corporation, Kobalt Music Publishing America, Inc., Edward Christopher Sheeran, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Warner Music Group Corporation.(Niborski, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order