1
|
|
1
14
pgs
COMPLAINT as to Andrew Caspersen (1). In Violation of 15 U.S.C. 78j (b) & 78ff; 17 C.F.R. 240.10b-5; 18 U.S.C. 1343 and 2 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck) (dif) [1:16-mj-02011-UA]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 3/28/2016 as to Andrew Caspersen. (dif) [1:16-mj-02011-UA]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Arrest of Andrew Caspersen. (dif) [1:16-mj-02011-UA]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Attorney update in case as to Andrew Caspersen. Attorney Daniel Walter Levy for Andrew Caspersen added.. (dif) [1:16-mj-02011-UA]
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Retained Attorney Daniel Walter Levy appearing for Andrew Caspersen. (dif) [1:16-mj-02011-UA]
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis: Initial Appearance as to Andrew Caspersen held on 3/28/2016., Deft Appears with Retained Attorney Daniel W. Levy and AUSA Christine Magdo for the government. 5 MILLION PRB; 3 FRP'S; Secured by $50,000 Cash and Property: Manhattan Apartment and Bronxville Property; Travel Limited to SDNY/EDNY; District of New Jersey; District of Connecticut; Surrender Travel Documents (& No New Applications); Strict Pretrial Supervision; Alcohol Testing/Treatment; Mental Health Evaluation/Treatment; Deft to Be Released Upon Satisfaction of Following Conditions; 3 FRP'S; Remaining Conditions to Be Met by 4/11/16; (cASH; Property; 1 FRP); ( Preliminary Hearing set for 4/26/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Unassigned.) (dif) [1:16-mj-02011-UA]
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
AGREEMENT TO FORFEIT REAL PROPERTY by Andrew Caspersen. Personal Recognizance Bond in the amount of $ 5 MILLION PRB, 3 FRP'S; Secured by $50,000 Cash and Property: Manhattan Apartment and Bronxville Property; Travel Limited to SDNY/EDNY; District of New Jersey; District of Connecticut; Surrender Travel Documents (& No New Applications); Strict Pretrial Supervision; Alcohol Testing/Treatment; Mental Health Evaluation/Treatment; Deft to Be Released Upon Satisfaction of Following Conditions; 2 FRP'S; Remaining Conditions to Be Met by 4/11/16 (Cash; Property; 1 FRP) (dif) [1:16-mj-02011-UA]
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
ENDORSED LETTER as to Andrew Caspersen addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from AUSA Christine Magdo dated 4/11/2016 re: USA v Andrew Caspersen, 16 Mag 2011. Ms. The parties and Pretrial Services have conferred, and respectfully request that the Court enter the following modifications to the defendant's conditions of release, and the execution of a new appearance bond to reflect these conditions: (1) Three (3) financially responsible persons will sign a 5 Million PRB no later than 5:00 p.m. on April 12, 2016, (2) The bond will secured by the defendant's Bronxville House and 1 million in cash to be deposited in the registry of the Court no later than 5:00 p.m. on April 12, 2016, (3) The defendant will remain hospitalized in a secure unit at New York Hospital where he is now, until the two conditions above are satisfied, (4) Immediately upon his release from New York Hospital, the defendant will report to the Pretrial Services, where he will sign the new and will submit to electronic location monitoring,which will be added as a condition of his release, (5) The defendant's travel will be restricted to Manhattan, except if he obtains prior approval from Pretrial Services to travel outside of Manhattan. Application Granted. Proposed modifications to the defendant's conditions of release are approved on consent. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 4/11/2016)(dif) [1:16-mj-02011-UA]
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
AFFIRMATION of Christine Magdo in Support by USA as to Andrew Caspersen, the government is requesting a 30-day continuance until 5/26/16. (jbo) [1:16-mj-02011-UA]
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Andrew Caspersen. Time excluded from 4/26/16 until 5/26/16. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 4/26/16)(jbo) [1:16-mj-02011-UA]
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
RESTRAINING ORDER as to Andrew Caspersen.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/5/2016)(dif) [1:16-mj-02011-UA]
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
ENDORSED LETTER as to Andrew Caspersen addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from AUSA Christine Magdo dated 5/17/2016 re: USA v Andrew Caspersen, 16 Mag 2011. The parties and pretrial services now respectfully request that Your Honor approve a further modification to the defendant's bail conditions of release, namely, that the defendant's Bronxville house be removed as security on the bond, and that an additional $500,000 in cash be deposited in its place. All other conditions are to remain unchanged. Application Granted, So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 5/17/2016)(dif) [1:16-mj-02011-UA]
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Paul Lewis Shechtman appearing for Andrew Caspersen. Appearance Type: Retained. (Shechtman, Paul) Modified on 5/23/2016 (ka). [1:16-mj-02011-UA]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF CASE ERROR. Note to Attorney Paul Lewis Shechtman as to Andrew Caspersen: to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document Notice of Attorney Appearance, Document No. 11. This case is not ECF. (ka) [1:16-mj-02011-UA]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Andrew Caspersen re:8 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. Time excluded from 5/26/16 until 6/10/16. Follows oral order of 5/26/16. PD. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 5/26/16)(jbo) [1:16-mj-02011-UA]
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
AFFIRMATION of Christine Magdo in Support by USA as to Andrew Caspersen, the government is requesting a 15-day continuance until 6/10/16. (jbo) [1:16-mj-02011-UA]
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Andrew Caspersen re: Initial Appearance held on 3/28/16 before Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/24/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/5/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/1/2016. (do) [1:16-mj-02011-UA]
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Andrew Caspersen. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Initial Appearance proceeding held on 3/28/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (do) [1:16-mj-02011-UA]
Related: [-]
|
16
|
|
16
NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE an Information by U.S.A. as to Andrew Caspersen. (jm)
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Andrew Caspersen. Time excluded from 6/10/16 until 6/14/16. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/10/16)(jbo) [1:16-mj-02011-UA]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Case Designated ECF as to Andrew Caspersen. (jm)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Arraignment as to Andrew Caspersen (1) Count 1,2 held on 6/14/2016. Plea entered by Andrew Caspersen Not Guilty. Deft pres w/atty Paul Schectman. Gov't pres by Christine Magdo, AUSA. Court reporter Eve Giniger present. DEFT ARR'D, WAIVES READING IN OPEN COURT. PLEADS NOT guilty. Next appearance July 6 2016 at 3:30pm. TIME EXCLUDED IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE, PURSUANT TO SECTION 3161 OF TITLE 18. DEFT's BAIL CONT'D. (Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2016 at 03:30 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.) (jbo)
Related: [-]
|
17
|
|
17
INFORMATION (Felony) filed as to Andrew Caspersen (1) count(s) 1, 2. (jm)
Related: [-]
|
18
|
|
18
1
pgs
WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Andrew Caspersen. (jm)
Related: [-]
|