Combat Sports Inc and BDO Canada Limited
Member Case
Lead case is: 2:13-bk-11632
Lead case is: 2:13-bk-11632
Washington Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 15 | |
Judge: | Marc Barreca |
Case #: | 2:13-bk-11634 |
Case Filed: | Feb 26, 2013 |
Terminated: | Sep 27, 2013 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 100-199 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Last checked: never |
Foreign Proceeding
Combat Sports Inc
BDO Canada Limited c/o Dickinson Wright PLLC Dawn R Copley 500 Woodward Ave Ste 4000
Detroit, MI 48226 |
Represented By
|
Foreign Representative
BDO Canada Limited
Dawn R Copley 500 Woodward Ave, Suite 400
Detroit, MI 48226 |
Represented By
|
US Trustee
United States Trustee
700 Stewart St Ste 5103
Seattle, WA 98101 |
Docket last updated: 03/12/2013 4:02 PM PDT |
Tuesday, February 26, 2013 | ||
Receipt of Chapter 15 Filing Fee - $1213.00 by MH. Receipt Number 199663. (admin) | ||
1 | 1 Ex Parte Motion for Joint Administration of Cases Pursuant to Rule 1015(b) .. Filed by Merrilee A MacLean on behalf of BDO Canada Limited (MacLean, Merrilee) | |
2 | 2 Received UNSIGNED Order Forwarded to Chambers for Judge's Signature. Filed by MacLean, Merrilee. Related document1 | |
3 | 3 ORDER to Reassign Case . (CMH) | |
4 | 4 Notice of Change in Assigned Judge. Judge Marc Barreca added to case. Involvement of Judge Timothy W. Dore Terminated. . (CMH) | |
5 | 5 ORDER Directing Joint Administration of Ch 15 Cases . Lead Case: 13-11632 Member Case(s): 13-11634 span id="relexpand-13271740" class="related" onClick="toggleRelated('13271740');"> Related [+]. (DLP) | |
7 | 7 4 pgs Chapter 15 Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding . Incomplete Filings due by 3/12/2013. Filed by Merrilee A MacLean on behalf of Combat Sports Inc (MEH) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2013 (Brown, Ethel). Modified on 2/27/2013 to add document number to entry. When VP was filed document number was not assigned.(Crosser, Kathleen). |