McGill v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Wilhelmina M Wright |
Referred: | Becky R Thorson |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-01979 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2016 |
Terminated: | Nov 15, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 13, 2016 3:44 AM CST |
Defendant
Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tonya McGill
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, November 17, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
order
Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
Thu 11/17 9:57 AM
JUDGMENT.(ACH) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal | ||
Tuesday, November 15, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 11/15 12:38 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 11/15/2016. (TJB) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 11/15 8:21 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Tonya McGill. Jointly Signed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Monday, November 14, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Cancelation/Rescheduling of Hearing/Deadline
Mon 11/14 8:33 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE of Cancelation of Hearing: The Settlement Conference set for 1/19/2017 before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson is canceled. (MSK) |
|
Sunday, November 13, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Letter to Magistrate Judge
Sun 11/13 4:36 PM
LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Tonya McGill regarding settlement reached . (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Wednesday, October 12, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order
Wed 10/12 5:05 PM
ORDER for Settlement Conference: Settlement Conference set for 1/19/2017 09:30 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 646 (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/12/16. (kt) |
|
Wednesday, September 14, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 09/14 2:18 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/3/2016. Motions (non-disp) due 12/21/2016. Motions (disp) due by 2/14/2017. Ready for trial due by 6/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/14/16. (kt) |
|
Tuesday, September 13, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Wed 09/14 1:56 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Rule 16 Pretrial Conference held on 9/13/2016. Discussion of pretrial deadlines and settlement. A Pretrial Scheduling Order will be issued. (kt) |
|
Thursday, September 08, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Thu 09/08 12:51 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Tonya McGill. Jointly Signed by Hartford Life Insurance Company.(Operana, Brandon) |
|
Thursday, August 18, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 08/19 8:39 AM
NOTICE of Pretrial Conference: Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson.(kt) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
Tuesday, August 16, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 08/16 9:11 AM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Primack, Stuart) |
|
Wednesday, July 13, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/13 12:22 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Hartford Life, Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Hartford Holdings, Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Primack, Stuart) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/13 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer S. Stegmaier on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Stegmaier, Jennifer) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/13 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart Primack on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Primack, Stuart) |
|
Tuesday, July 12, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/12 3:16 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Stuart F. Primack for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/12/16. (MAM) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/12 3:12 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jennifer S. Stegmaier for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/12/16. (MAM) |
|
Friday, July 08, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident)
Fri 07/08 1:44 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jennifer S. Stegmaier. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5010726 by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Huhta, Adam) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident)
Fri 07/08 1:40 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stuart F. Primack. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5010705 by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Huhta, Adam) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/08 1:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam S Huhta on behalf of All Defendants. (Huhta, Adam) |
|
Thursday, July 07, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 07/07 8:34 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Tonya McGill. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company waiver sent on 6/17/2016, answer due 8/16/2016. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Friday, June 17, 2016 | ||
notice
Notice - WMW Practice Pointers
Fri 06/17 2:44 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's[LINK:website] . All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers. (TJB) |
||
Thursday, June 16, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/16 2:22 PM
Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (KMM) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Thu 06/16 2:21 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 16-cv-1979 WMW/BRT. (KMM) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/16 1:08 PM
COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-4978441.) Filed by Tonya McGill. Filer requests summons issued. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |