New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lewis A Kaplan
Referred: James C Francis
Case #: 1:13-cv-01265
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2013
Re-opened:Jun 24, 2015
Terminated:Jul 08, 2015
Last checked: Saturday Jan 10, 2015 9:47 AM EST
Defendant
BuVision, LLC
Represented By
Sandy A. Roberts
The Roberts Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Richard Steven Busch
King & Ballow
contact info
Plaintiff
Wall Street Entertainment, LLC
Represented By
Sandy A. Roberts
The Roberts Law Group, PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Universal Music Group, Inc.
Terminated: 07/29/2013



Create an account to get the full docket for this case.