California Northern District Court
Judge:Howard R Lloyd
Case #: 5:16-cv-03283
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2016
Terminated:Apr 05, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Dec 11, 2016 1:11 AM PST
Defendant
Jon Gundry
1290 Ridder Park Dr., M-262
San Jose, CA 95131
Represented By
Eric James Bengtson
Davis And Young, Aplc
contact info
Defendant
Santa Clara County Office of Education
1290 Ridder Park Drive, M -262
San Jose, CA 95131
Represented By
Eric James Bengtson
Davis And Young, Aplc
contact info
Mediator
Margaret Corrigan
Circuit Mediation Office U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit 95 Seventh St. P.O. Box 193939
San Francisco, CA 94119
Plaintiff
Micaela Ochoa
499 14th St Suite 300
Oakland, CA 94612
Represented By
Daniel Mark Siegel
Siegel & Yee
contact info
Sonya Mehta
Siegel And Yee
contact info

GPO Jun 05 2017
Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion for Summary Judgment. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
GPO Aug 17 2017
Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re: 58, 61, 65, Plaintiff's Motions in Limine Nos. 1 and 3, Defendants' Motions in Limine Nos. 1 and 5. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2017)
GPO Nov 20 2017
Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re: 58, 62, 63, and 64, Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2 and Defendants' Motions in Limine Nos. 2, 3, and 4. Signed on 11/20/2017. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
GPO Jan 19 2018
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/27/2018 at 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 3/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/19/2018. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, July 11, 2024
123 123 2 pgs order Order Thu 07/11 8:38 PM
ORDER Concerning Improper Ex Parte Communication in Closed Case. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 7/11/2024. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]