WASHINGTON ALLIANCE OF TECHNOLOGY WORKERS v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Reggie B Walton |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-01170 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 17, 2016 |
Re-opened: | Aug 21, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 29, 2021 |
Case in other court: | USCA, 17-05110 DC Circuit Court, 21-05028 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 14, 2016 4:16 AM EST |
Defendant
CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WASHINGTON ALLIANCE OF TECHNOLOGY WORKERS
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Apr 19 2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 19, 2017. (lcrbw2) |
|
GPO
Jul 01 2019
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 1, 2019. (lcrbw2) |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, February 13, 2023 | ||
104 | 104
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 02/13 11:36 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to99 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by WASHINGTON ALLIANCE OF TECHNOLOGY WORKERS ; USCA Case Number 21-5028 (Attachment: #1 USCA Order 10/4/2022)(ztth) |