Gale v. Smukler et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Kristen L Mix |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-01654 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 28, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 23, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 25, 2016 2:04 AM MST |
Defendant
City of Aruora
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richard V. Day
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brian Dingwall
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Graham Dunne
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Grant Heyneman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thomas Lehmann
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nicholas Metz
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Reiter
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Smukler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richard (I) V. Day
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Graham (I) Dunne
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nicholas (I) Metz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Gale
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 01/23 4:49 PM
ORDER granting29 Motion to Dismiss. All claims are dismissed with prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/23/2017. Final Pretrial Conference, Trial Preparation Conference, and Jury Instructions Conference are VACATED. Five-day Jury Trial is VACATED. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case.(jgonz, ) Modified on 1/23/2017 (jgonz, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Dismiss
Wed 01/11 2:18 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss Defendants by Plaintiff Jeffrey Gale.(Trine, Cheryl) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) | ||
Wednesday, November 09, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Wed 11/09 1:28 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jordan Cary Lubeck on behalf of Graham (I) Dunne, David Johnson, Nicholas (I) Metz, ReiterAttorney Jordan Cary Lubeck added to party Graham (I) Dunne(pty:dft), Attorney Jordan Cary Lubeck added to party David Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Jordan Cary Lubeck added to party Nicholas (I) Metz(pty:dft), Attorney Jordan Cary Lubeck added to party Reiter(pty:dft) (Lubeck, Jordan) |
|
Wednesday, November 02, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
order
Protective Order
Thu 11/03 12:26 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/2/16. (lgale, ) |
|
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Thu 11/03 12:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/2/16.25 Joint Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED. (lgale, ) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Protective Order
Mon 10/31 10:06 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants City of Aruora, Richard V. Day, Richard (I) V. Day, Brian Dingwall, Graham Dunne, Graham (I) Dunne, Grant Heyneman, David Johnson, Thomas Lehmann, Nicholas Metz, Nicholas (I) Metz, Reiter, Robert Smukler.(Goddard, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Protective Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Protective Order | ||
Tuesday, October 25, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order
Tue 10/25 4:37 PM
STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/25/2016. (jgonz, ) |
|
Wednesday, October 19, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Stipulation
Wed 10/19 9:46 AM
STIPULATION Stipulated Order F.R.E. 502(d) by Plaintiff Jeffrey Gale. (Trine, Cheryl) |
|
Friday, October 07, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order
Fri 10/07 12:23 PM
ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS PRACTICE AND CIVIL TRIALS by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/7/16. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/22/2017. (lgale, ) |
|
Wednesday, October 05, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 10/07 9:21 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/5/16. (lgale, ) |
|
20 | 20
minutes
Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Fri 10/07 9:20 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/5/2016. Discovery due by 6/15/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 8/1/2017. Final Pretrial/Trial Preparation and Jury Instruction Conference set for 11/30/2017 1:30 PM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Five Day Jury Trial set for 12/4/2017 9:00 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. FTR: KLM Courtroom A401. (lgale, ) |
|
Att: 1 Discovery Procedures and Requirements of Practice | ||
Wednesday, September 28, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Wed 09/28 6:37 AM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Jeffrey Gale. (Trine, Cheryl) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information
Wed 09/28 6:32 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Cheryl Louise Trine (Trine, Cheryl) |
|
Wednesday, September 14, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Wed 09/14 1:41 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David M. Goddard on behalf of Richard (I) V. Day, Brian Dingwall, Grant Heyneman, Thomas Lehmann, Robert SmuklerAttorney David M. Goddard added to party Richard (I) V. Day(pty:dft), Attorney David M. Goddard added to party Brian Dingwall(pty:dft), Attorney David M. Goddard added to party Grant Heyneman(pty:dft), Attorney David M. Goddard added to party Thomas Lehmann(pty:dft), Attorney David M. Goddard added to party Robert Smukler(pty:dft) (Goddard, David) |
|
Tuesday, September 06, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 09/06 4:22 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, Attorney Marc F. Colin added to party Richard (I) V. Day(pty:dft), Attorney Marc F. Colin added to party Brian Dingwall(pty:dft), Attorney Marc F. Colin added to party Grant Heyneman(pty:dft), Attorney Marc F. Colin added to party Thomas Lehmann(pty:dft), Attorney Marc F. Colin added to party Robert Smukler(pty:dft) by Richard (I) V. Day, Brian Dingwall, Grant Heyneman, Thomas Lehmann, Robert Smukler.(Colin, Marc) |
|
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 09/06 4:22 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Nicholas (I) Metz.(Abramson, Jonathan) |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 09/06 4:21 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Graham (I) Dunne, David Johnson, Reiter.(Abramson, Jonathan) |
|
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 09/06 4:02 PM
DEFENDANT OFFICERS' (IN THEIR OFFICIAL CAPACITIES) AND DEFENDANT CITY OF AURORA'S ANSWER to1 Complaint, AND JURY DEMAND by City of Aruora, Richard V. Day, Brian Dingwall, Graham Dunne, Grant Heyneman, David Johnson, Thomas Lehmann, Nicholas Metz, Reiter, Robert Smukler.(Morales, Peter) |
|
Thursday, July 28, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order
Thu 07/28 4:15 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/28/16. Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (lgale, ) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment 1, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment 2 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter Reassigning Case
Thu 07/28 11:31 AM
CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to10 Order. This case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. All future pleadings should be designated as 16-cv-01654-KLM. (Text Only Entry) (ktera) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order
Thu 07/28 11:22 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §636(c) and D.C.Colo.L.Civ.R. 72.2, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/28/16. (ktera) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/28 9:08 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Jeffrey Gale All parties consent..(Trine, Cheryl) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order of Reference Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636 (c) | ||
Tuesday, July 26, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
service
Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint
Tue 07/26 8:56 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey Gale. All Defendants.(Trine, Cheryl) |
|
Att: 1 Summons City of Aurora, Robert Smukler, Brian Dingwall, David Johnson, Thomas Lehmann, Officer Reiter, Grant Heyneman, Graham Dunne, Richard Day, Nicholas Metz | ||
Monday, July 25, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Mon 07/25 12:32 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Marshall Abramson on behalf of Graham (I) Dunne, David Johnson, Nicholas (I) Metz, ReiterAttorney Jonathan Marshall Abramson added to party Graham (I) Dunne(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Marshall Abramson added to party David Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Marshall Abramson added to party Nicholas (I) Metz(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Marshall Abramson added to party Reiter(pty:dft) (Abramson, Jonathan) |
|
Thursday, July 14, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Thu 07/14 10:51 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Peter Ruben Morales on behalf of City of Aruora, Richard V. Day, Brian Dingwall, Graham Dunne, Grant Heyneman, David Johnson, Thomas Lehmann, Nicholas Metz, Reiter, Robert SmuklerAttorney Peter Ruben Morales added to party City of Aruora(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Ruben Morales added to party Richard V. Day(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Ruben Morales added to party Brian Dingwall(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Ruben Morales added to party Graham Dunne(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Ruben Morales added to party Grant Heyneman(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Ruben Morales added to party David Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Ruben Morales added to party Thomas Lehmann(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Ruben Morales added to party Nicholas Metz(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Ruben Morales added to party Reiter(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Ruben Morales added to party Robert Smukler(pty:dft) (Morales, Peter) |
|
Friday, July 01, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Summons Issued
Fri 07/01 3:58 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk as to Brian Dingwall. (evana, ) |
|
Att: 1 Summons City of Aurora, | ||
Att: 2 Summons David Johnson, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Graham Dunne, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Grant Heyneman, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Nicholas Metz, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Officedr Reiter, | ||
Att: 7 Summons Richard Day, | ||
Att: 8 Summons Robert Smukler, | ||
Att: 9 Summons Thomas Lehmann, | ||
Att: 10 Magistrate Judge Consent Form | ||
4 | 4
misc
Summons Request
Fri 07/01 12:57 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Robert Smukler, Brian Dingwall, David Johnson, Thomas Lehmann, Officer Reiter, Grant Heyneman, Graham Dunne, Richard V. Day, Nicholas Metz, City of Aurora re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Jeffrey Gale.(Trine, Cheryl) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons | ||
Tuesday, June 28, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Tue 06/28 12:58 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (amenz, ) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Tue 06/28 12:57 PM
Case assigned to Judge Richard P. Matsch and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry.(amenz, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/28 11:12 AM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against City of Aruora, Richard V. Day, Brian Dingwall, Grant Heyneman, David Johnson, Thomas Lehmann, Nicholas Metz, Officer Reiter, Robert Smukler, Graham Dunne (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-5042794)Attorney Cheryl Louise Trine added to party Jeffrey Gale(pty:pla), filed by Jeffrey Gale.(Trine, Cheryl) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |