New York Southern District Court
Judge:Denise L Cote
Referred: Michael H Dolinger
Case #: 1:02-cv-03288
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2002
Re-opened:Jun 18, 2004
Terminated:Aug 04, 2008

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, June 10, 2016
3366 3366 order Order Fri 06/10 5:25 PM
ORDER On June 6, 2016, the Court received a letter dated May 30, from Betty Hicks regarding a possible claim in the above-captioned matter. The Court has sent a copy of this correspondence to class counsel. The Court requests that class counsel respond to Ms. Hicks letter of May 30 with a copy to the Court. (Signed by Judge Denise Cote on 6/10/2016) (gf)
Related: [-]