Janssen Biotech, Inc. v. Celltrion Healthcare Co., Ltd. et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Mark L Wolf |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-11117 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 11, 2016 4:18 AM EST |
Counter Claimant
Celltrion Healthcare Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Celltrion, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Hospira, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Janssen Biotech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Celltrion Healthcare Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Celltrion, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hospira, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janssen Biotech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 03/15 5:00 PM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER CLOSING CASE entered. (Bono, Christine) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
notice
Notice Cancelling Hearing
Fri 10/13 7:53 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling 10/13/17 Motion Hearing. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-10698-MLW, 1:14-cv-11613-MLW, 1:16-cv-11117-MLW, 1:17-cv-11008-MLW(Bono, Christine) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
order
Order
Mon 08/07 2:32 PM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-10698-MLW, 1:16-cv-11117-MLW, 1:17-cv-11008-MLW(Bono, Christine) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
order
Memorandum & Order
Fri 03/03 9:24 AM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-10698-MLW, 1:14-cv-11613-MLW, 1:16-cv-11117-MLW (Bono, Christine) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
notice
Notice Cancelling Hearing
Fri 02/10 8:56 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Trial. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-10698-MLW, 1:14-cv-11613-MLW, 1:16-cv-11117-MLW(Bono, Christine) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
order
Order
Mon 01/09 4:14 PM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. "(1.) The parties shall confer and, by January 12, 2017,propose a revised schedule consistent with conducting pretrialhearings on February 6, 7, and 8, 2017, and beginning trial, ifpossible, on February 13, 2017. (2.) A telephone conference to discuss scheduling and other pretrial matters shall be held on January 18, 2017, at 4:00 p.m. Eastern Standard Time. New dates will be discussed for issuesrelating to witnesses and exhibits."Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-10698-MLW, 1:14-cv-11613-MLW, 1:16-cv-11117-MLW(Bono, Christine) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Wed 01/04 11:59 AM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered in case 1:14-cv-11613-MLW; granting (342) Motion to Seal in case 1:15-cv-10698-MLW Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-10698-MLW, 1:14-cv-11613-MLW, 1:16-cv-11117-MLW(Bono, Christine) |
|
36 | 36
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Wed 01/04 11:54 AM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered in case 1:14-cv-11613-MLW; granting (338) Motion to Seal in case 1:15-cv-10698-MLW Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-10698-MLW, 1:14-cv-11613-MLW, 1:16-cv-11117-MLW(Bono, Christine) |
|
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Tue 01/03 4:11 PM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered in case 1:14-cv-11613-MLW; granting (336) Motion to Seal in case 1:15-cv-10698-MLW Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-10698-MLW, 1:14-cv-11613-MLW, 1:16-cv-11117-MLW(Bono, Christine) |
|
Friday, December 30, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Fri 12/30 3:09 PM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered in case 1:14-cv-11613-MLW; granting (330) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. in case 1:15-cv-10698-MLW Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-10698-MLW, 1:14-cv-11613-MLW, 1:16-cv-11117-MLW(Bono, Christine) |
|
33 | 33
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Fri 12/30 3:09 PM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered in case 1:14-cv-11613-MLW; granting (325) Motion to Seal in case 1:15-cv-10698-MLW Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-10698-MLW, 1:14-cv-11613-MLW, 1:16-cv-11117-MLW(Bono, Christine) |
|
Thursday, December 29, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order
Thu 12/29 1:31 PM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. re (328 in 1:15-cv-10698-MLW) Stipulation filed by Celltrion, Inc., Celltrion Healthcare Co., Ltd., Hospira Inc. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-10698-MLW, 1:16-cv-11117-MLW(Hohler, Daniel) |
|
Friday, December 23, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order
Fri 12/23 4:03 PM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. 1. Defendant Hospira, Inc. ("Hospira") shall, by January 3, 2017, file a memorandum addressing whether a reasonable jury could find that Hospira is, with Celltrion Healthcare Co., Ltd. and Celltrion Inc., liable for inducing patent infringement under 35 U.S.C. §271(b) on theories of joint enterprise, agency, or contract. 2. Plaintiffs shall respond by January 12, 2017. 3. Hospira shall, by January 17, 2017, file any reply. 4. The parties shall promptly exchange, pursuant to a mutually agreeable protective order, the sales and profit information necessary for an informed discussion concerning settlement. 5. The parties shall, by January 10, 2017, confer and report, under seal, whether they have agreed to a settlement concerning this whole case, or the part of it relating to the '083 Patent, and, if the case is not settled, a statement of their respective positions. 6. If a settlement concerning at least the '083 Patent isnot agreed upon, a representative of each party with full settlement authority shall attend the pretrial conference on January 24 and 25, 2017.Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-10698-MLW, 1:14-cv-11613-MLW, 1:16-cv-11117-MLW(Bono, Christine) |
