Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10163

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin Gross
Case #: 1:16-ap-51000
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2016
Terminated:Jul 21, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bucksport Leasing LLC
6775 Lenox Center Court, Suite 400
Memphis, TX 38115
Represented By
Bucksport Leasing LLC
contact info
Defendant
NewPage Wisconsin System Inc.
8540 Gander Creek Drive
Miamisburg, OH 45342
Represented By
NewPage Wisconsin System Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Chillicothe Paper Inc.
8540 Gander Creek Drive
Miamisburg, OH 45342
Represented By
Chillicothe Paper Inc.
contact info
Defendant
NewPage Energy Services LLC
8540 Gander Creek Drive
Miamisburg, OH 45342
Represented By
NewPage Energy Services LLC
contact info
Defendant
Upland Resources, Inc.
8540 Gander Creek Drive
Miamisburg, OH 45342
Represented By
Upland Resources, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Wickliffe Paper Company LLC
8540 Gander Creek Drive
Miamisburg, OH 45342
Represented By
Wickliffe Paper Company LLC
contact info
Defendant
Rumford Paper Company
8540 Gander Creek Drive
Miamisburg, OH 45342
Represented By
Rumford Paper Company
contact info
Defendant
Luke Paper Company
8540 Gander Creek Drive
Miamisburg, OH 45342
Represented By
Luke Paper Company
contact info
Defendant
Escanaba Paper Company
8540 Gander Creek Drive
Miamisburg, OH 45342
Represented By
Escanaba Paper Company
contact info
Defendant
NewPage Consolidated Papers Inc.
8540 Gander Creek Drive
Miamisburg, OH 45342
Represented By
NewPage Consolidated Papers Inc.
contact info
Defendant
NewPage Corporation
Represented By
NewPage Corporation
contact info
Defendant
NewPage Investment Company LLC
6775 Lenox Center Court Suite 400
Memphis, TN 38115
Represented By
NewPage Investment Company LLC
contact info
Defendant
NewPage Holdings Inc.
6775 Lenox Center Court Suite 400
Memphis, TN 38115
Represented By
NewPage Holdings Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Verso Fiber Farm LLC
6775 Lenox Center Court, Suite 400
Memphis, TN 38115
Represented By
Verso Fiber Farm LLC
contact info
Defendant
Verso Sartell LLC
6775 Lenox Center Court, Suite 400
Memphis, TN 38115
Represented By
Verso Sartell LLC
contact info
Defendant
Verso Quinnesec LLC
6775 Lenox Center Court, Suite 400
Memphis, TN 38115
Represented By
Verso Quinnesec LLC
contact info
Defendant
Verso Maine Energy LLC
6775 Lenox Center Court, Suite 400
Memphis, TN 38115
Represented By
Verso Maine Energy LLC
contact info
Defendant
Verso Quinnesec REP Holding Inc.
6775 Lenox Center Court, Suite 400
Memphis, TN 38115
Represented By
Verso Quinnesec REP Holding Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Verso Androscoggin LLC
6775 Lenox Center Court, Suite 400
Memphis, TN 38115
Represented By
Verso Androscoggin LLC
contact info
Defendant
nexTier Solutions Corporation
6775 Lenox Center Court, Suite 400
Memphis, TN 38115
Represented By
nexTier Solutions Corporation
contact info
Defendant
Verso Paper LLC
6775 Lenox Center Court, Suite 400
Memphis, TN 38115
Represented By
Verso Paper LLC
contact info
Defendant
Verso Paper Inc.
6775 Lenox Center Court, Suite 400
Memphis, TN 38115
Represented By
Verso Paper Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Verso Paper Finance Holdings Inc.
6775 Lenox Center Court, Suite 400
Memphis, TN 38115
Represented By
Verso Paper Finance Holdings Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Verso Paper Holdings LLC
6775 Lenox Center Court, Suite 400
Memphis, TN 38115
Represented By
Verso Paper Holdings LLC
contact info
Defendant
Verso Paper Finance Holdings LLC
6775 Lenox Center Court, Suite 400
Memphis, TN 38115
Represented By
Verso Paper Finance Holdings LLC
contact info
Defendant
Verso Paper Finance Holdings One LLC
6775 Lenox Center Court, Suite 400
Memphis, TN 38115
Represented By
Verso Paper Finance Holdings One LLC
contact info
Defendant
Verso Corporation
6775 Lenox Center Court, Suite 400
Memphis, TN 38115
Represented By
Verso Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Expera Specialty Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Mark Minuti
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, July 21, 2016
court Close Adversary Case Thu 07/21 10:50 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-51000 Closed (SH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2016
19 19 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Wed 07/20 8:50 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Notice of Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on July 18, 2016 at 10:00 . Filed by Prime Clerk. Related [+] (Adler, Adam)
Related: [-] 14
18 18 notice Dismissal - Notice Wed 07/20 2:30 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Expera Specialty Solutions, LLC (Currier, Teresa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, July 15, 2016
17 17 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Fri 07/15 7:34 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing by Daniel Kounin regarding Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on July 18, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. (EDT) . Filed by Prime Clerk. Related [+] (Adler, Adam)
Related: [-] 14
16 16 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Fri 07/15 2:57 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Bucksport Leasing LLC, Chillicothe Paper Inc., Escanaba Paper Company, Luke Paper Company, NewPage Consolidated Papers Inc., NewPage Corporation, NewPage Energy Services LLC, NewPage Holdings Inc., NewPage Investment Company LLC, NewPage Wisconsin System Inc., Rumford Paper Company, Upland Resources, Inc., Verso Androscoggin LLC, Verso Corporation, Verso Fiber Farm LLC, Verso Maine Energy LLC, Verso Paper Finance Holdings Inc., Verso Paper Finance Holdings LLC, Verso Paper Finance Holdings One LLC, Verso Paper Holdings LLC, Verso Paper Inc., Verso Paper LLC, Verso Quinnesec LLC, Verso Quinnesec REP Holding Inc., Verso Sartell LLC, Wickliffe Paper Company LLC, nexTier Solutions Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 7/18/2016 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, July 14, 2016
15 15 order Order Regarding Omnibus Objection to Claims Thu 07/14 3:50 PM
Order Authorizing The Debtors To Enter Into Settlement Agreement With Expera Specialty Products, LLC. Related [+] Signed on 7/14/2016. (BJM)
Related: [-] 10 ,13
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
14 14 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Adv) Thu 07/14 12:05 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Bucksport Leasing LLC, Chillicothe Paper Inc., Escanaba Paper Company, Luke Paper Company, NewPage Consolidated Papers Inc., NewPage Corporation, NewPage Energy Services LLC, NewPage Holdings Inc., NewPage Investment Company LLC, NewPage Wisconsin System Inc., Rumford Paper Company, Upland Resources, Inc., Verso Androscoggin LLC, Verso Corporation, Verso Fiber Farm LLC, Verso Maine Energy LLC, Verso Paper Finance Holdings Inc., Verso Paper Finance Holdings LLC, Verso Paper Finance Holdings One LLC, Verso Paper Holdings LLC, Verso Paper Inc., Verso Paper LLC, Verso Quinnesec LLC, Verso Quinnesec REP Holding Inc., Verso Sartell LLC, Wickliffe Paper Company LLC, nexTier Solutions Corporation Hearing scheduled for 7/18/2016 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2016
13 13 misc Certificate of No Objection(Adv) Wed 07/13 10:36 AM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order to Enter Into Settlement Agreement with Expera Specialty Products, LLC Related [+] Filed by Bucksport Leasing LLC, Chillicothe Paper Inc., Escanaba Paper Company, Luke Paper Company, NewPage Consolidated Papers Inc., NewPage Corporation, NewPage Energy Services LLC, NewPage Holdings Inc., NewPage Investment Company LLC, NewPage Wisconsin System Inc., Rumford Paper Company, Upland Resources, Inc., Verso Androscoggin LLC, Verso Corporation, Verso Fiber Farm LLC, Verso Maine Energy LLC, Verso Paper Finance Holdings Inc., Verso Paper Finance Holdings LLC, Verso Paper Finance Holdings One LLC, Verso Paper Holdings LLC, Verso Paper Inc., Verso Paper LLC, Verso Quinnesec LLC, Verso Quinnesec REP Holding Inc., Verso Sartell LLC, Wickliffe Paper Company LLC, nexTier Solutions Corporation. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-] 10
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, June 27, 2016
12 12 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Mon 06/27 8:03 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Kevin T. Curry Regarding Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtors to Enter into Settlement Agreement with Expera Specialty Products, LLC and Michael A. Weinhold's eclaration in Support of Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtors to Enter into Settlement Agreement with Expera Specialty Solutions, LLC . Filed by Prime Clerk. Related [+] (Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 10 ,11
