New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Edward R Korman
Referred: Roanne L Mann
Case #: 1:16-cv-03533
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2016
Re-opened:Dec 18, 2017
Terminated:Jul 28, 2017
Last checked: Saturday Dec 24, 2016 4:04 AM EST
Defendant
32BJ SEIU
Represented By
Jessica Drangel Ochs
contact info
Defendant
Hipolito Abreu
Represented By
Stephen Paul Pischl
Clifton Budd & Demaria LP
contact info
Stefanie Robin Munsky
Clifton Budd & Demaria LLP
contact info
Robert A. Sparer
Clifton Budd & Demaria, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does 1-10
Defendant
Chandra Jain
Represented By
Stephen Paul Pischl
Clifton Budd & Demaria LP
contact info
Stefanie Robin Munsky
Clifton Budd & Demaria LLP
contact info
Robert A. Sparer
Clifton Budd & Demaria, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Park City 3&4 Apartments, Inc.
Represented By
Stephen Paul Pischl
Clifton Budd & Demaria LP
contact info
Stefanie Robin Munsky
Clifton Budd & Demaria LLP
contact info
Robert A. Sparer
Clifton Budd & Demaria, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Patrick Nelson
Represented By
Nkereuwem Umoh
The Law Office Of Uwem Umoh
contact info
Uwem Umoh
contact info

GPO Nov 15 2021
ORDER denying 19 First MOTION to Remand to State Court and to Amend the Complaint, granting 23 MOTION to Dismiss filed by 32BJ SEIU, denying 25 Cross MOTION to Remand to State Court and to Amend the Complaint, and granting 29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Hipolito Abreu, Park City 3&4 Apartments, Inc., and Chandra Jain. Ordered by Judge Edward R. Korman on 11/15/2021. (Berman, Shai)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, November 15, 2021
81 81 order Order(Other) Mon 11/15 11:45 AM
ORDER denying19 First MOTION to Remand to State Court and to Amend the Complaint, granting23 MOTION to Dismiss filed by 32BJ SEIU, denying25 Cross MOTION to Remand to State Court and to Amend the Complaint, and granting29 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Hipolito Abreu, Park City 3&4 Apartments, Inc., and Chandra Jain. Ordered by Judge Edward R. Korman on 11/15/2021. (Berman, Shai)
Related: [-]
appeal Order on Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision Order(Other) Mon 11/15 12:01 PM
ORDER as to74 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Hipolito Abreu, Park City 3&4 Apartments, Inc., Chandra Jain, ORDER *** In light of the memorandum and order entered today81 , Park City's objection to the magistrate judge's July 15, 2021 order is sustained. Ordered by Judge Edward R. Korman on 11/15/2021. (Berman, Shai)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Mon 11/15 6:51 PM
ORDER *** Pursuant to81 , this case is stayed pending the completion of the arbitration proceedings between the Plaintiff and the Park City Defendants. The parties are directed to notify the Court when those proceedings are complete. This case is closed for administrative purposes until the stay is lifted. Ordered by Judge Edward R. Korman on 11/15/2021. (Cohen, Talia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 11, 2021
80 80 misc Letter Thu 11/11 5:17 PM
Letter to Judge Korman by 32BJ SEIU (Ochs, Jessica)
Related: [-]
79 79 misc Letter Thu 11/11 3:30 PM
Letter response to the Court's order from 11/10/2021 by Patrick Nelson (Needham, Daniel)
Related: [-]
78 78 misc Letter Thu 11/11 12:48 PM
Letter to Judge Korman from Defendants by Hipolito Abreu, Chandra Jain, Park City 3&4 Apartments, Inc. (Toren, Stefanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2014 CBA
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
77 77 misc Status Report Wed 11/10 2:23 PM
STATUS REPORT - Joint by Hipolito Abreu, Chandra Jain, Park City 3&4 Apartments, Inc. (Toren, Stefanie)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Wed 11/10 1:18 PM
ORDER***The parties are directed to provide me with a complete copy of the collective bargaining agreement on which this case turns and portions of which are cited by all parties in the briefing on the current motions. Ordered by Judge Edward R. Korman on 11/10/2021. (Berman, Shai)
Related: [-]