Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:15-bk-02700

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David M Warren
Case #: 5:16-ap-00073
Nature of Suit31 Bankruptcy - Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - §363(h)
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2016
Terminated:Oct 17, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Margarita Lau
1150 24th Place SW
Vero Beach, FL 32962
Represented By
Margarita Lau
contact info
Defendant
Blue Chip Rentals, Cabins & Condos, LLC
Attn: Managing Agent 1013 Centre Road, Suite 403-A
Wilmington, DE 19805
Represented By
Blue Chip Rentals, Cabins & Condos, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Mary Ann Mazzella
6063 NW 32nd Avenue
Boca Raton, FL 33496
Represented By
Mary Ann Mazzella
contact info
Defendant
Joann N. Britt
607 Lynch Drive
Goldsboro, NC 27530
Represented By
Joann N. Britt
contact info
Defendant
Billy G. Britt
607 Lynch Drive
Goldsboro, NC 27530
Represented By
Billy G. Britt
contact info
Defendant
Richard Inouye
204 N. El Camino Real, Apt #E-226
Encinitas, CA 92024
Represented By
Richard Inouye
contact info
Defendant
Leslie Inouye
204 N. El Camino Real, Apt #E-226
Encinitas, CA 92024
Represented By
Leslie Inouye
contact info
Defendant
Barbara Fulton
7870 Cook Road
Plain City, OH 43064
Represented By
Barbara Fulton
contact info
Defendant
Victoria L. Goins
7107 Rolling Hills Drive
Sherrills Ford, NC 28673
Represented By
Victoria L. Goins
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Hoke
881 Camp Victory Road
Somerset, KY 42501
Represented By
Joseph Hoke
contact info
Defendant
Dana Lau
1150 24th Place SW
Vero Beach, FL 32962
Represented By
Dana Lau
contact info
Defendant
Mary Elizabeth Tietgens
18 Gulliver Drive
Sanford, ME 04073
Represented By
Mary Elizabeth Tietgens
contact info
Defendant
Frank Tietgens
18 Gulliver Drive
Sanford, ME 04073
Represented By
Frank Tietgens
contact info
Defendant
Wilmer Standfield
101 East Carnaby Court
Cary, NC 27513
Represented By
Wilmer Standfield
contact info
Defendant
Roger E. Doss
4168 Willis Way
Milton, FL 32583
Represented By
Roger E. Doss
contact info
Defendant
Genie L. Doss
4168 Willis Way
Milton, FL 32583
Represented By
Genie L. Doss
contact info
Defendant
Tonya Frye
2240 Laurel Cove Dr
Virginia Beach, VA 23454
Represented By
Tonya Frye
contact info
Defendant
Michael A. Frye
2240 Laurel Cove Dr
Virginia Beach, VA 23454
Represented By
Michael A. Frye
contact info
Plaintiff
Peppertree-Atlantic Beach Association, Inc.
PO Box 1068
Atlantic Beach, NC 28512
Represented By
Hope Derby Carmichael
Jordan Price Wall Gray Jones & Carlton
contact info
Rebecca F. Redwine
Hendren Redwine & Malone, PLLC
contact info
Paul T. Flick
Jordan, Price, Wall, Gray, Jones, Carlto
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Monday, October 17, 2016
court Close Adversary Case Mon 10/17 10:51 AM
Adversary Case 5:16-ap-73 Closed (Barnes, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 14, 2016
court Returned Mail (Text) Fri 10/14 4:21 PM
Notification of Returned Mail addressed to Defendant Michael A. Frye, Tonya Frye, Leslie Inouye and Richard Inouye. Related [+] (Barnes, Dawn)
Related: [-] ument no.12 Order on Motion for Default Judgment, Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Sunday, October 02, 2016
13 13 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 10/03 1:10 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 10/02/2016. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Friday, September 30, 2016
12 12 order Default Judgment Fri 09/30 10:45 AM
Order Granting Motions. Default Judgment as to Blue Chip Rentals, Cabins & Condos, LLC , Billy G. Britt , Joann N. Britt , Genie L. Doss , Roger E. Doss , Michael A. Frye , Tonya Frye , Barbara Fulton , Victoria L. Goins , Joseph Hoke , Kimberly D. Hoke , Leslie Inouye , Richard Inouye , Dana Lau , Margarita Lau , Mary Ann Mazzella , Wilmer Standfield , Frank Tietgens , Mary Elizabeth Tietgens Related [+], Appeal time due 10/14/2016. (Barnes, Dawn)
Related: [-] s #6 ,8
Tuesday, August 23, 2016
court Returned Mail (Text) Tue 08/23 9:40 AM
Notification of Returned Mail addressed to Defendant Richard and Leslie Inouye. Related [+] (Barnes, Dawn)
Related: [-] ument no.10 Entry of Default
Wednesday, August 10, 2016
11 11 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Thu 08/11 1:17 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 08/10/2016. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Monday, August 08, 2016
10 10 court Entry of Default Mon 08/08 10:48 AM
Entry of Default Related [+] (Skinner, Donna)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Peppertree-Atlantic Beach Association, Inc.
