New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Raymond J Dearie
Referred: Marcia M Henry
Case #: 1:16-cv-03029
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:1201 Civil Rights (Disability)
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2016
Terminated:Jul 21, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 07, 2016 4:19 AM EST
Defendant
Diane Bosse
Represented By
Michelle Lambert
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Michael Colodner
Represented By
Michelle Lambert
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
John J McAlary
Represented By
Michelle Lambert
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Robert McMillen
Represented By
Michelle Lambert
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
E. Leo Milonas
Represented By
Michelle Lambert
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
New York State Board of Law Examiners
Represented By
Michelle Lambert
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Bryan Williams
Represented By
Michelle Lambert
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Tamara Wyche
Represented By
Jo Anne Simon
Law Office Of Jo Anne Simon
contact info
Mary Caroline Vargas
Stein & Vargas LLP
contact info

GPO Sep 26 2017
s and filings,the Court directs the clerk to amend the caption and other docket entries to reflect Plaintiff initials and to temporarily seal the complaint and briefing on the motion to dismiss to allow the parties to propose limited redactions to protect the personal privacy of Plaintiff. Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted in part. The Court dismisses T.W.'s claims under Title III of the ADA and the NYCHRL, and her individual capacity claims against the chair and members of the MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding 30 Motion to Seal and 16 Motion to Dismiss; The Court declines, however, to order the blanket sealing of documents T. W. requests,including the complaint. To protect the public interest in access to court documentBoard. The Court defers ruling on the application of Defendants'sovereign immunity defense to T.W.'s claims under Title II of the ADA and Section 504 of the Rehabilitation Act until T.W. has an opportunity to conduct limited discovery into the Board's possible waiver of its sovereign immunity under the Rehabilitation Act. Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 9/25/2017. (Piper, Francine)
GPO Sep 18 2019
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Defendant's motion to dismiss is denied. SO Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 9/18/2019. (Almonte, Giselle)
GPO Nov 14 2019
MEMORANDUM & ORDER, Defendants' 87 Motion for Reconsideration is denied. So Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 11/12/2019. (Lee, Tiffeny)
GPO Nov 14 2019
REVISED MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying Defendants' 87 Motion for Reconsideration So Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 11/14/2019. (Lee, Tiffeny)
GPO Jul 19 2022
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is granted in its entirety and Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. SO Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 7/19/2022. (Tavarez, Jennifer)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, October 10, 2024
116 116 appeal USCA Mandate Thu 10/10 9:31 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to115 Notice of Appeal filed by T.W.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the district courtsjudgment is AFFIRMED. Issued as mandate: 10/10/2024. USCA- 22-1661 (AMR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Document