California Northern District Court
Judge:Phyllis J Hamilton
Case #: 4:16-cv-03607
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2016
Terminated:May 19, 2017
Last checked: Saturday Dec 24, 2016 1:45 AM PST
Defendant
Akima Infrastructure Services, LLC
Represented By
Gregory G. Iskander
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Billie Desiree Wenter
Glynn & Finley LLP
contact info
Defendant
Akima, LLC
Represented By
Gregory G. Iskander
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Sarah Rodriguez
Represented By
Donald Joseph Clapp
Aiman-Smith And Marcy
contact info
Joseph Clapp
Aiman-Smith & Marcy
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, June 19, 2017
41 41 appeal USCA Case Number Mon 1:00 PM
USCA Case Number 17-16262 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for40 Notice of Appeal filed by Sarah Rodriguez. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2017
40 40 appeal Notice of Appeal Fri 10:54 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Sarah Rodriguez. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-11477469 paid.)(Clapp, Donald) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Representation Statement
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 10:41 AM
Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] Event can be found at: civil>Appeal documents>Notice of Appeal. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety Re:39 Notice (Other) filed by Sarah Rodriguez. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2017
39 39 notice Notice (Other) Thu 2:15 PM
NOTICE by Sarah Rodriguez Notice of Appeal(Clapp, Donald) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Representation Statement
Friday, May 19, 2017
38 38 order Judgment Fri 12:56 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 5/19/2017. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
Related: [-]
37 37 order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Fri 12:54 PM
ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 32 Motion for Summary Judgment. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2017
36 36 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Tue 5:18 PM
REPLY Related [+] Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byAkima Infrastructure Services, LLC, Akima, LLC.(Wenter, Billie) (Filed on 5/2/2017)
Related: [-] 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment
Att: 1 Declaration Billie D. Wenter
Friday, April 28, 2017
35 35 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Fri 1:14 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed bySarah Rodriguez.(Clapp, Donald) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
Related: [-] 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment
Att: 1 Declaration Joseph Clapp,
Att: 2 Declaration Sarah Rodriguez,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 11, 2017
34 34 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 9:24 AM
ORDER REVISING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/SUMMARY ADJUDICATION by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment . Responses due by 4/28/2017. Replies due by 5/2/2017. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2017
33 33 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 10:24 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to32 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Sarah Rodriguez.(Clapp, Donald) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Revising Briefing Schedule
Friday, April 07, 2017
32 32 motion Summary Judgment Fri 6:05 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Akima Infrastructure Services, LLC, Akima, LLC. Responses due by 4/21/2017. Replies due by 4/24/2017.(Wenter, Billie) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Billie D. Wenter; Exhibits A-L,
Att: 2 Declaration of Terrance Reichert; Exhibits 1-3,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 30, 2017
31 31 order Order on Motion to Continue Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Thu 11:39 AM
ORDER by Judge Hamilton terminating 28 Motion to Continue; granting in part and denying in part 30 Administrative Motion. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2017)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2017
30 30 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Tue 5:03 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Relief From Court's Requirement That Dispositive Motions Be Heard 120 Days Before Trial; and Request To Continue Dispositive Motion Hearing Cutoff. filed by Akima Infrastructure Services, LLC, Akima, LLC. Responses due by 4/3/2017.(Wenter, Billie) (Filed on 3/28/2017)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
29 29 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Tue 4:41 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] ; Supporting Declaration of Joseph Clapp filed bySarah Rodriguez. (Clapp, Donald) (Filed on 3/28/2017)
Related: [-] 28 MOTION to Continue Dispositive Motion Hearing Cutoff
Friday, March 24, 2017
28 28 motion Continue Fri 5:28 PM
MOTION to Continue Dispositive Motion Hearing Cutoff filed by Akima Infrastructure Services, LLC, Akima, LLC.(Wenter, Billie) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-C,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 22, 2017
27 27 minutes Settlement Conference Thu 12:58 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Case did not settle.Settlement Conference held on 3/22/2017.Total Time in Court 2 hours 55 minutes. Court Reporter Name Not reported. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/22/2017)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2017
26 26 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 9:16 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Proposed Order to Continue the Settlement Conference Before The Honorable Kandis A. Westmore from February 3, 2017, to March 27, 2017 filed by Akima Infrastructure Services, LLC, Akima, LLC Settlement Conference set for 3/22/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/1/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 26, 2017
25 25 order Order on Stipulation Thu 1:08 PM
ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 24 Stipulation. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2017
24 24 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 1:08 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Proposed Order to Extend Non-Expert Discovery Cutoff, Dispositive Motion Hearing Deadline, and Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference filed by Akima Infrastructure Services, LLC, Akima, LLC. (Iskander, Gregory) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2017
23 23 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 2:30 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Proposed Order to Continue the Settlement Conference Before The Honorable Kandis A. Westmore from February 3, 2017, to March 27, 2017 filed by Akima Infrastructure Services, LLC, Akima, LLC. (Iskander, Gregory) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2016
22 22 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 12:47 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Scheduling Conference held on 11/10/2016. Settlement Conference set for 2/3/2017 11:00 AM.Total Time in Court 17 minutes. Court Reporter Name Not reported. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/10/2016)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2016
21 21 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Mon 8:46 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Scheduling Conference set for 11/10/2016 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 12, 2016
20 20 order Order Wed 2:48 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 19 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/12/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2016)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2016
19 19 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Case Referred to Magistrate-Judge for Settlement Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 3:34 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/6/2016, CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Westmore for Settlement Conference. Non-Expert Discovery due by 2/24/2017. Disclosure of Experts due by 5/5/2017. Rebuttal due by 5/19/2017. Expert Discovery due by 6/9/2017. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 4/5/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/2017 02:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 8/7/2017 08:30 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Jury Trial set for 8/7/2017 08:30 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton.Total Time in Court 8 minutes. Court Reporter Name: Not Reported. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/6/2016)
Related: [-]
18 18 adr ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held Thu 7:17 AM
ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Howard Herman on 9/29/2016. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Thu 3:56 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore for Settlement. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2016
17 17 misc Mail Returned Mon 8:58 AM
Mail sent to Joseph Clapp returned as undeliverable re15 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2016
16 16 misc Joint Case Management Statement Thu 4:02 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Akima Infrastructure Services, LLC, Akima, LLC. (Iskander, Gregory) (Filed on 9/29/2016)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2016
15 15 adr ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference Tue 11:44 AM
ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Thursday, September 29, 2016, at 10:30 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2016)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2016
14 14 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 1:38 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Clapp, Donald) (Filed on 9/8/2016)
Related: [-]
13 13 adr Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) Thu 1:34 PM
NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Clapp, Donald) (Filed on 9/8/2016)
Related: [-]
12 12 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 1:33 PM
*** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. *** ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Clapp, Donald) (Filed on 9/8/2016) Modified on 9/8/2016 (fff, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2016
11 11 notice Certificate of Interested Entities Wed 11:20 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Sarah Rodriguez (Clapp, Donald) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 19, 2016
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Billie Desiree Wenter (Wenter, Billie) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2016
9 9 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 3:07 PM
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/29/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/18/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2016
8 8 order Order ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 12:50 PM
ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/15/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
Related: [-]
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Fri 8:16 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2016
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities Mon 3:48 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Akima Infrastructure Services, LLC, Akima, LLC (Defendants' Certification of Interested Entitites Or Persons Pursuant to 7.1 And Civil Local Rule 3-15) (Iskander, Gregory) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 3:44 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL [Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court 28 U.S.C. Sections 1331, 1332, 1367 and 1441(a)) from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG16816085. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-10562429). Filed byAkima, LLC, Akima Infrastructure Services, LLC.(Iskander, Gregory) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Steven Steinberg,
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet