Esposito v. Golden et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Colleen Mcmahon |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-04534 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2016 |
Terminated: | Nov 02, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 12, 2016 3:20 AM EST |
Defendant
U.S. HUD
|
|
Defendant
Chasan Leyner & Lamparello
|
|
Interested Party
Judicial Intervention Program, New York Supreme Court Civil Term Chief Clerk, 60 Centre Street, Rm 315 Ex Parte Office, New York, N.Y. 10007
|
|
Plaintiff
Darlene R. Esposito
P.O. Box 1808
Newark, NJ 07101 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Breslin and Breslin
Terminated: 09/27/2016
|
|
Defendant
Chasan Lelyner & Laparello
Terminated: 09/27/2016
|
|
Defendant
Jane and John Does 1-10
Terminated: 09/27/2016
|
|
Defendant
Jay Golden
Terminated: 09/27/2016
|
|
Defendant
HUD Fair Housing Act
Terminated: 09/27/2016
|
|
Defendant
Regional Director of HUD
Terminated: 09/27/2016
|
|
Defendant
AGO Eric Shneiderman
Terminated: 09/27/2016
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 11/02 4:59 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to7 Notice of Appeal filed by Darlene R. Esposito. USCA Case Number 17-718. This Court has determined sua sponte that it lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because a final order has not been issued by the district court as contemplated by 28 U.S.C. § 1291. See Coopers & Lybrand v. Livesay, 437 U.S. 463, 467 (1978); Fort Knox Music Inc. v. Baptiste, 257 F.3d 108, 112 (2d Cir. 2001) (a transfer order under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) is not an appealable final order). Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the appeal is DISMISSED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 11/02/2017. (nd) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 10/12 3:17 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL from6 Order. Document filed by Darlene R. Esposito. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit.. (tp) |
|
Att: 1 Aff. Supp. Motion for IFP | ||
appeal
Appeal Fee Due
Thu 10/12 3:18 PM
Appeal Fee Due: for7 Notice of Appeal. Appeal fee due by 10/26/2017. (tp) |
||
appeal
Appeal Remark
Thu 10/12 3:20 PM
Appeal Remark as to7 Notice of Appeal filed by Darlene R. Esposito. IFP DENIED 11/02/2016. AS PER THE USPS CERTIFIED MAIL TRACKING NUMBER, THIS7 NOA WAS RECEIVED BY THE US DISTRICT COURT ON 1/3/2017. (tp) |
||
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Thu 10/12 3:21 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:7 Notice of Appeal. (tp) |
||
appeal
Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File
Thu 10/12 3:21 PM
Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for7 Notice of Appeal filed by Darlene R. Esposito were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp) |
||
Wednesday, November 09, 2016 | ||
misc
Received Acknowledgment (Electronic Case Transfer)
Wed 11/09 2:56 PM
Received e-mail from the United States District Court - District of New Jersey acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 2:16-cv-08374, filed on 11/09/2016. (sjo) |
||
Monday, November 07, 2016 | ||
misc
Mail Order by Certified Mail
Mon 11/07 10:40 AM
Mailed a copy of6 Order, to Darlene R. Esposito P.O. Box 1808 Newark, NJ 07101. (sbr) |
||
Wednesday, November 02, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Mon 11/07 8:19 AM
TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. The Clerk of Court is further directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (As further set forth in this Transfer Order.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/2/2016) (mro) |
|
misc
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk
Mon 11/07 8:19 AM
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re:6 Order, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (mro) |
||
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Transfer
Wed 11/09 9:24 AM
CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey (mro) |
||
Tuesday, September 27, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
30/60 Days Amended Complaint
Tue 09/27 2:20 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. HUD, Chasan Leyner & Lamparello, Judicial Intervention Program, New York Supreme Court Civil Term Chief Clerk, 60 Centre Street, Rm 315 Ex Parte Office, New York, N.Y. 10007; re: amending2 Complaint.Document filed by Darlene R. Esposito. Related document:2 Complaint filed by Darlene R. Esposito.(sc) |
|
Att: 1 Errata | ||
Tuesday, August 02, 2016 | ||
misc
Mail Order by Certified Mail
Tue 08/02 9:33 AM
Mailed a copy of4 Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening), to Darlene R. Esposito P.O. Box 1808 Newark, NJ 07101. (ca) |
||
Friday, July 29, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening)
Tue 08/02 9:10 AM
ORDER TO AMEND: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint that complies with the standards set forth above. Plaintiff must submit the amended complaint to this Court's Pro Se Intake Unit within sixty days of the date of this order, caption the document as an "Amended Complaint," and label the document with docket number 16-CV-4534 (CM). An Amended Complaint form is attached to this order. No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and she cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the complaint will be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/29/2016) (sac) |
|
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte
Tue 08/02 9:11 AM
NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sac) |
||
misc
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk
Tue 08/02 9:12 AM
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re:4 Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening), to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (sac) |
||
Friday, June 24, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order Granting IFP Application
Fri 06/24 8:30 AM
ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 06/23/2016) The Clerks Office Has Mailed Copies. (ca) |
|
misc
Mail Order by Certified Mail
Fri 06/24 8:30 AM
Mailed a copy of3 Order Granting IFP Application to Darlene R. Esposito P.O. Box 1808 Newark, NJ 07101. (ca) |
||
Wednesday, June 15, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/16 9:24 AM
COMPLAINT against Breslin and Breslin, Chasan Lelyner & Laparello, Jane and John Does 1-10, Jay Golden, HUD Fair Housing Act, Regional Director of HUD, Eric Shneiderman, U.S. HUD. Document filed by Darlene R. Esposito.(sac) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 06/16 9:23 AM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Darlene R. Esposito.(sac) |
|
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 06/16 9:24 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sac) |