Wednesday, June 22, 2016
11 11 misc Declaration in Support Wed 06/22 11:57 AM
Declaration in Support // Michael A. Weinhold's Declaration in Support of Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order to Enter Into Settlement Agreement with Expera Specialty Products, LLC Related [+] Filed by Bucksport Leasing LLC, Chillicothe Paper Inc., Escanaba Paper Company, Luke Paper Company, NewPage Consolidated Papers Inc., NewPage Corporation, NewPage Energy Services LLC, NewPage Holdings Inc., NewPage Investment Company LLC, NewPage Wisconsin System Inc., Rumford Paper Company, Upland Resources, Inc., Verso Androscoggin LLC, Verso Corporation, Verso Fiber Farm LLC, Verso Maine Energy LLC, Verso Paper Finance Holdings Inc., Verso Paper Finance Holdings LLC, Verso Paper Finance Holdings One LLC, Verso Paper Holdings LLC, Verso Paper Inc., Verso Paper LLC, Verso Quinnesec LLC, Verso Quinnesec REP Holding Inc., Verso Sartell LLC, Wickliffe Paper Company LLC, nexTier Solutions Corporation. (Haywood, Brett)
Related: [-] 10
10 10 motion Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion Wed 06/22 11:55 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 // Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order to Enter Into Settlement Agreement with Expera Specialty Products, LLC Filed by Bucksport Leasing LLC, Chillicothe Paper Inc., Escanaba Paper Company, Luke Paper Company, NewPage Consolidated Papers Inc., NewPage Corporation, NewPage Energy Services LLC, NewPage Holdings Inc., NewPage Investment Company LLC, NewPage Wisconsin System Inc., Rumford Paper Company, Upland Resources, Inc., Verso Androscoggin LLC, Verso Corporation, Verso Fiber Farm LLC, Verso Maine Energy LLC, Verso Paper Finance Holdings Inc., Verso Paper Finance Holdings LLC, Verso Paper Finance Holdings One LLC, Verso Paper Holdings LLC, Verso Paper Inc., Verso Paper LLC, Verso Quinnesec LLC, Verso Quinnesec REP Holding Inc., Verso Sartell LLC, Wickliffe Paper Company LLC, nexTier Solutions Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 7/18/2016 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/6/2016. (Haywood, Brett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Thursday, June 16, 2016
9 9 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Thu 06/16 2:42 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Kevin Curry Regarding Notice of Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on June 13, 2016 at 10:30 A.M. (EDT) . Filed by Prime Clerk LLC. Related [+] (Adler, Adam)
Related: [-] 6
Wednesday, June 15, 2016
8 8 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Wed 06/15 7:50 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Of Kevin Curry Regarding Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on June 13, 2016 at 10:30 A.M. (EDT) . Filed by Prime Clerk LLC. Related [+] (Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 6
Sunday, June 12, 2016
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Sun 06/12 11:43 AM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Verso Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 6/13/2016 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Haywood, Brett)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2016
6 6 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Fri 06/10 5:28 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Verso Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 6/13/2016 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Haywood, Brett)
Related: [-]
5 5 crditcrd none Fri 06/10 3:20 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-51000 KG) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8050893, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Hearing - Notice Fri 06/10 1:00 PM
Notice of Hearing on Motion of Expera Specialty Solutions for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7065 Related [+] Filed by Expera Specialty Solutions, LLC Hearing scheduled for 6/13/2016 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Murley, Lucian)
Related: [-] 2
3 3 17 pgs misc Memorandum of Law Fri 06/10 12:16 PM
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion of Expera Specialty Solutions for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7065 Related [+] Filed by Expera Specialty Solutions, LLC. (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-] 2
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit
2 2 motion Temporary Restraining Order - Motion Fri 06/10 12:13 PM
Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7065 Filed by Expera Specialty Solutions, LLC. (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 06/10 12:08 PM
Adversary case 16-51000 Complaint of Expera Specialty Solutions for Injunctive Relief and Damages by Expera Specialty Solutions, LLC against Verso Corporation, Verso Paper Finance Holdings One LLC, Verso Paper Finance Holdings LLC, Verso Paper Holdings LLC, Verso Paper Finance Holdings Inc., Verso Paper Inc., Verso Paper LLC, nexTier Solutions Corporation, Verso Androscoggin LLC, Verso Quinnesec REP Holding Inc., Verso Maine Energy LLC, Verso Quinnesec LLC, Bucksport Leasing LLC, Verso Sartell LLC, Verso Fiber Farm LLC, NewPage Holdings Inc., NewPage Investment Company LLC, NewPage Corporation, NewPage Consolidated Papers Inc., Escanaba Paper Company, Luke Paper Company, Rumford Paper Company, Wickliffe Paper Company LLC, Upland Resources, Inc., NewPage Energy Services LLC, Chillicothe Paper Inc., NewPage Wisconsin System Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (72 (Injunctive relief - other)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 09/8/2016. (Minuti, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B