Bedroc Limited, LLC, et al v. USA, et al
Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:01-cv-17080 |
Type | civil / united states |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Case Filed: | Oct 23, 2001 |
Terminated: | Dec 30, 2002 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 07/03/2020 1:58 PM PDT |
Tuesday, October 23, 2001 | ||
1 | 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. CADS SENT (Y/N): n. setting schedule as follows: appellant's designation of RT is due 10/29/01, ; appellee's designation of RT is due 11/6/01,, ; appellant shall order transcript by 11/16/01, ; court reporter shall file transcript in DC by 12/17/01; certificate of record shall be filed by 12/24/01 ; appellant's opening brief is due 2/4/02, ; appellees' brief is due 3/4/02,, ; appellants' reply brief is due 3/18/02. 01-17080 (GR) [Entered: 10/23/2001 03:47 PM] | |
3 | 3 Filed Christian B. Bryner for Appellant Western Elite, Inc., Appellant Bedroc Limited, LLC Civil Appeals Docketing Statement served on 10/17/01 (to CONFATT) 01-17080 01-17080 (GR) [Entered: 10/23/2001 03:49 PM] |