Premier Exhibitions, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 3:16-bk-02230
Lead case is: 3:16-bk-02230
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jason A Burgess |
Case #: | 3:16-bk-02232 |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2016 |
Plan Confirmed: | Oct 16, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 57 minutes ago |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
469 | 469
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Mon 04/22 11:56 AM
Amended Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2024 Premier Exhibitions Inc. Filed by Douglas A. Bates on behalf of Liquidating Trustee Mark C. Healy. (Bates, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
468 | 468
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Wed 04/17 4:00 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 16-02238 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2024 Arts & Exhibitions International, LLC Filed by Douglas A. Bates on behalf of Liquidating Trustee Mark C. Healy. (Bates, Douglas) |
|
467 | 467
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Wed 04/17 3:58 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 16-02236 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2024 Premier Merchandising, LLC Filed by Douglas A. Bates on behalf of Liquidating Trustee Mark C. Healy. (Bates, Douglas) |
|
466 | 466
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Wed 04/17 3:56 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 16-02235 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2024 Premier Exhibitions NYC, LLC Filed by Douglas A. Bates on behalf of Liquidating Trustee Mark C. Healy. (Bates, Douglas) |
|
465 | 465
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Wed 04/17 3:54 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 16-02234 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2024 Premier Exhibitions International, LLC Filed by Douglas A. Bates on behalf of Liquidating Trustee Mark C. Healy. (Bates, Douglas) |
|
464 | 464
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Wed 04/17 3:52 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 16-02233 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2024 Premier Exhibitions Management, LLC Filed by Douglas A. Bates on behalf of Liquidating Trustee Mark C. Healy. (Bates, Douglas) |
|
463 | 463
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Wed 04/17 3:49 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2024 Premier Exhibitions, Inc. Filed by Douglas A. Bates on behalf of Liquidating Trustee Mark C. Healy. (Bates, Douglas) |