|
30 | 30
minutes
Motion Hearing
Fri 12/23 3:55 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Mark L. Wolf: Motion Hearing held on 12/23/2016 re (127 in 1:15-cv-10698-MLW) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Count 3 filed by Celltrion, Inc., Celltrion Healthcare Co., Ltd., Hospira Inc.. (Court Reporter: Kelly Mortellite at mortellite@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Kelly, Diskant, Royzman, Martin, Casey, Klein, Cutri, Hurst, Harris, Monroe-Yavneh, Almendarez) Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-10698-MLW, 1:14-cv-11613-MLW, 1:16-cv-11117-MLW(Bono, Christine) |
|
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
minutes
Motion Hearing
Wed 12/21 6:37 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Mark L. Wolf: Motion Hearing held on 12/21/2016 re (264 in 1:15-cv-10698-MLW) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,598,083 filed by Celltrion, Inc., Celltrion Healthcare Co., Ltd., Hospira Inc. *** Hearing shall continue at 10:00 a.m. on December 22, 2016. (Court Reporter: Kelly Mortellite at mortellite@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Kelly, Martin, Diskant, Royzman, Casey, Klein, Cutri, Hurst, Almendarez, Monroe-Yavneh, Harris) Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-10698-MLW, 1:14-cv-11613-MLW, 1:16-cv-11117-MLW(Bono, Christine) |
|
28 | 28
order
Order
Wed 12/21 12:47 PM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. re (308 in 1:15-cv-10698-MLW) Stipulation filed by New York University, Janssen Biotech, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-10698-MLW, 1:14-cv-11613-MLW, 1:16-cv-11117-MLW(Bono, Christine) |
|
27 | 27
order
Order
Wed 12/21 12:25 PM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. "ALLOWED." re (308 in 1:15-cv-10698-MLW) Stipulation filed by New York University, Janssen Biotech, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-10698-MLW, 1:14-cv-11613-MLW, 1:16-cv-11117-MLW(Bono, Christine) |
|
Tuesday, December 20, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion for Order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Order on Motion to Seal
Tue 12/20 11:45 AM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting (311) Motion for Order; granting (314) Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document.; granting (315) Motion to Seal; granting (316) Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. in case 1:15-cv-10698-MLW Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-10698-MLW, 1:16-cv-11117-MLW(Hohler, Daniel) |
|
Monday, December 19, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion
Mon 12/19 2:29 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mark L. Wolf. Motion Hearing, if necessary, set for 12/22/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mark L. Wolf. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-10698-MLW, 1:16-cv-11117-MLW(PSSA, 5) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion
Mon 12/19 2:25 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mark L. Wolf. Motion Hearing set for 12/22/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mark L. Wolf. (PSSA, 5) |
|
23 | 23
order
Order Setting Hearing on Motion
Mon 12/19 2:21 PM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. *** AS TO TIME ONLY **** "It is hereby ORDERED that the December 21, 2016 hearing will begin at 1:30 p.m. rather than 9:30 a.m., and continue on to December 22, 2016, if necessary."ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mark L. Wolf.(Bono, Christine) |
|
Monday, December 12, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Mon 12/12 11:44 AM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered "ALLOWED"granting (304) Motion to Seal in case 1:15-cv-10698-MLW Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-10698-MLW, 1:16-cv-11117-MLW(Hohler, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 12/06 3:15 PM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot6 Motion (Hohler, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, November 29, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Tue 11/29 4:09 PM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered granting (295) Motion to Seal in case 1:15-cv-10698-MLW Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-10698-MLW, 1:16-cv-11117-MLW(Hohler, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, November 17, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Thu 11/17 12:00 PM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered granting (280) Motion to Seal; granting (284) Motion to Seal in case 1:15-cv-10698-MLW Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-10698-MLW, 1:16-cv-11117-MLW(Hohler, Daniel) |
|
Friday, November 04, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Fri 11/04 4:24 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand action consolidated with 15-10698 , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Hospira, Inc., Celltrion, Inc., Celltrion Healthcare Co., Ltd..(Martin, Andrea) |
|
Tuesday, October 25, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Transcript
Tue 10/25 11:36 AM
NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Transcript
Tue 10/25 11:32 AM
Transcript of Pretrial Conference - Interim held on October 6, 2016, before Judge Mark L. Wolf. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Rachel Lopez at raeufp@gmail.com Redaction Request due 11/15/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2017. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-10698-MLW, 1:16-cv-11117-MLW(Scalfani, Deborah) |
|
Monday, October 24, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff
Mon 10/24 1:33 PM
Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket Entry (15) Was Deleted As It Was Entered in the Wrong Case By The Docket Clerk. (Paine, Matthew) |
|
Friday, October 21, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Fri 10/21 1:02 PM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. re (263 in 1:15-cv-10698-MLW) Stipulation, filed by Celltrion, Inc., Celltrion Healthcare Co., Ltd., Hospira Inc. Allowed. The proposed briefing schedule is adopted. The hearing remains set for December 21-22, 2016.Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-10698-MLW, 1:16-cv-11117-MLW(Hohler, Daniel) |
|
Friday, October 07, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion
Fri 10/07 12:45 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion (240 in 1:15-cv-10698-MLW) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Motion to Dismiss 16-11117 Complaint and 15-10698 Count 6 : Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mark L. Wolf. Motion Hearing set for 12/22/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mark L. Wolf. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-10698-MLW, 1:16-cv-11117-MLW(Hohler, Daniel) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 10/07 12:42 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Jury Trial set for 2/13/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mark L. Wolf. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mark L. Wolf. Interim Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mark L. Wolf. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mark L. Wolf. Interim Pretrial Conference set for 1/25/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mark L. Wolf. Jury Trial set for 2/14/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mark L. Wolf. Jury Trial set for 2/15/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mark L. Wolf. Jury Trial set for 2/16/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mark L. Wolf. Jury Trial set for 2/17/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mark L. Wolf. Jury Trial set for 2/20/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mark L. Wolf. Jury Trial set for 2/21/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mark L. Wolf. Jury Trial set for 2/22/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mark L. Wolf. Jury Trial set for 2/23/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mark L. Wolf. Jury Trial set for 2/24/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mark L. Wolf. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-11117-MLW, 1:15-cv-10698-MLW(Hohler, Daniel) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order
Fri 10/07 12:34 PM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-11117-MLW, 1:14-cv-11613-MLW, 1:15-cv-10698-MLW(Hohler, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 09/29 10:51 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Interim Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Mark L. Wolf. (Hohler, Daniel) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
18
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Tue 09/27 10:22 AM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDERAssociated Cases: 1:15-cv-10698-MLW, 1:16-cv-11117-MLW(Hohler, Daniel) |
|
Friday, August 19, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
7
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Fri 08/19 3:35 PM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-10698-MLW, 1:16-cv-11117-MLW (Bartlett, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Procedural Order | ||
Friday, July 01, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 07/01 1:35 PM
Joint MOTION PROPOSED SCHEDULING FOR BRIEFING FOR DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS re1 Complaint, by Celltrion Healthcare Co., Ltd., Celltrion, Inc., Hospira, Inc..(Martin, Andrea) |
|
Wednesday, June 15, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/15 10:40 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Wed 06/15 10:36 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Abaid, Kimberly) |
|
Tuesday, June 14, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 06/14 5:38 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Janssen Biotech, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Biotech, Inc... |
|
2 | 2
misc
Report on the filing/termination of patent/trademark case
Tue 06/14 5:35 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING/TERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/14 5:33 PM
COMPLAINT against Hospira, Inc., Celltrion, Inc., Celltrion Healthcare Co., Ltd. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6156888 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Janssen Biotech, Inc.. |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Category Form |