Connecticut District Court
Judge:Alvin W Thompson
Case #: 3:16-cv-01018
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2016
Terminated:Aug 15, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 20, 2016 3:43 AM EST
Defendant
Valve Corporation
Represented By
Timothy Andrew Diemand
Wiggin & Dana-Htfd
contact info
Robert M. Langer
Wiggin & Dana-Htfd
contact info
Gavin W. Skok
Riddell Williams, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael John McLeod
Represented By
Neal Lewis Moskow
Ury & Moskow
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, August 15, 2016
18 18 order Order Mon 5:52 PM
ORDER: Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Doc. No.17 ) is hereby APPROVED. The Clerk shall close this case. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 8/15/2016. (Calle, K)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Transfer to Another District Mon 5:54 PM
ORDER: Defendant Valve Corporation's Motion to Transfer for Forum Non Conveniens (Doc. No.13 ) is hereby DENIED as moot. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 8/15/2016. (Calle, K)
Related: [-]
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Thu 4:15 PM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Ferguson, L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2016
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Fri 8:53 AM
NOTICE by Michael John McLeod of Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Moskow, Neal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 02, 2016
16 16 misc Certificate of Good Standing Tue 8:54 AM
CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Gavin W. Skok to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4081372) by Valve Corporation. (Diemand, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2016
15 15 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 12:01 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gavin W. Skok. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/25/2016. Signed by Clerk on 7/27/16. (Sundie, T)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 9:05 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Langer on behalf of Valve Corporation (Langer, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2016
13 13 motion Transfer to Another District Tue 4:59 PM
MOTION to Transfer to Another District by Valve Corporation.(Diemand, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Christopher Boyd,
Att: 3 Affidavit of Gavin W. Skok
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 4:55 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Valve Corporation. (Diemand, Timothy)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 4:53 PM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Gavin W. Skok to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-4081372) by Valve Corporation. (Diemand, Timothy)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 4:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Andrew Diemand on behalf of Valve Corporation (Diemand, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2016
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 1:45 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Valve Corporation, filed by Michael John McLeod.(Moskow, Neal)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2016
8 8 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 1:12 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Valve Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Neal Lewis Moskow* *Ury & Moskow* *883 Black Rock Turnpike* *Fairfield, CT 06825*. (Enderlin, M.)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Electronic Service Documents Fri 1:10 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of6 Electronic Filing Order,4 Protective Order,1 Complaint filed by Michael John McLeod,2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 6/24/2016.(Enderlin, M.)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Electronic Service Documents Fri 1:02 PM
ENTERED IN ERROR - NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of3 Electronic Filing Order,4 Protective Order,1 Complaint filed by Michael John McLeod,2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 6/24/2016.(Enderlin, M.) Modified on 6/24/2016 (Enderlin, M.)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Electronic Filing Order Fri 12:58 PM
ENTERED IN ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/23/2016.(Enderlin, M.) Modified on 6/24/2016 (Enderlin, M.)
Related: [-]
service Request to Issue Summons Fri 9:44 AM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Valve Corporation. (Moskow, Neal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2016
6 6 order Electronic Filing Order Fri 1:08 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/23/2016.(Enderlin, M.)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Protective Order Fri 1:00 PM
STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/23/2016.(Enderlin, M.)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Fri 12:57 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 9/23/2016. Amended Pleadings due by 8/22/2016 Discovery due by 12/23/2016 Dispositive Motions due by 1/22/2017 Signed by Clerk on 6/23/2016.(Enderlin, M.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 3:30 PM
COMPLAINT against Valve Corporation ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-4046639.), filed by Michael John McLeod.(Moskow, Neal)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 3:55 PM
Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Basha, D.)
Related: [-]