Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:16-ap-03127
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jun 22, 2016
Terminated:Apr 11, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Data Innovations, LLC
Represented By
Data Innovations, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Robert S. Westermann
Hirschler Fleischer, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
7 7 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Wed 04/11 10:02 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
6 6 notice Notice of Dismissal Wed 01/11 9:15 AM
Notice of Dismissal Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Robert S. Westermann of Hirschler Fleischer, P.C. on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Friday, September 23, 2016
5 5 answer None Fri 09/23 3:17 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by John H. Maddock III of McGuireWoods LLP on behalf of Data Innovations, LLC. (Maddock III, John)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, June 24, 2016
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Fri 06/24 9:12 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Robert S. Westermann of Hirschler Fleischer, P.C. on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, June 23, 2016
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Thu 06/23 10:47 AM
Summons and notice issued to Data Innovations, LLC Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 06/23 10:33 AM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 16-03127 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 24261284, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Wednesday, June 22, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 06/22 4:24 PM
Adversary case 16-03127 Complaint against Data Innovations, LLC filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet