Original Case: 1:16-cv-00656

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:16-cv-35462
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2016
Terminated:Nov 23, 2016
Last checked: Friday Nov 25, 2016 12:33 AM PST
Defendant - Appellee
NORTHWEST TRUSTEE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By
John M. Thomas
RCO Legal, P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By
Crystal S. Chase
Stoel Rives LLP
contact info
Amy Edwards
Stoel Rives LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.
Represented By
Crystal S. Chase
Stoel Rives LLP
contact info
Amy Edwards
Stoel Rives LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, N.A.
Represented By
Crystal S. Chase
Stoel Rives LLP
contact info
Amy Edwards
Stoel Rives LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
ELIZABETH SHERBOW
Represented By
Elizabeth Sherbow
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
THEODORE SHERBOW
Represented By
Theodore Sherbow
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/25/2016 12:25 AM PST
Friday, June 03, 2016
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANTS. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: to be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal. C.R. 3-3. [10002074] (RT) [Entered: 06/03/2016 02:48 PM]
Related: [-]