Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:15-bk-02700

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David M Warren
Case #: 5:16-ap-00111
Nature of Suit31 Bankruptcy - Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - §363(h)
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2016
Terminated:Oct 18, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Leonard F. McCullough
308 Miracle Strip Pkwy, Apt 14B
Fort Walton Beach, FL 32548
Represented By
Leonard F. McCullough
contact info
Defendant
Shirley A. McCullough
308 Miracle Strip Pkwy, Apt 14B
Fort Walton Beach, FL 32548
Represented By
Shirley A. McCullough
contact info
Defendant
Linda H. Jones
110 Hollywood Blvd
Havelock, NC 28532
Represented By
Linda H. Jones
contact info
Defendant
William C Moore
6252 NC Hwy 11N
Bethel, NC 27812
Represented By
William C Moore
contact info
Defendant
Betty H. Moore
6252 NC Hwy 11N
Bethel, NC 27812
Represented By
Betty H. Moore
contact info
Defendant
Edward J. Medici
933 Wooten Street
Boonton, NJ 07005
Represented By
Edward J. Medici
contact info
Defendant
John D. Fearnow
521 Blue Heron Dr
Newport, NC 28570
Represented By
John D. Fearnow
contact info
Defendant
Shirley I. Fearnow
521 Blue Heron Dr
Newport, NC 28570
Represented By
Shirley I. Fearnow
contact info
Defendant
Rita Whitfield
70 Sand Trap Ln
Roxboro, NC 27573
Represented By
Rita Whitfield
contact info
Defendant
Gardner Lee Whitfield, Jr.
70 Sand Trap Ln
Roxboro, NC 27573
Represented By
Gardner Lee Whitfield, Jr.
contact info
Defendant
Julia Herring
3201 Trenton Road
Raleigh, NC 27607
Represented By
Julia Herring
contact info
Defendant
Major J. Herring, III
3201 Trenton Road
Raleigh, NC 27607
Represented By
Major J. Herring, III
contact info
Defendant
Blue Chip Premier Rentals, Cabins & Condos, LLC
1013 Centre Road, Suite 403-A
Wilmington, DE 19805
Represented By
Blue Chip Premier Rentals, Cabins & Condos, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Peppertree-Atlantic Beach Association, Inc.
PO Box 1068
Atlantic Beach, NC 28512
Represented By
Hope Derby Carmichael
Jordan Price Wall Gray Jones & Carlton
contact info
Jason L. Hendren
Hendren Redwine & Malone, PLLC
contact info
Paul T. Flick
Jordan, Price, Wall, Gray, Jones, Carlto
contact info
Rebecca F. Redwine
Hendren Redwine & Malone, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Friday, October 21, 2016
court Returned Mail (Text) Fri 10/21 3:09 PM
Notification of Returned Mail addressed to Defendant Leonard F. McCullough and Shirley A. McCullough. Related [+] (Barnes, Dawn)
Related: [-] ument no.8 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Tuesday, October 18, 2016
court Close Adversary Case Tue 10/18 9:35 AM
Adversary Case 5:16-ap-111 Closed (Barnes, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2016
9 9 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 10/06 1:32 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 10/05/2016. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8
Monday, October 03, 2016
8 8 order Default Judgment Mon 10/03 1:42 PM
Order Granting Motion. Default Judgment as to Blue Chip Premier Rentals, Cabins & Condos, LLC , John D. Fearnow , Shirley I. Fearnow , Julia Herring , Major J. Herring III, Linda H. Jones , Leonard F. McCullough , Shirley A. McCullough , Edward J. Medici , Betty H. Moore , William C Moore Related [+] Appeal time due 10/17/2016. (Barnes, Dawn)
Related: [-] 5
Monday, August 15, 2016
utility Address Modified Mon 08/15 10:02 AM
Address Modified. (Barnes, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2016
misc Address Change - Creditor/Party (Text) Fri 08/12 10:52 AM
Notification of Address Change ( Both Notices and Payments ) for Edward J. Medici. Existing address is 933 Wooten Street, Boonton, NJ 07005. New address is 13920 Ginger Creek Blvd., Orlando, FL 32826 filed by Jason L. Hendren on behalf of Peppertree-Atlantic Beach Association, Inc.. (Hendren, Jason)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 07, 2016
7 7 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Mon 08/08 1:12 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 08/07/2016. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6
Friday, August 05, 2016
6 6 court Entry of Default Fri 08/05 10:23 AM
Entry of Default Related [+] (Skinner, Donna)
Related: [-] 5 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Peppertree-Atlantic Beach Association, Inc.
Tuesday, August 02, 2016
5 5 motion Default Judgment Tue 08/02 2:29 PM
Motion for Entry of Default as to Blue Chip Premier Rentals, Cabins & Condos, LLC, John D. Fearnow, Shirley I. Fearnow, Julia Herring, Major J. Herring III, Linda H. Jones, Leonard F. McCullough, Shirley A. McCullough, Edward J. Medici, Betty H. Moore, William C Moore, Motion for Default Judgment as to Blue Chip Premier Rentals, Cabins & Condos, LLC, John D. Fearnow, Shirley I. Fearnow, Julia Herring, Major J. Herring III, Linda H. Jones, Leonard F. McCullough, Shirley A. McCullough, Edward J. Medici, Betty H. Moore, William C Moore filed by Hope Derby Carmichael on behalf of Peppertree-Atlantic Beach Association, Inc.. (Carmichael, Hope)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2016
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 07/28 6:01 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Gardner Lee Whitfield Jr., Rita Whitfield filed by Hope Derby Carmichael on behalf of Peppertree-Atlantic Beach Association, Inc.. (Carmichael, Hope)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2016
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 06/14 4:29 PM
Summons Service Executed on Blue Chip Premier Rentals, Cabins & Condos, LLC 6/14/2016; John D. Fearnow 6/14/2016; Shirley I. Fearnow 6/14/2016; Julia Herring 6/14/2016; Major J. Herring III 6/14/2016; Linda H. Jones 6/14/2016; Leonard F. McCullough 6/14/2016; Shirley A. McCullough 6/14/2016; Edward J. Medici 6/14/2016; Betty H. Moore 6/14/2016; William C Moore 6/14/2016; Gardner Lee Whitfield Jr. 6/14/2016; Rita Whitfield 6/14/2016. filed by Jason L. Hendren on behalf of Peppertree-Atlantic Beach Association, Inc.. (Hendren, Jason)
Related: [-]
utility Note - CA Assignment (Public) Tue 06/14 7:36 AM
NOTE: Case manager assigned to case is Dawn Barnes. (Skinner, Donna)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadline (Private) Tue 06/14 1:07 PM
Answer due by 07/13/2016 (adi)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2016
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 06/13 4:45 PM
Summons Issued on Leonard F. McCullough Answer Due 07/13/2016; Shirley A. McCullough Answer Due 07/13/2016; Linda H. Jones Answer Due 07/13/2016; William C Moore Answer Due 07/13/2016; Betty H. Moore Answer Due 07/13/2016; Edward J. Medici Answer Due 07/13/2016; John D. Fearnow Answer Due 07/13/2016; Shirley I. Fearnow Answer Due 07/13/2016; Rita Whitfield Answer Due 07/13/2016; Gardner Lee Whitfield, Jr. Answer Due 07/13/2016; Julia Herring Answer Due 07/13/2016; Major J. Herring, III Answer Due 07/13/2016; Blue Chip Premier Rentals, Cabins & Condos, LLC Answer Due 07/13/2016 (Flick, Paul)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/13 4:45 PM
Adversary case 16-00111 5. Complaint by Peppertree-Atlantic Beach Association, Inc. against Leonard F. McCullough, Shirley A. McCullough, Linda H. Jones, William C Moore, Betty H. Moore, Edward J. Medici, John D. Fearnow, Shirley I. Fearnow, Rita Whitfield, Gardner Lee Whitfield, Jr., Julia Herring, Major J. Herring, III, Blue Chip Premier Rentals, Cabins & Condos, LLC (Fee Paid) (31 (Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - 363(h))) (Flick, Paul)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Mon 06/13 4:46 PM
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Complaint 16-00111 5-DMW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00), Receipt Number 12124603, Amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]