Thursday, August 04, 2016
9 9 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Fri 08/05 1:28 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 08/04/2016. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
8 8 motion Default Judgment Thu 08/04 11:12 AM
Motion for Entry of Default as to Leslie Inouye, Richard Inouye, Motion for Default Judgment as to Leslie Inouye, Richard Inouye filed by Hope Derby Carmichael on behalf of Peppertree-Atlantic Beach Association, Inc.. (Carmichael, Hope)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 02, 2016
7 7 court Entry of Default Tue 08/02 10:26 AM
Entry of Default Related [+] (Skinner, Donna)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Peppertree-Atlantic Beach Association, Inc.
Monday, August 01, 2016
6 6 motion Default Judgment Mon 08/01 11:09 AM
Motion for Entry of Default as to Blue Chip Rentals, Cabins & Condos, LLC, Billy G. Britt, Joann N. Britt, Genie L. Doss, Roger E. Doss, Michael A. Frye, Tonya Frye, Barbara Fulton, Victoria L. Goins, Joseph Hoke, Kimberly D. Hoke, Dana Lau, Margarita Lau, Mary Ann Mazzella, Wilmer Standfield, Frank Tietgens, Mary Elizabeth Tietgens, Motion for Default Judgment as to Blue Chip Rentals, Cabins & Condos, LLC, Billy G. Britt, Joann N. Britt, Genie L. Doss, Roger E. Doss, Michael A. Frye, Tonya Frye, Barbara Fulton, Victoria L. Goins, Joseph Hoke, Kimberly D. Hoke, Dana Lau, Margarita Lau, Mary Ann Mazzella, Wilmer Standfield, Frank Tietgens, Mary Elizabeth Tietgens filed by Hope Derby Carmichael on behalf of Peppertree-Atlantic Beach Association, Inc.. (Carmichael, Hope)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2016
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 06/15 2:50 PM
Summons Service Executed on Leslie Inouye 6/15/2016; Richard Inouye 6/15/2016. filed by Hope Derby Carmichael on behalf of Peppertree-Atlantic Beach Association, Inc.. (Carmichael, Hope)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2016
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 06/14 2:09 PM
Summons Service Executed on Blue Chip Rentals, Cabins & Condos, LLC 6/13/2016; Billy G. Britt 6/13/2016; Joann N. Britt 6/13/2016; Genie L. Doss 6/13/2016; Roger E. Doss 6/13/2016; Michael A. Frye 6/13/2016; Tonya Frye 6/13/2016; Barbara Fulton 6/13/2016; Victoria L. Goins 6/13/2016; Joseph Hoke 6/13/2016; Dana Lau 6/13/2016; Margarita Lau 6/13/2016; Mary Ann Mazzella 6/13/2016; Wilmer Standfield 6/13/2016; Frank Tietgens 6/13/2016; Mary Elizabeth Tietgens 6/13/2016. filed by Jason L. Hendren on behalf of Peppertree-Atlantic Beach Association, Inc.. (Hendren, Jason)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 11, 2016
utility Set Deadline (Private) Sat 06/11 1:07 PM
Answer due by 07/25/2016 (adi)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2016
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 06/10 2:31 PM
Summons Issued on Leslie Inouye Answer Due 7/25/2016; Richard Inouye Answer Due 7/25/2016. (Barnes, Dawn)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 06/10 11:00 AM
Summons Issued on Michael A. Frye Answer Due 07/11/2016; Tonya Frye Answer Due 07/11/2016; Genie L. Doss Answer Due 07/11/2016; Roger E. Doss Answer Due 07/11/2016; Wilmer Standfield Answer Due 07/11/2016; Frank Tietgens Answer Due 07/11/2016; Mary Elizabeth Tietgens Answer Due 07/11/2016; Dana Lau Answer Due 07/11/2016; Margarita Lau Answer Due 07/11/2016; Joseph Hoke Answer Due 07/11/2016; Victoria L. Goins Answer Due 07/11/2016; Barbara Fulton Answer Due 07/11/2016; Billy G. Britt Answer Due 07/11/2016; Joann N. Britt Answer Due 07/11/2016; Mary Ann Mazzella Answer Due 07/11/2016; Blue Chip Rentals, Cabins & Condos, LLC Answer Due 07/11/2016 (Carmichael, Hope)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/10 11:00 AM
Adversary case 16-00073 5. Complaint by Peppertree-Atlantic Beach Association, Inc. against Michael A. Frye, Tonya Frye, Genie L. Doss, Roger E. Doss, Wilmer Standfield, Frank Tietgens, Mary Elizabeth Tietgens, Dana Lau, Margarita Lau, Joseph Hoke, Victoria L. Goins, Barbara Fulton, Leslie Inouye, Richard Inouye, Billy G. Britt, Joann N. Britt, Mary Ann Mazzella, Blue Chip Rentals, Cabins & Condos, LLC (Fee Paid) (31 (Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - 363(h))) (Carmichael, Hope)
Related: [-]
utility Note - CA Assignment (Public) Fri 06/10 11:04 AM
NOTE: Case manager assigned to case is Dawn Barnes (Shum-Drake, Kelly)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Fri 06/10 4:27 PM
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Complaint 16-00073 5-DMW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00), Receipt Number 12120430, Amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]