Blum v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | David S Doty |
Referred: | Tony N Leung |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-01937 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Jun 10, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 15, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 07, 2016 3:06 AM CST |
Defendant
Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelly Blum
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 02/15 2:08 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 2/13/2017. (DLO) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 02/14 8:58 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Kelly Blum. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 01/19 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael John Kemmitt on behalf of Kelly Blum. (Kemmitt, Michael) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 01/19 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen S Gyolai on behalf of Kelly Blum. (Gyolai, Kristen) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Letter to Magistrate Judge
Tue 01/17 1:29 PM
LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company re Settlement . (Santos, Margaret) |
|
Tuesday, November 08, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Letter to Magistrate Judge
Tue 11/08 9:54 AM
LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Kelly Blum . (Santos, Margaret) |
|
Wednesday, September 28, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 09/29 12:09 PM
ORDER FOR EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 2/24/2017 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/28/2016. (KNK) |
|
18 | 18
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 09/28 5:01 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (ERISA BENEFITS CASE) Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2016. Discovery due by 1/1/2017. Motions (non-disp) due 1/1/2017. Motions (disp) due by 4/1/2017. Ready for trial due by 7/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/28/2016. (KNK) |
|
Tuesday, September 27, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Tue 09/27 12:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/27/2016. Discussion of pretrial deadlines Pretrial scheduling order will be issued. The Court encouraged the parties to work diligently and to consider possibilities for resolving the matter. (KNK) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 09/26 2:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Operana on behalf of Kelly Blum. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Monday, September 19, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Mon 09/19 11:53 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Kelly Blum.(Santos, Margaret) |
|
Wednesday, August 31, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney
Wed 08/31 9:56 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Berger, Michael) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/31 9:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Ann Santos on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
Tuesday, August 16, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 08/16 2:40 PM
NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 9/27/2016 11:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/15/2016.(KNK) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
Thursday, August 11, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/11 4:44 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. MetLife, Inc. is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Berger, Michael) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/11 4:42 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Berger, Michael) |
|
Monday, July 11, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 07/11 2:49 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kelly Blum. (Gyolai, Kristen) |
|
Wednesday, July 06, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/06 8:19 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel K. Ryan for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/6/16. (MAM) |
|
Tuesday, July 05, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident)
Tue 07/05 11:12 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5004424 by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Berger, Michael) |
|
Thursday, June 30, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 06/30 12:38 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 6/16/2016, answer due 8/15/2016. (Berger, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/30 12:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T Berger on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Berger, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, June 15, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Wed 06/15 4:07 PM
ORDER re: Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 6/15/2016. (CLB) |
|
Friday, June 10, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/10 3:21 PM
Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (AKL) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Fri 06/10 3:20 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 16cv1937 DSD/TNL. (AKL) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/10 2:34 PM
COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-4970601.) Filed by Kelly Blum. Filer requests summons issued. (Gyolai, Kristen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |