Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Timothy D Degiusti
Case #: 5:16-cv-00732
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2016
Terminated:Mar 21, 2018
Last checked: Saturday Dec 24, 2016 2:47 AM CST
Counter Claimant
Saulsbury Industries Inc
Represented By
Peter L Wheeler
Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green-Okc
contact info
Craig J Ledet
King & Spalding-Houston
contact info
Gerald P Green
Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green-Okc
contact info
William R Burns
King & Spalding-Houston
contact info
Counter Defendant
Benham Constructors LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey W Miller
Benham A Haskell Company
contact info
Jeffrey A Kennard
Scharnhorst Ast & Kennard PC
contact info
Defendant
Saulsbury Industries Inc
Represented By
Peter L Wheeler
Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green-Okc
contact info
Craig J Ledet
King & Spalding-Houston
contact info
Benjamin S Saunier
Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green-Okc
contact info
Gerald P Green
Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green-Okc
contact info
William R Burns
King & Spalding-Houston
contact info
Plaintiff
Benham Constructors LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey W Miller
Benham A Haskell Company
contact info
Jeffrey A Kennard
Scharnhorst Ast & Kennard PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, March 23, 2018
57 57 1 pgs order Order Fri 03/23 3:25 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/23/2018. (mb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 21, 2018
56 56 misc Stipulation Wed 03/21 3:06 PM
STIPULATION [JOINT] OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Benham Constructors LLC. (Kennard, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]