Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-52537

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Walter Shaperodetroit
Case #: 2:16-ap-04592
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jun 17, 2016
Terminated:Oct 21, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Comcast Corporation
116 Pine Street Suite 320
Harrisburg, PA 17101
Represented By
Comcast Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Wendy Turner Lewis
Represented By
Sandra L. O'Connor
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Friday, October 21, 2016
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 10/21 9:56 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Plaintiff Wendy Turner Lewis. (O'Connor, Sandra)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 10/21 11:25 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:16-ap-4592 : Dismissed. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 10/21 11:25 AM
Adversary Case 2:16-ap-4592 Closed. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2016
court Reassignment of Judge (Judge Oxholm ONLY - 9/30) Mon 10/03 7:59 AM
ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT: On August 17, 2016, the Bankruptcy Court entered Administrative Order 16-05, regarding the appointment of Judge Maria L. Oxholm and assignment of cases and proceedings. Pursuant to Administrative Order 16-05, the Clerk of Court shall reassign to Judge Maria L. Oxholm the pending adversary proceedings previously assigned to Judge Walter Shapero. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above entitled case be removed from the docket of Judge Walter Shapero and transferred to the docket of Judge Maria L. Oxholm. (ADI: admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2016
6 6 misc Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Mon 08/08 11:26 AM
Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Wendy Turner Lewis. (O'Connor, Sandra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2016
5 5 order Extend (order) Wed 07/13 11:00 AM
Order Approving Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Comcast Corporation to Respond to the Complaint - Extended to 8/8/2016 Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] #4 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Wendy Turner Lewis
4 4 misc Stipulation Wed 07/13 9:45 AM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Defendant Re: Entry of Order Extending Deadline for Comcast Corporation to Respond to the Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Wendy Turner Lewis. (O'Connor, Sandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, June 17, 2016
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 06/17 2:37 PM
Summons Service Executed on Comcast Corporation 6/17/2016 (O'Connor, Sandra)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 06/17 2:33 PM
Summons Issued on Comcast Corporation Answer Due 07/18/2016 (O'Connor, Sandra)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/17 2:33 PM
Adversary case 16-04592 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Wendy Turner Lewis against Comcast Corporation. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (O'Connor, Sandra)
Related: [-]