ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP v. BURWELL et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Randolph D Moss |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-01336 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 22, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 24, 2016 4:27 AM EST |
Defendant
SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ROBERT CALIFF
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
SUN PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES INC.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
SANDOZ INC.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS, LTD
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., USA
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
AUROBINDO PHARMA LIMITED
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
APOTEX INC.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
APOTEX CORP.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
IPR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
IPR PHARMACEUTICALS INC
ROAD 188 LOT 17 SAN ISIDRO INDUSTRIAL PARK
CANOVANAS, PR 00729 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, August 19, 2016 | ||
order
.Order
Fri 08/19 6:11 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal85 , it is hereby ORDERED that the case be DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/19/2016. (lcrdm2, ) |
||
Thursday, August 18, 2016 | ||
85 | 85
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, IPR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (Sipes, Christopher) |
|
Monday, August 15, 2016 | ||
84 | 84
![]() NOTICE of Filing Index of Public Administrative Record by SYLVIA MATHEWS BURWELL, ROBERT CALIFF, FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION(Biro, Charles) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |