Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:16-ap-03133
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jun 22, 2016
Terminated:Jan 23, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
SAS Institute, Inc.
Represented By
SAS Institute, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Robert S. Westermann
Hirschler Fleischer, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Tuesday, January 23, 2018
6 6 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Tue 01/23 9:17 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2018
5 5 notice Notice of Dismissal Fri 01/19 1:32 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Related [+] filed by Robert S. Westermann of Hirschler Fleischer, P.C. on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Friday, June 24, 2016
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Fri 06/24 9:18 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Robert S. Westermann of Hirschler Fleischer, P.C. on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, June 23, 2016
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Thu 06/23 11:06 AM
Summons and notice issued to SAS Institute, Inc. Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 06/23 10:33 AM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 16-03133 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 24261284, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Wednesday, June 22, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 06/22 4:55 PM
Adversary case 16-03133 Complaint against SAS Institute, Inc. filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet